DB Residential, LLC v. Pamela D. Lawson et al
Plaintiff: DB Residential, LLC
Defendant: Pamela D. Lawson and Does 1 to 5
Case Number: 8:2019cv02513
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: John D Early
2 Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Filing 16 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Orange County Superior Court, West Justice Center. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Orange County Superior Court, West Justice Center. (twdb)
February 20, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Incorrect document attached to the docket entry. Disregard document #14, Re: Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) #14 (twdb)
February 18, 2020 Filing 14 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Orange County Superior Court, West Justice Center. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Orange County Superior Court, West Justice Center. (twdb)
February 18, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge David O. Carter: Granting #9 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Remand Case to State Court. Case Remanded to Orange County Superior Court, Harbor Justice Center. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: CourtSmart. (twdb)
February 14, 2020 Filing 12 Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Remand Case to ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT - HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER #9 filed by Defendant Pamela D. Lawson. (twdb)
February 11, 2020 Filing 11 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter. The Court hereby sets the First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Remand Case to ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT - HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER #9 for hearing on 2/18/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 11, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF DB Residential, LLC, (Rothman, Larry)
February 11, 2020 Filing 9 First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Remand Case to ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT - HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER filed by PLAINTIFF DB Residential, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO REMAND, #2 Exhibit REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE, #3 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT) (Attorney Larry Rothman added to party DB Residential, LLC(pty:pla)) (Rothman, Larry)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO Local Rule 83-1.3.1 and General Order 19-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:12-cv-00247 DOC(RNBx). Case referred from Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth to Magistrate Judge John D. Early for Discovery. The case number will now read as follows: 8:19-cv-02513 DOC(JDEx). Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (rn)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 3/2/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (rrp)
January 3, 2020 Filing 6 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (rrp)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
December 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (ghap)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER of Pamela Lawson and Michael Meehan to Complaint Notice of Removal, #1 filed by Defendant Pamela D. Lawson.(ghap)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO: The Clerk of the Orange County Superior Court-West Justice Center and Adverse Party, Plaintiff DB Residential, LLC of Removal to Federal Court Under filed by defendant Pamela D. Lawson. (ghap)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Orange, case number 30-2019-01111641-CL-UD-WJC with CONFORMED FILED copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge David O. Carter, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Autumn D Spaeth. Filing fee $400:PAID), filed by defendant Pamela D. Lawson. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DB Residential, LLC v. Pamela D. Lawson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela D. Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DB Residential, LLC
Represented By: Steven D Silverstein
Represented By: Larry Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?