Clifford C. Loyer v. Terry Cleveland et al
Plaintiff: Clifford C. Loyer
Defendant: Maria Lange and Terry Cleveland
Case Number: 8:2019cv01814
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez Denying #4 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee: IT WAS RECOMMENDED that the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees be DENIED by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Reason: Other: Barrel-Fleck v. Humphrey 512 U.S. 477 (1994); Jud. in OCSC16WF1726 remains valid. Seeks monetary relief from a defendant immune from such relief. Leave to amend would be futile. DENIED, and this case is hereby DISMISSED immediately. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (bm) Modified on 10/2/2019 (bm).
September 30, 2019 RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian Re REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees #4 . Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval.(klg)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Clifford C. Loyer. (sbou)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (ghap)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES OR REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (CV-93). (ghap)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Terry Cleveland(Deputy District Attorney, official capacity), Terry Cleveland(individual), Maria Lange(individual), Maria Lange(Deputy Probation Officer II, official capacity) pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian., filed by plaintiff Clifford C. Loyer. (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clifford C. Loyer v. Terry Cleveland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Lange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Cleveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford C. Loyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?