Jason Russell et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jason Russell and Elsy Russell
Defendant: FCA US LLC, DOES 1 through 10, inclusive, and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2019cv02222
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT OF CASE by Judge James V. Selna. The Court having been advised by the counsel for the parties that the above-entitled action has been settled #12 , IT IS ORDERED that this action be and is hereby dismissed in its entirety without prejudice to the right, upon good cause being shown within 60 days, to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom)
December 26, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant FCA US LLC, re Notice of Settlement #12 served on 12/26/2019. (Gregg, Michael)
December 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Settlement filed by defendant FCA US LLC. (Gregg, Michael)
December 13, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #10 served on 12/13/2019. (Gregg, Michael)
December 13, 2019 Filing 10 [AMENDED] NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01105051-CU-BC-NJC with filing fee previously paid ($400.00 paid on 11/15/2019, receipt number 26LHT83D), filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Gregg, Michael) Modified on 12/16/2019 (es).
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 1/13/2020 at 11:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 1/6/2020. (rrp)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: FCA US LLC is ordered to file an amended initial pleading within ten days identifying each member of each alleged LLC and the members citizenship and principal place of business as the date of the filing of the initial pleading. If any member is itself an LLC, the same information shall be provided for each subtier member, and if need be, for each successive subtier. A failure to respond may result in remand of the action for lack of jurisdiction. (See document for further details.) (es)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil)
November 15, 2019 CONFORMED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant FCA US LLC in Orange Count Superior Court on 11/4/2019, attached as Exhibit C. (jtil)
November 15, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Jason Russell, Elsy Russell in Orange County Superior Court on 10/15/2019, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on 11/15/2019. (Gregg, Michael)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA North America Holdings, LLC; Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, N.V.. (Gregg, Michael)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Gregg, Michael)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01105051-Cu-BC-NJC Receipt No: 0973-24790487 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Michael J Gregg added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Gregg, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jason Russell et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Russell
Represented By: Jonathan West Buxton
Represented By: Derek Stephen Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsy Russell
Represented By: Jonathan West Buxton
Represented By: Derek Stephen Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Michael J Gregg
Represented By: Mark W Skanes
Represented By: Jon B Waldorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?