Addiction Health Alliance, LLC v. UnitedHealth Group Inc et al
Plaintiff: ADDICTION HEALTH ALLIANCE, LLC
Defendant: UHC OF CALIFORNIA,, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, a Connecticut Corporation, VIANT, INC.,, OPTUM, INC.,, Optum Services, Inc., UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, INC, UnitedHealth Group Inc, OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., a Delaware corporation, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES LLC, MULTIPLAN, INC.,, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., UHC of California, Optum, Inc., Viant, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, Multiplan, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., United Behavioral Health, Inc. and Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2019cv02372
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE Of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement on Behalf of Defendants, Viant Inc and Multiplan, Inc. filed by Defendants Viant, Inc.. (Wallis, Jenifer)
January 31, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Edward Susolik counsel for Plaintiff Addiction Health Alliance, LLC. Changing email to esr@callahan-law.com. Filed by Plaintiff Addiction Health Alliance, LLC. (Susolik, Edward)
January 9, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge James V. Selna: The Court discusses handling these matters in phases, possibly like a multi-district litigation matter. Scheduling Conferences are continued to February 6, 2020 at 8:00 a.m. A joint report to be filed by January 30, 2020. The Scheduling Conference in case SACV 19-02087JVS(DFMx) is continued from January 27, 2020 to February 6, 2020 at 8:00 a.m. The Scheduling Conference in case SACV 19-02372JVS(DFMx) is continued from February 3, 2020 to February 6, 2020 at 8:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (es)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 2/3/2020 at 10:00 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 1/27/2020. (mku)
January 3, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by plaintiff Addiction Health Alliance, LLC.(Attorney Adrian L Canzoneri added to party Addiction Health Alliance, LLC(pty:pla))(Canzoneri, Adrian)
January 2, 2020 Filing 15 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 to 7 days, filed by Plaintiff Addiction Health Alliance, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Presumptive Schedule of Pretrial Dates)(Collins, Richard)
December 31, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Optum Services, Inc., Optum, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., UHC of California, United Behavioral Health, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare Services LLC, United Healthcare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc. Motion set for hearing on 2/24/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Jullie Bullock, #3 Proposed Order) (Grant, Michelle)
December 30, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Multiplan, Inc., Viant, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/24/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Jenifer C Wallis added to party Multiplan, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jenifer C Wallis added to party Viant, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Wallis, Jenifer)
December 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE to Federal Court of Having Filed Notice of Filing Notice of Removal filed by defendants Optum Services, Inc., Optum, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., UHC of California, United Behavioral Health, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare Services LLC, United Healthcare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc. (Gupta, Divya)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING #10 Non-Resident Attorney Michelle S. Grant APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant(s) UnitedHealth Group, Inc.; United Healthcare Services, Inc.; UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company; UHC of California; United Healthcare Services LLC; United Behavioral Health, Inc.; OptumInsight, Inc.; Optum Services, Inc.; and Optum, Inc., designating Divya S. Gupta as local counsel. (es)
December 16, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michelle S. Grant to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Optum Services, Inc., Optum, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., UHC of California, United Behavioral Health, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare Services LLC, United Healthcare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24960222) filed by defendants Optum Services, Inc., Optum, Inc., Optuminsight, Inc., UHC of California, United Behavioral Health, Inc., United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare Services LLC, United Healthcare Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gupta, Divya)
December 16, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United Healthcare Services LLC answer now due 12/31/2019; United Healthcare Services, Inc. answer now due 12/31/2019; United Behavioral Health, Inc. answer now due 12/31/2019; Optum Services, Inc. answer now due 12/31/2019; UnitedHealth Group Inc answer now due 12/31/2019; Optuminsight, Inc. answer now due 12/31/2019; United Healthcare Insurance Company answer now due 12/31/2019; Optum, Inc. answer now due 12/31/2019; UHC of California answer now due 12/31/2019, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by defendants United Healthcare Services LLC; United Healthcare Services, Inc.; United Behavioral Health, Inc.; Optum Services, Inc.; UnitedHealth Group Inc; Optuminsight, Inc.; United Healthcare Insurance Company; Optum, Inc.; UHC of California.(Gupta, Divya)
December 13, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michelle S. Grant. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil)
December 9, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Addiction Health Alliance, LLC in Orange County Superior Court on 10/29/2019, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendants OPTUM, INC.,, OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., a Delaware corporation, Optum Services, Inc., UHC OF CALIFORNIA,, UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, INC, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES LLC, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, a Connecticut Corporation, identifying UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INC; UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC; UNITEDHEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY; UHC OF CALIFORNIA;UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES LLC;UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, INC; OPTUMINSIGHT, INC.;OPTUM SERVICES, INC.; OPTUM, INC.. (Gupta, Divya)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendants OPTUM, INC.,, OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., a Delaware corporation, Optum Services, Inc., UHC OF CALIFORNIA,, UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, INC, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES LLC, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, a Connecticut Corporation. Related Case(s): 8:19-cv-02075; 8:19-cv-02082; 8:19-cv-02083; 8:19-cv-02084;8:19-cv-02085;8:19-cv-02086; 8:19-cv-02087; 8:19-cv-02088; (Gupta, Divya)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants OPTUM, INC.,, OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., a Delaware corporation, Optum Services, Inc., UHC OF CALIFORNIA,, UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, INC, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES LLC, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., UnitedHealth Group Inc, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, a Connecticut Corporation. (Gupta, Divya)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01108423 Receipt No: 0973-24919517 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES LLC, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, INC, Optum Services, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Inc, OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., a Delaware corporation, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, a Connecticut Corporation, OPTUM, INC.,, UHC OF CALIFORNIA,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Julie Bullock in Support of Notice of Removal) (Attorney Divya Gupta added to party OPTUM, INC.,(pty:dft), Attorney Divya Gupta added to party OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., a Delaware corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Divya Gupta added to party Optum Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Divya Gupta added to party UHC OF CALIFORNIA,(pty:dft), Attorney Divya Gupta added to party UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, INC (pty:dft), Attorney Divya Gupta added to party UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Divya Gupta added to party UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Divya Gupta added to party UnitedHealth Group Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Divya Gupta added to party UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, a Connecticut Corporation(pty:dft))(Gupta, Divya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Addiction Health Alliance, LLC v. UnitedHealth Group Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UHC OF CALIFORNIA,
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, a Connecticut Corporation
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIANT, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUM, INC.,
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Services, Inc.
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH, INC
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Inc
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUMINSIGHT, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES LLC
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MULTIPLAN, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UHC of California
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viant, Inc.
Represented By: Jenifer C Wallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Multiplan, Inc.
Represented By: Jenifer C Wallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optuminsight, Inc.
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Behavioral Health, Inc.
Represented By: Divya Gupta
Represented By: Michelle S Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADDICTION HEALTH ALLIANCE, LLC
Represented By: Edward Susolik
Represented By: Damon D Eisenbrey
Represented By: Adrian L Canzoneri
Represented By: Richard T Collins
Represented By: Daniel J Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?