Kimlay Sorn v. United Healthcare Group Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kimlay Sorn
Defendant: Optum Services, Inc., Nagaraju Gudipudi, United Healthcare Group Inc. and Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2019cv02207
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Joint Stipulation to Binding Arbitration and to Stay Pending Action #10 . Made JS-6. Case Terminated. (twdb)
December 3, 2019 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION for Order Binding Arbitration and to Stay Pending Action filed by Defendants Nagaraju Gudipudi, Optum Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Clifford, Douglas)
November 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kimlay Sorn, (McMillan, Heather)
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Kimlay Sorn.. (McMillan, Heather)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 12/18/2019 @ 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (esa)
November 14, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendants Nagaraju Gudipudi, Optum Services, Inc. (filed in state court 11/12/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 7)(esa)
November 14, 2019 COPY OF SERVICE OF PROCESS TRANSMITTAL executed by Plaintiff Kimlay Sorn, upon Defendant Optum Services, Inc. served on 10/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Process of Service by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 3) (esa)
November 14, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Nagaraju Gudipudi, Optum Services, Inc., United Healthcare Group Inc., filed by plaintiff Kimlay Sorn. (filed in state court 10/10/2019, submitted as document 1, attachment 2) (esa)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Nagaraju Gudipudi, Optum Services, Inc., identifying Plaintiff Kimlay Sorn, Defendant Optum Services, Inc. and Defendant Nagaraju Gudipudi. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Clifford, Douglas)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Nagaraju Gudipudi, Optum Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Clifford, Douglas)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01103740-CU-OE-CJC Receipt No: 0973-24782441 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Nagaraju Gudipudi, Optum Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Douglas R. Clifford in Support of Defendants Optum Services, Inc.'s and Nagaraju Gudipudi's Notice of Removal of Civil Action, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Process Transmittal, #4 Exhibit F - Business Entity Details for Optum Services, Inc., #5 Exhibit G - Business Entity Details for United HealthCare Services, Inc., #6 Exhibit H - Business Entity Details for UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, #7 Exhibit I - Conformed Copy of Defendants Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #8 Exhibit J - Other Process, Pleadings, and Orders served in this Action, #9 Declaration of Nagaraju Gudipudi in Support of Defendants Optum Services, Inc.'s and Nagaraju Gudipudi's Notice of Removal of Civil Action, #10 Exhibit C - A Copy of the Summons and Complanint Served on Nagaraju Gudipudi, #11 Declaration of Susan Weedman in Support of Defendants Optum Services, Inc.'s and Nagaraju Gudipudi's Notice of Removal of Civil Action, #12 Exhibit D - Copy of Plaintiff's W-2 statement for 2017, #13 Exhibit E - Copy of Plaintiff's W-2 statement for 2018, #14 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Douglas Ray Clifford added to party Nagaraju Gudipudi(pty:dft), Attorney Douglas Ray Clifford added to party Optum Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Clifford, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimlay Sorn v. United Healthcare Group Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Services, Inc.
Represented By: Michael S Kalt
Represented By: Douglas Ray Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nagaraju Gudipudi
Represented By: Michael S Kalt
Represented By: Douglas Ray Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimlay Sorn
Represented By: Daniel P Stevens
Represented By: Heather K McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?