Syed Ahmed v. Bank of America N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Syed Ahmed
Defendant: NewRez LLC f/k/a New Penn Financial, LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing and Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, Bank of America N.A., NewRez LLC, New York Mellon, Does 1 to 20, inclusive, The Bank of New York Mellon, Specialized Loan Servicing LLC and NewRez LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Case Number: 8:2019cv02027
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 20 Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Amended Complaint/Petition #14 filed by Defendants Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, NewRez LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ekmekchyan, Pavel)
December 6, 2019 Filing 19 21 DAY Summons Issued re Third Amended Complaint/Petition #14 as to defendant The Bank of New York Mellon. (twdb)
December 5, 2019 Filing 18 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #17 , Summons Request #15 filed by Plaintiff Syed Ahmed. (Patel, Ashishkumar)
December 5, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #15 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (twdb)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Text Only Order re Third Amended Complaint #14 , MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT #11 by Judge David O. Carter: Because Plaintiff has filed a Third Amended Complaint (Dkt. 14), the Court hereby DENIES AS MOOT Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint (Dkt. 11). The hearing scheduled for 12/23/2019 @ 8:30 AM is taken off calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 4, 2019 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #14 filed by Plaintiff Syed Ahmed. (Patel, Ashishkumar)
December 4, 2019 Filing 14 Third AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Amended Complaint, JURY DEMAND, filed by Plaintiff Syed Ahmed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Patel, Ashishkumar)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 1/6/2020 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
November 13, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT #11 filed by Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (Ekmekchyan, Pavel)
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. Motion set for hearing on 12/23/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Ekmekchyan, Pavel)
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, filed by DEFENDANT NewRez LLC.(Ekmekchyan, Pavel)
October 31, 2019 Filing 9 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Amended Complaint, filed by Defendants Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, NewRez LLC.(Ekmekchyan, Pavel)
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants NewRez LLC, Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, Notice to Adverse Parties of Removal, Notice of Interested Parties, Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, Notice of Assignment to United States Judges served on 10/28/19 and 10/29/19. (Ekmekchyan, Pavel)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant NewRez LLC, Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, identifying Specialized Loan Servicing Holdings, LLC, Computershare Limited, Shellpoint Partners LLC, New Residential Investment Corp.. (Ekmekchyan, Pavel)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (ghap)
October 23, 2019 NON CONFORMED COPY OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Bank of America N.A., Does 1 to 20, inclusive, NewRez LLC, Specialized Loan Servicing LLC amending Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by plaintiff Syed Ahmed. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A)(ghap) Modified on 10/25/2019 (ghap).
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant NewRez LLC f/k/a New Penn Financial, LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing and Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (Ekmekchyan, Pavel)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Orange, case number 30-2019-01052548-CU-OR-CJC Receipt No: 0973-24659819 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant NewRez LLC f/k/a New Penn Financial, LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing and Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Attorney Pavel Ekmekchyan added to party NewRez LLC f/k/a New Penn Financial, LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing and Specialized Loan Servicing LLC(pty:dft))(Ekmekchyan, Pavel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Syed Ahmed v. Bank of America N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewRez LLC f/k/a New Penn Financial, LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing and Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Pavel Ekmekchyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewRez LLC
Represented By: Joshua M Bryan
Represented By: Pavel Ekmekchyan
Represented By: Behzad Ben Mohandesi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Joshua M Bryan
Represented By: Pavel Ekmekchyan
Represented By: Behzad Ben Mohandesi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewRez LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Joshua M Bryan
Represented By: Pavel Ekmekchyan
Represented By: Behzad Ben Mohandesi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Syed Ahmed
Represented By: Ashishkumar A Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?