In Re Allan Eli Gindi and Carol June Gindi
Appellee: Allan Eli Gindi and Carol June Gindi
Appellant: Richard Ruffalo and Susan Ruffalo
Case Number: 8:2019cv02193
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE RE: BANKRUPTCY RECORD COMPLETE. Please note, pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), this Court has received from the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court either the record for the above-captioned appeal or notice that the record is available electronically. The parties are responsible for reading and complying with all requirements, including briefing, provided in this notice. Appellant must serve and file a brief by 1/9/2020. (gk)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment #1 . (gk)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 U.S. BANKRUPTCY APPELLATE PANEL OF THE NINTH CIRCUIT TRANSMITTAL, Notice of transfer of appeal to district court; regarding BAP: CC-19-1280. (ghap)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 OPTIONAL APPELLEE STATEMENT OF ELECTION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT filed by Appellees Allan Eli Gindi, Carol June Gindi. (ghap)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (ghap)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION: Re: Order on Debtors' Objection to Claim of Susan Ruffalo and Richard Ruffalo (Claim No. 343) entered on 10/25/2019 by Bankruptcy Judge Mark S Wallace, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 11/6/2019. Bankruptcy Court case number: 8:19-bk-10198-MW, Adversary number: N/A, BAP case number: N/A., filed by appellants Susan Ruffalo, Richard Ruffalo. (Attachments: #1 BK Court Docket Sheets) (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Allan Eli Gindi and Carol June Gindi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Allan Eli Gindi
Represented By: Michael G Spector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Carol June Gindi
Represented By: Michael G Spector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Richard Ruffalo
Represented By: Christopher Lane Blank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Susan Ruffalo
Represented By: Christopher Lane Blank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?