Baskin Robbins Franchising, LLC et al v. MYP Corporation et al
Plaintiff: BR IP Holder LLC, DB Real Estate Assets I, LLC and Baskin-Robbins Franchising, LLC
Defendant: Suk Chang and MYP Corporation
Case Number: 8:2019cv02232
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to MYP Corporation answer now due 1/24/2020; Suk Chang answer now due 1/24/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants MYP Corporation; Suk Chang.(Attorney Lawrence J Hilton added to party Suk Chang(pty:dft), Attorney Lawrence J Hilton added to party MYP Corporation(pty:dft))(Hilton, Lawrence)
December 9, 2019 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Baskin-Robbins Franchising, LLC, DB Real Estate Assets I, LLC, BR IP Holder LLC, upon Defendant Suk Chang served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Suk Chang, an individual in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Gurnick, David)
December 9, 2019 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Baskin-Robbins Franchising, LLC, DB Real Estate Assets I, LLC, BR IP Holder LLC, upon Defendant MYP Corporation served on 12/4/2019, answer due 12/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Suk Chang, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Gurnick, David)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 2/10/2020 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 2/3/2020. (rrp)
November 22, 2019 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Suk Chang, MYP Corporation. (es)
November 21, 2019 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiffs BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising, LLC, DB Real Estate Assets I, LLC. (Wolf, Samuel)
November 21, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request, #9 . The following error(s) was found: The case number and/or judge(s)initials are incorrect. Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. Case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick and Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (es)
November 20, 2019 Filing 12 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
November 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error, the Case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick and Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings. The case will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:19-cv-02232 JVS (JDEx). (jtil)
November 20, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising, LLC, DB Real Estate Assets I, LLC. (Wolf, Samuel)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiffs BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising, LLC, DB Real Estate Assets I, LLC. (Wolf, Samuel)
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (jtil)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil)
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiffs BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising, LLC, DB Real Estate Assets I, LLC. (Wolf, Samuel)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Wolf, Samuel)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising, LLC, DB Real Estate Assets I, LLC. (Wolf, Samuel)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24795048 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Baskin-Robbins Franchising, LLC, DB Real Estate Assets I, LLC, BR IP Holder LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Attorney Samuel Charles Wolf added to party BR IP Holder LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Samuel Charles Wolf added to party Baskin-Robbins Franchising, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Samuel Charles Wolf added to party DB Real Estate Assets I, LLC(pty:pla))(Wolf, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baskin Robbins Franchising, LLC et al v. MYP Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suk Chang
Represented By: Lawrence J Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYP Corporation
Represented By: Lawrence J Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BR IP Holder LLC
Represented By: Samuel Charles Wolf
Represented By: David C Gurnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DB Real Estate Assets I, LLC
Represented By: Samuel Charles Wolf
Represented By: David C Gurnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baskin-Robbins Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Samuel Charles Wolf
Represented By: David C Gurnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?