Fullerton Square Fitness Group, LLC v. Raymond Group, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Fullerton Square Fitness Group, LLC
Defendant: Raymond Group, LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2019cv02198
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference is set for 2/21/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (tg)
December 27, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm)
December 23, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendant Raymond Group, LLC.(Levinson, Daniel)
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Raymond Group, LLC answer now due 12/23/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendant Raymond Group, LLC.(Attorney Daniel Saul Levinson added to party Raymond Group, LLC(pty:dft))(Levinson, Daniel)
December 4, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Fullerton Square Fitness Group, LLC, upon Defendant Raymond Group, LLC served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Elizabeth Gonzales, person authorized to accept service on behalf of California Corporate Agents, Inc. - registered agent for Defendant Raymond Group, LLC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Molina, Jesse)
November 16, 2019 Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Raymond Group, LLC. (jp)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff Fullerton Square Fitness Group, LLC. (Molina, Jesse)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (esa)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Karen E. Scott. New Case Number 8:19-cv-02198 JLS (KESx). (esa)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Fullerton Square Fitness Group, LLC, a California limited liability compaany, d/b/a/ Planet Fitness, identifying Fullerton Square Fitness Group, LLC d/b/a Planet Fitness, Plaintiff/Lessee/Tenant; PFNY, LLC, Plaintiff's sole member; Raymond Group, LLC, Defendant/Lessor/Landlord. (Molina, Jesse)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Fullerton Square Fitness Group, LLC, a California limited liability compaany, d/b/a/ Planet Fitness. (Molina, Jesse)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24769168 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Fullerton Square Fitness Group, LLC, a California limited liability compaany, d/b/a/ Planet Fitness. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K) (Attorney Jesse Molina added to party Fullerton Square Fitness Group, LLC, a California limited liability compaany, d/b/a/ Planet Fitness(pty:pla))(Molina, Jesse)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fullerton Square Fitness Group, LLC v. Raymond Group, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Group, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Saul Levinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fullerton Square Fitness Group, LLC
Represented By: G Cresswell Templeton, III
Represented By: Jesse Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?