Stormborn Technologies LLC v. Moxa Americas, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stormborn Technologies LLC
Defendant: Moxa Americas, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv02302
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (ake)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE AND ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER AND/OR REASSIGNMENT OF PATENT CASE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Case transferred from Judge Josephine L. Staton to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. Case number now reads 8:19-cv-02302 JAK(ADSx). (rn)
December 9, 2019 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit B to Initial Complaint)(Anderson, Kirk)
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Moxa Americas, Inc. (jtil)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (jtil)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Anderson, Kirk)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Stormborn Technologies LLC (Anderson, Kirk)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Anderson, Kirk)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Anderson, Kirk)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24859472 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Stormborn Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. RE44,199, #2 Exhibit B - Exemplary Claim Chart) (Attorney Kirk J Anderson added to party Stormborn Technologies LLC(pty:pla))(Anderson, Kirk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stormborn Technologies LLC v. Moxa Americas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stormborn Technologies LLC
Represented By: Kirk J Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moxa Americas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?