Marilu F. Touma v. The U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission EEOC et al
Plaintiff: Marilu F. Touma and Marilu F Touma
Defendant: Paradom Agency, EEOC employee 3, The U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission EEOC, EEOC employee 2, EEOC employee 1, Unknown officer name Paradom, Ramiro Gutierrez, Orange County Department of Social Service, Jeff Molina, Federal Protective Service, Adult Protective Services, Rosa Viramontes, Unknow First Name Escobar, Does 1 through 10, Inclusive, Diane Arteaga, Unknown First Name Lynd and Erica Sarabia
Case Number: 8:2019cv02412
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Valerie Baker Fairbank
2 Judge: Josephine L Staton
3 Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson, re Complaint #1 . If Plaintiff still wishes to pursue this action, she is granted twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Memorandum and Order within which to file a First Amended Complaint or a signed Notice of Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (see document for further details) (Attachments: #1 Civil Rights Complaint Form) (hr)
January 8, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank: GRANTING #4 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (shb)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (hr)
December 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Upon further review, a determination has been made that the clerk assigned this case incorrectly. Pursuant to General Order 05-07, this case is appropriate for review and issuance of a report and recommendation by a magistrate judge. Due to the existence of prior case 8:17-cv-01132-VBF-KS, this case will be directly reassigned to Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson for review. The case will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:19-cv-02412 VBF(KS). (rn)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (et)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff Marilu F. Touma. (et)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Marilu F. Touma. (et)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Marilu F. Touma. (et)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Adult Protective Services, Diane Arteaga, Does, EEOC employee 1, EEOC employee 2, EEOC employee 3, Unknow First Name Escobar, Federal Protective Service, Ramiro Gutierrez, Unknown First Name Lynd, Jeff Molina, Orange County Department of Social Service, Paradom Agency, Erica Sarabia, The U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission EEOC, Unknown officer name Paradom, Rosa Viramontes.Case assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Marilu F. Touma. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marilu F. Touma v. The U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission EEOC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paradom Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EEOC employee 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission EEOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EEOC employee 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EEOC employee 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown officer name Paradom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramiro Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orange County Department of Social Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Protective Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adult Protective Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosa Viramontes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknow First Name Escobar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Arteaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown First Name Lynd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica Sarabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilu F. Touma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilu F Touma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?