Seyed Mohammad Reza Ghazavi v. Donna Campagnolo
Plaintiff: Seyed Mohammad Reza Ghazavi
Defendant: LA District Director Donna Campagnolo and Donna Campagnolo
Case Number: 8:2019cv01813
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08:1447
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Donna Campagnolo answer now due 12/31/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Donna Campagnolo.(Attorney Grace Y Park added to party Donna Campagnolo(pty:dft))(Park, Grace)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Seyed Mohammad Reza Ghazavi, upon Defendant Donna Campagnolo served on 10/2/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Crystal Veloz. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Carly Sase. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Christian Macias. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proof of Service on Defendant, #2 Supplement Proof of Service on Attorney General)(Sturman, Jonathan)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Donna Campagnolo. (mrgo)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Seyed Mohammad Reza Ghazavi. (Sturman, Jonathan)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (ghap)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Seyed Mohammad Reza Ghazavi. (Sturman, Jonathan)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Seyed Mohammad Reza Ghazavi, (Sturman, Jonathan)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Seyed Mohammad Reza Ghazavi. (Sturman, Jonathan)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24482173 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Seyed Mohammad Reza Ghazavi. (Attorney Jonathan Roger Sturman added to party Seyed Mohammad Reza Ghazavi(pty:pla))(Sturman, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seyed Mohammad Reza Ghazavi v. Donna Campagnolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seyed Mohammad Reza Ghazavi
Represented By: Jonathan Roger Sturman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA District Director Donna Campagnolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Campagnolo
Represented By: Grace Y Park
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?