Paks Trading Europe B.V. v. Target Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Paks Trading Europe B.V.
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, Target Cor[poration, Hybrid Promotions LLC and Hybrid Promotions LLC individually and doing business as "JUNK FOOD", a California Limited Liability Company doing business as Junk Food
Petitioner: Delta Apparel Inc
Case Number: 8:2019mc00013
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #24 Non-Resident Attorney Jason A. Pittman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Delta Apparel, Inc Non Party Movant, designating Nicholas J. Hoffman as local counsel. (twdb)
April 29, 2019 Filing 24 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jason A. Pittman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Movant Delta Apparel Inc (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23637386) filed by Movant Delta Apparel Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Attorney Nicholas J Hoffman added to party Delta Apparel Inc(pty:mov)) (Hoffman, Nicholas)
April 15, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Luke Adcock Shealey on behalf of Plaintiff Paks Trading Europe B.V.. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (lt)
April 9, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Tim F Williams. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (ghap)
April 9, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jason Alan Pittman. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (ghap)
April 9, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Luke Adcock Shealey. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (ghap)
April 9, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (ghap)
April 9, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap)
April 9, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error the Case has been reassigned from Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Judge Josephine L. Staton to Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick for all further proceedings. The case will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:19-mc-00013 DOC (DFMx). (esa)
April 9, 2019 Filing 16 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from South Carolina
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TRANSFERING this case and the #1 MOTION to Quash to the Central District of California to be filed in Pak's Trading Europe B.V. v. Target Corp., Hybrid Promotions, LLC, and Does 1-10, No. 8:18-cv-536-DOC-DFM (C.D. Cal.). Further, the Clerk of the Court is directed to close this action after this motion is transferred. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 3/22/19. (kmca) [Transferred from South Carolina on 4/9/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER. New case number is 6-19-cv-882-TMC. (kmca) [Transferred from South Carolina on 4/9/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Stephen Doniger added for Plaintiff. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 3/11/19.(kmca) [Transferred from South Carolina on 4/9/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen Doniger (Filing fee $250 receipt number 0420-8312526) by PAK'S TRADING EUROPE BV. Response to Motion due by 3/22/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Shealey, Luke) (Main Document 10, Attachment 1 & 2 replaced on 3/11/2019: to make the Motion the main document & Application/Affidavit the Exhibit) (kmca). [Transferred from South Carolina on 4/9/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1 MOTION to Quash Response filed by Delta Apparel Inc. (Pittman, Jason) [Transferred from South Carolina on 4/9/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Quash. Response filed by PAK'S TRADING EUROPE BV. Reply to Response to Motion due by 3/7/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Shealey, Luke) (Main Document 7 replaced on 3/1/2019: to replace with corrected document (removed declaration) as provided by filing user). (Additional attachment added on 3/1/2019: #1 Declaration of Doniger (with corrected signature)) (kmca). [Transferred from South Carolina on 4/9/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Luke Adcock Shealey on behalf of PAK'S TRADING EUROPE BV (Shealey, Luke) [Transferred from South Carolina on 4/9/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena (Filing fee $47 receipt number 0420-8272085) by Delta Apparel Inc. Response to Motion due by 2/28/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Subpoena Issued, #2 Exhibit B Notice of Doe Amendment, #3 Exhibit C Delta Apparel's Objections, #4 Exhibit D 2-5-19 Emails, #5 Exhibit E Amended Complaint)No proposed order.(kmca) Modified on 2/19/2019: to add filing fee info (kmca). [Transferred from South Carolina on 4/9/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paks Trading Europe B.V. v. Target Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Cor[poration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hybrid Promotions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hybrid Promotions LLC individually and doing business as "JUNK FOOD", a California Limited Liability Company doing business as Junk Food
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Delta Apparel Inc
Represented By: Jason Alan Pittman
Represented By: Timothy F Williams
Represented By: Nicholas J Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paks Trading Europe B.V.
Represented By: Luke Adcock Shealey
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?