KIA Motors America, Inc v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Plaintiff: KIA Motors America, Inc
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company, BNSF Railway Company and CSX Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01881
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to Complaint #28 by Judge Josephine L. Staton that the time for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be extended until 12/16/2019. (jp)
November 19, 2019 Filing 28 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 12/16/2019 filed by Plaintiff KIA Motors America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Trebicka, Viola)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT9S) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #26 , for the following reasons: Stipulation does not include signatures of defense counsel. (jp)
November 7, 2019 Filing 26 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED 11/12/2019, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #27 ] - STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 12/16/2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff KIA Motors America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Trebicka, Viola). Modified on 11/12/2019 (jp).
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #12 Non-Resident Attorney Sami H Rashid APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kia Motors America, Inc., designating Duane R Lyons as local counsel. (bm)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #11 Non-Resident Attorney Stephen R Neuwrith APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kia Motors America, Inc., designating Duane R Lyons as local counsel. (bm)
October 29, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Sami Rashid to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff KIA Motors America, Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24669822) #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. (lt)
October 29, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stephen R. Neuwirth to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff KIA Motors America, Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24669704) #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. (lt)
October 28, 2019 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff KIA Motors America, Inc, upon Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company served on 10/7/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Lyons, Duane) Modified on 10/30/2019 (jp).
October 28, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff KIA Motors America, Inc, upon Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company served on 10/7/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Lyons, Duane) Modified on 10/30/2019 (jp).
October 28, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff KIA Motors America, Inc, upon Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc. served on 10/7/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Lyons, Duane) Modified on 10/30/2019 (jp).
October 28, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff KIA Motors America, Inc, upon Defendant BNSF Railway Company served on 10/7/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Lyons, Duane) Modified on 10/30/2019 (jp).
October 28, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff KIA Motors America, Inc, re Notice of Related Case(s) #8 on Defendant Union Pacific served on 10/11/2019. (Lyons, Duane)
October 28, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff KIA Motors America, Inc, re Notice of Related Case(s) #8 on Defendant Norfolk Southern served on 10/11/2019. (Lyons, Duane)
October 28, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff KIA Motors America, Inc, re Notice of Related Case(s) #8 on Defendant CSX served on 10/11/2019. (Lyons, Duane)
October 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff KIA Motors America, Inc, re Notice of Related Case(s) #8 on Defendant BNSF served on 10/11/2019. (Lyons, Duane)
October 25, 2019 Filing 13 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff KIA Motors America, Inc.(Lyons, Duane)
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Sami Rashid to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff KIA Motors America, Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24669822) filed by Plaintiff KIA Motors America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing from Southern District of New York) (Lyons, Duane)
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stephen R. Neuwirth to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff KIA Motors America, Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24669704) filed by Plaintiff KIA Motors America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing from Southern District of New York) (Lyons, Duane)
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-01880 JLS(KESx). Case transferred from Judge James V. Selna to Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:19-cv-01881 JLS(KESx). Signed by Judge Josephine L. Staton (rn)
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff KIA Motors America, Inc. Related Case(s): 8:19-cv-01880 (Lyons, Duane)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants BNSF Railway Company, CSX Transportation, Inc., Norfolk Southern Railway Company and Union Pacific Railroad Company. (jtil)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff KIA Motors America, Inc identifying Kia Motors Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Lyons, Duane)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff KIA Motors America, Inc. (Lyons, Duane)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24530067 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff KIA Motors America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Duane R Lyons added to party KIA Motors America, Inc(pty:pla))(Lyons, Duane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KIA Motors America, Inc v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIA Motors America, Inc
Represented By: Duane R Lyons
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Represented By: Viola Trebicka
Represented By: Robert Patrick Vance, Jr
Represented By: Sami H Rashid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?