Misty Johnson v. Norwegian Air Shuttle ASA, et al
Plaintiff: MISTY JOHNSON
Defendant: NORWEGIAN AIR SHUTTLE ASA and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 8:2019cv02488
Filed: December 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #12 Non-Resident Attorney Abram I. Bohrer APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Misty Johnson Plaintiff, designating Kyle P. Schneberg as local counsel. (twdb)
February 4, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First REQUEST of Non-Resident Attorney Abram I. Bohrer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Misty Johnson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25247716) #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Other error(s) with document(s): Document is an Application, not a Request. (lt)
February 3, 2020 Filing 12 First REQUEST of Non-Resident Attorney Abram I. Bohrer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Misty Johnson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25247716) filed by plaintiff Misty Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Pro Hac Vice Application) (Schneberg, Kyle)
February 3, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Misty Johnson. upon Norwegian Air Shuttle ASA waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/28/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Christian Johnson. (Schneberg, Kyle)
January 7, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Abram I. Bohrer on behalf of Plaintiff Misty Johnson. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (lt)
December 27, 2019 Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (rrp)
December 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Abram I Bohrer. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
December 27, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Norwegian Air Shuttle ASA. (esa)
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (esa)
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff MISTY JOHNSON. (Schneberg, Kyle)
December 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff MISTY JOHNSON, (Schneberg, Kyle)
December 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff MISTY JOHNSON. (Schneberg, Kyle)
December 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25015920 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff MISTY JOHNSON. (Attorney Kyle Philip Schneberg added to party MISTY JOHNSON(pty:pla))(Schneberg, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Misty Johnson v. Norwegian Air Shuttle ASA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORWEGIAN AIR SHUTTLE ASA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MISTY JOHNSON
Represented By: Kyle Philip Schneberg
Represented By: Abram I Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?