Tu Thi Nguyen v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., et al
Plaintiff: Tu Thi Nguyen
Defendant: DOES 1-100, inclusive,, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,, CLEAR RECON CORP.,, Clear Recon Corp., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2019cv02517
Filed: December 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
February 20, 2020 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #12 filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Williams, Dawn)
February 20, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 4/6/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Williams, Dawn)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #10 . Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 2/20/2020. (twdb)
February 3, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to February 20, 2020 re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Williams, Dawn)
January 17, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #8 served on 1/17/2020. (Williams, Dawn)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
January 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge John D. Early. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 8:19-cv-02517 DOC(JDEx). (rn)
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (esa)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,.(Williams, Dawn)
December 31, 2019 COPY OF SERVICE OF PROCESS TRANSMITTAL executed by Plaintiff Tu Thi Nguyen, upon Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. served on 12/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Process of Service by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 2) (esa)
December 31, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Clear Recon Corp., Does, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Filing fee $ 400), filed by plaintiff Tu Thi Nguyen. (filed in state court 11/26/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 4) (esa)
December 31, 2019 Filing 4 Proof of Service filed by Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., re: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 (Williams, Dawn)
December 31, 2019 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,, identifying JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Williams, Dawn)
December 31, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,. (Williams, Dawn)
December 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01114654-CU-OR-CJC Receipt No: 0973-25038777 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, Complaint, Exhibits, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant Clear Recon Corp's Declaration of Non-Monetary Status) (Attorney Dawn Nicole Williams added to party JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,(pty:dft))(Williams, Dawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tu Thi Nguyen v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-100, inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,
Represented By: Dawn Nicole Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAR RECON CORP.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Recon Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Dawn Nicole Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tu Thi Nguyen
Represented By: Timothy George McFarlin
Represented By: Jarrod Yutaka Nakano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?