Touraj Zal v. Specialized Loan Servicing LLC et al
Plaintiff: Touraj Zal
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, The Bank of New York Mellon FKA The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificateholders of the CWHEQ Revolving Home Equity Loan Trust, Series 2007-A, Affinia Default Services, LLC, Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon and The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificateholders of the CWHEQ Revolving Home Equity Loan Trust, Series
Case Number: 8:2019cv01942
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 [IN CHAMBERS] Minute Order Regarding Motion to Dismiss by Judge James V. Selna: The Court deems Zal's failure to oppose the motion as consent to the granting of the Motion. Further, the Court GRANTS the Motion on its merits. The Court finds that oral argument would not be helpful in this matter, and the December 9, 2019 hearing is VACATED. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. (See order for further details.) (es)
December 2, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) #10 filed by Defendants Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon. (McMahon, Tadeusz)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 1/13/2020 at 11:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 1/6/2020. (lb)
October 18, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) #10 filed by Defendants Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon. (Mase, Andrew)
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) filed by Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon. Motion set for hearing on 12/9/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Mase, Andrew)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE filed by Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon. of Order (Mase, Andrew)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon, (Mase, Andrew)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon. (Mase, Andrew)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment 1 Civil Cover Sheet should be e-filed separately an in the correct event category located under Civil Events Other Filings Miscellaneous Filings - Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71). (car)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (car)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car)
October 10, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Affinia Default Services, LLC, Does 1-10, Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon, filed by Plaintiff Touraj Zal. Filed in State Court on 9/8/19 Submitted with attachment 1 Exhibit 1 to notice of removal #1 (car)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01095220-CU-OR-CJC Receipt No: 0973-24589847 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Andrew Jonathan Mase added to party Specialized Loan Servicing LLC(pty:dft))(Mase, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Touraj Zal v. Specialized Loan Servicing LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon FKA The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificateholders of the CWHEQ Revolving Home Equity Loan Trust, Series 2007-A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affinia Default Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Andrew Jonathan Mase
Represented By: Tadeusz McMahon
Represented By: Timothy M Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Andrew Jonathan Mase
Represented By: Tadeusz McMahon
Represented By: Timothy M Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificateholders of the CWHEQ Revolving Home Equity Loan Trust, Series
Represented By: Andrew Jonathan Mase
Represented By: Tadeusz McMahon
Represented By: Timothy M Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Touraj Zal
Represented By: Brian P Ballo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?