Jack R. Finnegan v. City of Dana Point
Plaintiff: Jack R. Finnegan
Defendant: City of Dana Point
Case Number: 8:2019cv02110
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Josephine L. Staton, ORDERING Reply, Notice of Substitution of Alleged Trustee, as a Party in Interest. submitted by Plaintiff Jack R. Finnegan received on 11/27/19 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: This case is closed and pending appeal in the 9th Circuit. (lom)
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $505.00 into the registry of the Court from Jack Finnegan. Re: USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order,,, #10 . Receipt number SA016157. (eva)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #7 filed by Jack R. Finnegan. CCA # 19-56360. A review of this court's docket reflects that the filing and docketing fees forthis appeal remain due. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall pay to the district court the $505.00 filing and docketing fees for this appeal and file in this court proof of such payment or file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The filing of a motion to proceed in forma pauperis will automatically stay the briefing schedule under Ninth Circuit Rule 27-11. If appellant fails to comply with this order, this appeal may be dismissed by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. (jp)
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 19-56360 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #7 as to Plaintiff Jack R. Finnegan. (jp)
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 FILING FEE LETTER issued as to Plaintiff Jack R. Finnegan, re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #7 (car)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Plaintiff Jack R. Finnegan. Appeal of Order Dismissing Case, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings, #6 Filed On: 11/18/2019; Entered On: 11/19/2019; Filing fee $ 505 Billed. (car)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTES (In Chambers) ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Plaintiff's Motion #1 seeks relief that would constitute a de facto appeal of a state-court decision, the Court lacks jurisdiction to consider it. The Court DISMISSES the present case WITH PREJUDICE. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION). (jp)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Substitution of Richard A. Marshack, in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee, as Real Party In Interest for Plaintiff Jack Richard Finnegan; and Request for Notice filed by Plaintiff Jack R. Finnegan. filed by Richard A. Marshack, Ch. 7 Trustee (Hays, D)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (lh)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jack R. Finnegan, (lh)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 REQUEST for an Injunction, Pursuant to 28 USC 1367(a), 1657(a), 1746 and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 65(d) and Applicable Provisions of Rule 52(a)(b)(c) and Rule 8(e), Regarding Case No. 30-2014-00746296. Filed by Plaintiff Jack R. Finnegan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jack R. Finnegan v. City of Dana Point
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack R. Finnegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Dana Point
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?