Fuqing Qian v. Van Dinh et al
Plaintiff: Fuqing Qian and Frank Qian
Defendant: Cloudbreak Therapeutics, LLC, Van Dinh and Does 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2019cv02439
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION to Amend Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Fuqing Qian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ho, Roland)
February 4, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Emily Lacey Rice counsel for Defendants Cloudbreak Therapeutics, LLC, Van Dinh. Adding E. Lacey Rice as counsel of record for Defendants VAN DINH, and CLOUDBREAK THERAPEUTICS, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants VAN DINH, and CLOUDBREAK THERAPEUTICS, LLC. (Attorney Emily Lacey Rice added to party Cloudbreak Therapeutics, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Lacey Rice added to party Van Dinh (pty:dft))(Rice, Emily)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. The Scheduling Conference is set for 3/20/2020 at 10:30 a.m. See document for details. (tg)
February 3, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephen J Erigero counsel for Defendants Cloudbreak Therapeutics, LLC, Van Dinh. Adding E. LACEY RICE as counsel of record for VAN DINH, and CLOUDBREAK THERAPEUTICS, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by DEFENDANTS VAN DINH, and CLOUDBREAK THERAPEUTICS, LLC. (Erigero, Stephen)
February 3, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephen J Erigero counsel for Defendants Cloudbreak Therapeutics, LLC, Van Dinh. Adding Stephen J. Erigero as counsel of record for Defendants VAN DINH, and CLOUDBREAK THERAPEUTICS, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants VAN DINH, and CLOUDBREAK THERAPEUTICS, LLC. (Attorney Stephen J Erigero added to party Cloudbreak Therapeutics, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen J Erigero added to party Van Dinh (pty:dft))(Erigero, Stephen)
February 3, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Cloudbreak Therapeutics, LLC, Van Dinh, identifying Fuqing Qian, Van Dinh, Cloudbreak Therapeutics, LLC, Jun Zhi Li, Beijing Joint Medical, Technology Co., Ltd., Bright Future Pharmaceutical Laboratories Ltd., Saier Holdings (Asia) Company Limited, Brillimedical International Corporation, Whitcup Life Sciences LLC, Water Lily, John Hovanesian, VD&TL Capital, YDD Consulting, Freedom Specialty Insurance Company. (Do, Jessica)
February 3, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Cloudbreak Therapeutics, LLC, Van Dinh.(Attorney Jessica Bich Anh Do added to party Cloudbreak Therapeutics, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica Bich Anh Do added to party Van Dinh (pty:dft))(Do, Jessica)
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Fuqing Qian, (Ho, Roland)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg)
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Cloudbreak Therapeutics, LLC. (lh)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Van Dinh. (lh)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (lh)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Fuqing Qian. (Ho, Roland)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Fuqing Qian. (Ho, Roland)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Fuqing Qian. (Ho, Roland)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24970550 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Fuqing Qian. (Attorney Roland Yin-Chia Ho added to party Fuqing Qian (pty:pla))(Ho, Roland)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuqing Qian v. Van Dinh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cloudbreak Therapeutics, LLC
Represented By: Stephen J Erigero
Represented By: Jessica Bich Anh Do
Represented By: Emily Lacey Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Dinh
Represented By: Stephen J Erigero
Represented By: Jessica Bich Anh Do
Represented By: Emily Lacey Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fuqing Qian
Represented By: Roland Yin-Chia Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Qian
Represented By: Roland Yin-Chia Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?