Brocade Communications Systems LLC et al v. ProLabs USA Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brocade Communications Systems LLC and Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited
Defendant: ProLabs USA Inc., Add-On Computer Pheripherals LLC and Add-On Computer Peripherals LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv02159
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 16 First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File First Amended Complaint and Response Thereto filed by Defendants Add-On Computer Peripherals LLC, ProLabs USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Thomas, Jeffrey)
December 20, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brocade Communications Systems LLC, Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, upon Defendant Add-On Computer Peripherals LLC served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon KIMBERLEE DIEU in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Townes, Nicole)
December 20, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brocade Communications Systems LLC, Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, upon Defendant ProLabs USA Inc. served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon KIMBERLEE DIEU in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Townes, Nicole)
December 11, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Add-On Computer Peripherals LLC, ProLabs USA Inc..(Attorney Jeffrey T Thomas added to party Add-On Computer Peripherals LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey T Thomas added to party ProLabs USA Inc.(pty:dft))(Thomas, Jeffrey)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 2/3/2020 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 1/27/2020. (rrp)
November 19, 2019 Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-02141 JVS(JDEx). Case transferred from Judge Josephine L. Staton to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:19-cv-02159 JVS(JDEx). Signed by Judge James V. Selna (rn)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Add-On Computer Peripherals LLC. (lh)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant ProLabs USA Inc. (lh)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (lh)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintffs Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, Brocade Communications Systems LLC, identifying Broadcom, Inc.. (Friedland, Michael)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, Brocade Communications Systems LLC. (Friedland, Michael)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, Brocade Communications Systems LLC. (Friedland, Michael)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited, Brocade Communications Systems LLC. (Friedland, Michael)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24756079 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Brocade Communications Systems LLC, Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited. (Attorney Michael K Friedland added to party Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Michael K Friedland added to party Brocade Communications Systems LLC(pty:pla))(Friedland, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brocade Communications Systems LLC et al v. ProLabs USA Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ProLabs USA Inc.
Represented By: Casey James McCracken
Represented By: Stephen Christopher Whittaker
Represented By: Jeffrey T Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Add-On Computer Pheripherals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Add-On Computer Peripherals LLC
Represented By: Casey James McCracken
Represented By: Stephen Christopher Whittaker
Represented By: Jeffrey T Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brocade Communications Systems LLC
Represented By: Michael K Friedland
Represented By: Nicole Rossi Townes
Represented By: Ashley Morales
Represented By: Lauren K Katzenellenbogen
Represented By: Susan M Natland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited
Represented By: Michael K Friedland
Represented By: Nicole Rossi Townes
Represented By: Ashley Morales
Represented By: Lauren K Katzenellenbogen
Represented By: Susan M Natland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?