Steven Eric Gould v. People of The State of California
Petitioner: Steven Eric Gould
Respondent: People of The State of California
Case Number: 8:2019cv01870
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #6 (Attachments: #1 Lodgment 1 [In-Custody status for case no. 16F16660X], #2 Lodgment 2 [In-Custody status for case no. 17F00513X], #3 Lodgment 3 [Orange County Superior Court Minutes])(Beesley, Christopher)
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Respondent People of The State of California. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum) (Beesley, Christopher)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christopher P Beesley on behalf of Respondent People of The State of California (Beesley, Christopher)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS INVOLVING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS BY A PERSON IN STATE CUSTODY by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: that Respondent People of The State of California file Answer to the Petition not later than 11/22/2019. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Motions to Dismiss shall be filed by 11/22/2019. Traverse due by 12/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (sbou)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 Mail Returned addressed to Steven Eric Gould IDNo.3120892 Orange County Jail 550 N. Flower Street Santa Ana, CA 92703 re Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-84) (Habeas Corpus) - optional html form, #2 (sbou)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-111) (lh) Modified on 10/22/2019 (klg).(note: This document was re-sent to plaintiff's new address, as indicated on docket entry #3 , by the Clerk via US Mail on October 22,2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254)filed as Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under (28 U.S.C 2241). Case assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (Filing Fee $ 5 Due), filed by Petitioner Steven Eric Gould. (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steven Eric Gould v. People of The State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven Eric Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: People of The State of California
Represented By: Christopher P Beesley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?