Brocade Communications Systems LLC et al v. ENET Solutions Inc.
Plaintiff: Brocade Communications Systems LLC and Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited
Defendant: ENET Solutions Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv02141
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT #15 by Judge James V. Selna. Defendant's Date to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (D.E. 1) - February 12, 2020. (lom)
December 23, 2019 Filing 15 First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File File First Amended Complaint and Response Thereto filed by Defendant ENET Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sumitani, Shunsuke)
December 20, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brocade Communications Systems LLC, Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, upon Defendant ENET Solutions Inc. served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon DENISE WARNER in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Townes, Nicole)
December 6, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to ENET Solutions Inc. answer now due 12/26/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant ENET Solutions Inc..(Clarkson, Gregory)
December 6, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kit M Stetina counsel for Defendant ENET Solutions Inc.. Adding Kit M. Stetina as counsel of record for ENET Solutions, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant ENET Solutions, Inc.. (Attorney Kit M Stetina added to party ENET Solutions Inc.(pty:dft))(Stetina, Kit)
December 6, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gregory Kent Clarkson counsel for Defendant ENET Solutions Inc.. Adding Gregory K. Clarkson as counsel of record for ENET Solutions, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant ENET Solutions, Inc.. (Attorney Gregory Kent Clarkson added to party ENET Solutions Inc.(pty:dft))(Clarkson, Gregory)
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Shunsuke Sumitani counsel for Defendant ENET Solutions Inc.. Adding Shunsuke S. Sumitani as counsel of record for ENET Solutions, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant ENET Solutions, Inc.. (Attorney Shunsuke Sumitani added to party ENET Solutions Inc.(pty:dft))(Sumitani, Shunsuke)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 2/10/2020 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 2/3/2020. (lb)
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant ENET Solutions Inc. (et)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (et)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, Brocade Communications Systems LLC, identifying Broadcom, Inc.. (Friedland, Michael)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, Brocade Communications Systems LLC. (Friedland, Michael)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, Brocade Communications Systems LLC. (Friedland, Michael)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24739560 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Brocade Communications Systems LLC, Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited. (Attorney Michael K Friedland added to party Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Michael K Friedland added to party Brocade Communications Systems LLC(pty:pla))(Friedland, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brocade Communications Systems LLC et al v. ENET Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brocade Communications Systems LLC
Represented By: Michael K Friedland
Represented By: Nicole Rossi Townes
Represented By: Ashley Morales
Represented By: Lauren K Katzenellenbogen
Represented By: Susan M Natland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited
Represented By: Michael K Friedland
Represented By: Nicole Rossi Townes
Represented By: Ashley Morales
Represented By: Lauren K Katzenellenbogen
Represented By: Susan M Natland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENET Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Kit M Stetina
Represented By: Shunsuke Sumitani
Represented By: Gregory Kent Clarkson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?