James Brian Carruthers v. Jossie Gastelo
Petitioner: James Brian Carruthers
Respondent: Jossie Gastelo
Case Number: 8:2019cv02206
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and referred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-38) (ghap)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Southern
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred to the Central District of California, Southern Division. Files transferred electronically to: *Central District of California, Southern Division*.*411 West Fourth Street, Room 1-053**Santa Ana, CA 92701-4516*. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 11/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah) [Transferred from California Southern on 11/14/2019.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by James Brian Carruthers. (tcf) [Transferred from California Southern on 11/14/2019.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by James Brian Carruthers. (tcf) [Transferred from California Southern on 11/14/2019.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Jossie Gastelo, filed by James Brian Carruthers. (Filing fee $5, fee not paid, IFP not filed.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-2097-H-AHG. Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case.(tcf) [Transferred from California Southern on 11/14/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Brian Carruthers v. Jossie Gastelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Brian Carruthers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jossie Gastelo
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?