Norma Antonio v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Norma Antonio
Defendant: Does 1 to 50 and Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv01955
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No. 3 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Case is ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than August 28, 2020. (tg)
December 13, 2019 Filing 16 CIVIL TRIAL ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton. (tg)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers) SCHEDULING ORDERby Judge Josephine L. Staton. Counsel's attention is directed to the Court's Civil Trial Order filed concurrently with this Minute Order. Following dates are set: Last Day to File a Motion to Add Parties or Amend Pleadings: February 11, 2020; Fact Discovery Cutoff: June 26, 2020; Last Day to File Motions (Excluding Daubert Motions and all other Motions in Limine): July 10, 2020; Last Day to Serve Initial Expert Reports: July 10, 2020; Last Day to Serve Rebuttal Expert Reports: August 7, 2020; Last Day to Conduct Settlement Proceedings: August 28, 2020; Expert Discovery Cutoff: September 4, 2020; Last Day to File Daubert Motions: September 11, 2020; Last Day to File Other Motions in Limine (Excluding Daubert Motions): October 2, 2020; Final Pretrial Conference (10:30 a.m.): October 30, 2020. See document for details. (lom)
December 12, 2019 Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: On the Courts own motion, the Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2019 at 10:30 a.m. is ordered VACATED. Scheduling Order will be issued. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 11, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Benson Yeager Douglas counsel for Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Adding Benson Y. Douglas as counsel of record for MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defedant MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC. (Attorney Benson Yeager Douglas added to party Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC(pty:dft))(Douglas, Benson)
December 4, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sally A Ayvazian counsel for Plaintiff Norma Antonio. Adding Gregory K. Kechichian as counsel of record for Norma Antonio for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Norma Antonio. (Ayvazian, Sally)
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT REPORT filed by Plaintiff Norma Antonio. (Ayvazian, Sally)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference is set for 12/13/2019 at 10:30 a.m. (tg)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (esa)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Karen E. Scott. New Case Number 8:19-cv-01955 JLS (KESx). (esa)
October 15, 2019 COPY ANSWER to Complaint, Jury Demand, filed by defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 2)(esa)
October 15, 2019 COPY OF SERVICE OF PROCESS TRANSMITTAL executed by Plaintiff Norma Antonio, upon Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC served on 9/13/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Process of Service by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
October 15, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Norma Antonio. (filed in state court 9/5/2019, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 5) (esa)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Jury Demand #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on 10/15/2019. (Chu, Derrick)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, identifying Daimler North America Corporation. (Chu, Derrick)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC.. (Chu, Derrick)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Chu, Derrick)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of California for the County of Orange, case number 30-2019-01096172 Receipt No: 0973-24604798 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Answer submitted to Orange County Superior Court, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Contract upon which plaintiff's State Court Complaint is based) (Attorney Derrick Y Chu added to party Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC(pty:mov))(Chu, Derrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norma Antonio v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Antonio
Represented By: Sally A Ayvazian
Represented By: Gregory K Kechichian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Represented By: Anthony Paul Greco
Represented By: Derrick Y Chu
Represented By: Kate S Lehrman
Represented By: Benson Yeager Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?