Issa Nabil Al Assi v. Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC
Plaintiff: Issa Nabil Al Assi
Defendant: Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC and DOES 1 through 100, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2019cv02199
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No. 3 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Case is ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than January 1, 2021. (tg)
January 8, 2020 Filing 16 CIVIL TRIAL ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton. (tg)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE (In Chambers) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference set for hearing January 10, 2020, is VACATED and the following schedule is set. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2021 at 10:30 AM. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION). (jp)
December 23, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew C Wolf counsel for Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. Adding Jenny Guzman as counsel of record for Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. (Wolf, Matthew)
December 19, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5, filed by Plaintiff Issa Nabil Al Assi.. (Tang, Theodore)
December 19, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Theodore Richard Tang counsel for Plaintiff Issa Nabil Al Assi. Adding Theodore R. Tang as counsel of record for Issa Nabil Al Assi for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Issa Nabil Al Assi. (Attorney Theodore Richard Tang added to party Issa Nabil Al Assi(pty:pla))(Tang, Theodore)
November 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference is set for 1/10/2020 at 10:30 a.m. before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (tg)
November 16, 2019 Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg)
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Issa Nabil Al Assi.. (Starr, Robert)
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (jtil)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Autumn D. Spaeth. New Case Number 8:19-cv-02199 JLS (ADSx). (jtil)
November 12, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC filed in Orange County Superior Court on 7/19/2019, attached as Exhibit 2.(jtil)
November 12, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Issa Nabil Al Assi in Orange County Superior Court on 6/18/2019, attached as Exhibit 1. Modified on 11/13/2019 (jtil).
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice (Other) #4 , Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on 11/12/2019. (Wolf, Matthew)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE Re-File of State Court Answer filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Answer)(Wolf, Matthew)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC identifying Jaguar Land Rover Limited, which is a subsidiary of Jaguar Land Rover Holdings Limited, which is a subsidiary of Jaguar Land Rover Automotive PLC, which is a subsidiary of TML Holdings Pte. Ltd., which is a subsidiary of Tata Motors Ltd. as Corporate Parent. (Wolf, Matthew)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. (Wolf, Matthew)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01077686 Receipt No: 0973-24763095 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 State Court Answer, #3 Exhibit 3 Purchase Agreement) (Attorney Matthew C Wolf added to party Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Wolf, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Issa Nabil Al Assi v. Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC
Represented By: Lauren Kennedy VanDenburg
Represented By: Matthew C Wolf
Represented By: Jenny Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Issa Nabil Al Assi
Represented By: Adam Morris Rose
Represented By: Robert L Starr
Represented By: Theodore Richard Tang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?