Todd Meyer v. Fifth Third Bank et al
Plaintiff: Todd Meyer
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank and Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2019cv01803
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 26 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #21 . The Motion Hearing previously scheduled for 12/2/2019 @ 8:30 AM has been rescheduled. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2019 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 8, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #21 filed by Plaintiff Todd Meyer. (Toffer, Jared)
November 4, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #9 filed by Plaintiff Todd Meyer. (Toffer, Jared)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #19 Non-Resident Attorney Nathan L. Colvin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Fifth Third Bank, Defendant, designating Larry M. Arnold as local counsel. (twdb)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #18 Non-Resident Attorney Nathaniel Lampley Jr. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Fifth Third Bank, Defendant, designating Larry M. Arnold as local counsel. (twdb)
November 1, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Fifth Third Bank. Motion set for hearing on 12/2/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Arnold, Larry)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 1/13/2020 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
October 29, 2019 Filing 19 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nathaniel Lytle Colvin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Fifth Third Bank (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24687061) filed by Defendant Fifth Third Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Arnold, Larry)
October 29, 2019 Filing 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nathaniel Lampley Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Fifth Third Bank (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24686991) filed by Defendant Fifth Third Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Arnold, Larry)
October 29, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Larry M Arnold counsel for Defendant Fifth Third Bank. Adding Cecilia J. Hong as counsel of record for Fifth Third Bank for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Fifth Third Bank. (Arnold, Larry)
October 28, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Fifth Third Bank. correcting Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #15 Errata to Declaration of Nathaniel Lampley, Jr. Correcting Exhibit A (Arnold, Larry)
October 28, 2019 Filing 15 Opposition Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #9 filed by Defendant Fifth Third Bank. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nathaniel Lampley, Jr.)(Arnold, Larry)
October 24, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Larry M Arnold counsel for Defendant Fifth Third Bank. Adding Larry M. Arnold as counsel of record for Fifth Third Bank for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Fifth Third Bank. (Attorney Larry M Arnold added to party Fifth Third Bank(pty:dft))(Arnold, Larry)
October 23, 2019 Filing 13 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #9 . The Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for 11/18/2019 is removed from the calendar and the motion is taken under submission. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Text Only Order VACATING Order to Show Cause #7 by Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 18, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Todd Meyerto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Deadlines #7 (Toffer, Jared)
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Todd Meyer, identifying 1.FBO Hogan M. Meyer UGMA; 2.Conrad F. Hohener, III and Debra Larue Hohener Trustees Under Agreement of Trust dated February 3, 1987; 3.FBO Kelly K. Meyer UGMA; 4.FBO Nolan M. Meyer UGMA; 5.FBO Wilson P. Meyer UGMA; 6.Gordon Meyer & Marjorie M. Meyer Trustees of the 3-M Trust Under Agreement dated February 11, 1983; 7. Mark Eisele; 8. Brian Thune; 9. Scott E. Bain; 10. Michael J. Purcell; 11. Khoi H. Vuong; 12. Todd Meyer; 13. Todd R. and Erin P. Meyer, as Co-Trustees of the Meyer Living Trust, Established October 30, 2001; 14. Mark H. Campbell; 15. Mark Dardis; 16. Laurie Campos; 17. OBrien Trust Dated January 2, 1996; 18. Meyer Dynasty Trust, Established December 10, 2012. (Toffer, Jared)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court filed by plaintiff Todd Meyer. Motion set for hearing on 11/18/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Jared M. Toffer Declaration, #3 Todd Meyer Declaration, #4 Proposed Order) (Toffer, Jared)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Todd Meyer, upon Defendant Fifth Third Bank served on 10/11/2019, answer due 11/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Toffer, Jared)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 [VACATED 10/21/2019 SEE DKT. #12] MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Show Cause Response due by 10/21/2019. (twdb) Modified on 10/21/2019 (dgo).
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap)
September 20, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-50, inclusive, Fifth Third Bank., filed by plaintiff Todd Meyer. (FILED IN STATE COURT 9/6/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (ghap)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Fifth Third Bank identifying Fifth Third Bancorp. as Corporate Parent. (McCormick, Thomas)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Fifth Third Bank. (McCormick, Thomas)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County, case number 30-2019-01096178 Receipt No: 0973-24475400 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Fifth Third Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Thomas N McCormick added to party Fifth Third Bank(pty:dft))(McCormick, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Todd Meyer v. Fifth Third Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Meyer
Represented By: Jesse S Finlayson
Represented By: Michael Raymond Williams
Represented By: Jared M Toffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank
Represented By: Thomas N McCormick
Represented By: Cecilia Ji-Young Hong
Represented By: Nathaniel Lampley, Jr
Represented By: Larry M Arnold
Represented By: Nathan L Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?