ABC Services Group, Inc. v. Amerihealth Insurance Company of New Jersey
Plaintiff: ABC Services Group, Inc.
Defendant: Amerihealth Insurance Company of New Jersey and Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2019cv02180
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. All future filings shall be filed only under the low number case, SA CV 19-0243- DOC (DFMx). Cases associated with Lead Case SACV19-243 DOC(DFMx), Made JS-6. Case Terminated. (twdb)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-00243 DOC(DFMx). Case transferred from Judge James V. Selna to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:19-cv-02180 DOC(DFMx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter (rn)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Amerihealth Insurance Company of New Jersey. (lh)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (lh)
November 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc.. Related Case(s): 8:19-cv-00243-DOC-DFM and 8:19-cv-01342-DOC-DFM (Garner, Craig)
November 11, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc.. (Garner, Craig)
November 11, 2019 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc., identifying ABC Services Group, Inc. and Morningside Recovery, LLC. (Garner, Craig)
November 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc.. (Garner, Craig)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24761313 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff ABC Services Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Attorney Craig B Garner added to party ABC Services Group, Inc.(pty:pla))(Garner, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABC Services Group, Inc. v. Amerihealth Insurance Company of New Jersey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABC Services Group, Inc.
Represented By: Craig B Garner
Represented By: Rochelle J Bioteau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerihealth Insurance Company of New Jersey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?