Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection v. Chou Team Realty LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection
Defendant: Bilal Abdelfattah, XO Media, LLC, Certified Doc Prep, Inc., Secure Preparation Services, Inc., Kenneth Lawson, Direct Document Solutions, Inc., Bill Abdel, TDK Enterprises, LLC, Belal Abdelfattah, Chou Team Realty LLC, David Sklar, Assure Direct Services, Inc., Direct Document Solutions, LP, Cre8labs, Inc., Document Preparation Services, LP, Thomas Chou, Robert Hoose, Docu Prep Center, Inc., Docs Done Right, LP, Assure Direct Services, LP, Sean Cowell, Eduardo Martinez, Certified Doc Prep Services, LP, Docs Done Right, Inc., Secure Preparation Services, LP, Lend Tech Loans, Inc., Jawad Nesheiwat, Frank Anthony Sebreros, Chou Team Realty LLC formerly known as Chou Team Realty, Inc. doing business as Monster Loans doing business as MonsterLoans, Docu Prep Center, Inc. doing business as DocuPrep Center doing business as Certified Document Center, Chou Team Realty, Inc. and Document Preparation Services, LP doing business as DocuPrep Center doing business as Certified Document Center
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Frank Kaplan
Case Number: 8:2020cv00043
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Referring Judge: James V Selna
2 Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 159 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: MOTION to Compel Defendant Sebreros to Respond to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents #153 by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. The document is accepted as filed. Counsel shall file an Amended Notice with a timely hearing date no later than October 21, 2020. (hr)
October 15, 2020 Filing 158 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION to Compel Defendant Sebreros to Respond to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents #153 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is not timely. Other error(s) with document(s): The above motion is noticed for 26 days after filing. See Local Rule 6-1, Notice and Service of Motion: The notice of motion shall be filed with the Clerk not later than twenty-eight (28) days before the date set for hearing. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (hr)
October 14, 2020 Filing 157 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court advances the time of the Status Conference set for 10/19/2020 from 10:30 AM to 10:00 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. Hearing will be conducted remotely. The clerk will provide all parties the contact information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 13, 2020 Filing 156 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #141 Answer filed by Defendant Docs Done Right, Inc., Docs Done Right, LP, Lend Tech Loans, Inc., Eduardo Martinez, David Sklar. (Attachments: #1 Answer, #2 Answer)(Holt, David)
October 13, 2020 Filing 155 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Reardon, Colin)
October 2, 2020 Filing 153 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Defendant Sebreros to Respond to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. Motion set for hearing on 10/28/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, #2 Declaration of Colin Reardon, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Proposed Order)(Reardon, Colin)
October 2, 2020 Filing 152 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less), #151 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Stipulations > Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days). The filer used the event, Stipulations > Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less), for docketing this filing. The "30 days or less" event is used for Stipulations as to an initial complaint, pursuant to Local Rule 8-3. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Upon Stipulation #151 , IT IS ORDERED that Defendants Eduardo Martinez, Docs Done Right, Inc., Docs Done Right, LP, David Sklar, and Lend Tech Loans, Inc.'s time to file a responsive pleading to the Second Amended Complaint #141 is extended until 10/13/2020. (gk)
September 30, 2020 Filing 151 Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Docs Done Right, Inc. answer now due 10/13/2020; Docs Done Right, LP answer now due 10/13/2020; David Sklar answer now due 10/13/2020; Lend Tech Loans, Inc. answer now due 10/13/2020; Eduardo Martinez answer now due 10/13/2020, filed by defendant Docs Done Right, Inc.; Docs Done Right, LP; David Sklar; Lend Tech Loans, Inc.; Eduardo Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Holt, David)
September 28, 2020 Filing 150 Joint STIPULATION for Judgment as to Kenneth Lawson and XO Media, LLC filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reardon, Colin)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#20-122) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr., this case is transferred from Judge James V. Selna to the calendar of Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:20-cv-00043-SB-ADSx. (rrp)
September 15, 2020 Filing 148 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #141 Answer to Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Frank Anthony Sebreros.(Benice, Jeffrey)
September 15, 2020 Filing 147 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Jawad Nesheiwat, re Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #146 SERVICE OF JAWAD NESHEIWATS ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT served on 9/15/20. (Lepiscopo, Peter)
September 15, 2020 Filing 146 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #141 JAWAD NESHEIWATS ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Jawad Nesheiwat.(Lepiscopo, Peter)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT #144 by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS SO ORDERED: That Defendants' time to file a responsive pleading to the SAC is extended until September 29, 2020. (es)
September 15, 2020 Filing 144 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Docs Done Right, Inc. answer now due 9/29/2020; Docs Done Right, LP answer now due 9/29/2020; David Sklar answer now due 9/29/2020; Lend Tech Loans, Inc. answer now due 9/29/2020; Eduardo Martinez answer now due 9/29/2020, re Amended Complaint/Petition #141 filed by Defendant Docs Done Right, Inc.; Docs Done Right, LP; David Sklar; Lend Tech Loans, Inc.; Eduardo Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Holt, David)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT #142 , by Judge James V. Selna. That the responses of Relief Defendants Kenneth Lawson and XO Media, LLC to the SAC are now due on October 16, 2020. (es)
September 14, 2020 Filing 142 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to XO Media, LLC answer now due 10/16/2020, filed by XO Media and Kenneth Lawson XO Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney William I Rothbard added to party XO Media, LLC(pty:dft))(Rothbard, William)
August 26, 2020 Filing 141 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT All Defendants amending Amended Complaint/Petition #117 , filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection(Reardon, Colin)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MINUTES [IN CHAMBERS] Order Regarding Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Judge James V. Selna: For the following reasons, the Court GRANTS the motion. (See document for details.) (es)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MINUTES [IN CHAMBERS] Order Regarding Motion to Dismiss by Judge James V. Selna: For the following reasons, the Court DENIES the motion. Defendant Jawad Nesheiwat ("Nesheiwat") moved to dismiss the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau's ("the Bureau") First Amended Complaint ("FAC"). Mot., Dkt. No. 118.1 The Bureau opposed. Opp'n, Dkt. No. 127. Nesheiwat replied. Reply, Dkt. No. 129. The Court granted the Bureau leave to file a sur-reply. Sur-Reply, Dkt. No. 138. For the following reasons, the Court DENIES the motion. (See document for details.) (es)
August 19, 2020 Filing 138 SURREPLY re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case DEFENDANT JAWAD NESHEIWATS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS AND FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FOR WANT OF JURISDICTION UNDER ARTICLE III [ECF 117] #118 filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Friedl, Kevin)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUR-REPLY #133 by Judge James V. Selna: Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application is granted: Plaintiff may file a surreply of no more than six pages. All other relief is denied. (es)
August 17, 2020 Filing 136 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint #126 filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Colin Reardon, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Reardon, Colin)
August 12, 2020 Filing 135 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Jawad Nesheiwat, re Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #134 SERVICE OF DEFENDANT JAWAD NESHEIWATS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION [ECF 133] served on 08/12/20. (Lepiscopo, Peter)
August 12, 2020 Filing 134 DEFENDANT JAWAD NESHEIWATS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION [ECF 133] Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike Requests for Additional Relief Raised for First Time in Reply (Motion related),, #129 #133 filed by Defendant Jawad Nesheiwat. (Lepiscopo, Peter)
August 12, 2020 Filing 133 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike Requests for Additional Relief Raised for First Time in Reply (Motion related),, #129 filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Friedl, Kevin)
August 10, 2020 Filing 132 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #117 filed by Defendant Frank Anthony Sebreros.(Benice, Jeffrey)
August 10, 2020 Filing 131 DECLARATION of David C. Holt in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint #126 filed by Defendants Docs Done Right, Inc., Docs Done Right, LP, Eduardo Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Holt, David)
August 10, 2020 Filing 130 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Jawad Nesheiwat, re Reply (Motion related),, #129 served on 8/10/20. (Lepiscopo, Peter)
August 10, 2020 Filing 129 REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case DEFENDANT JAWAD NESHEIWATS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS AND FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FOR WANT OF JURISDICTION UNDER ARTICLE III [ECF 117] #118 filed by Defendant Jawad Nesheiwat. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #2 Declaration SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF PETER D. LEPISCOPO, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT JAWAD NESHEIWATS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS AND FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FOR WANT OF JURISDICTION UNDER ARTICLE III)(Lepiscopo, Peter)
August 6, 2020 Filing 128 NOTICE OF MEDIATION DATE filed. Mediation set for November 9, 2020.(Kaplan, Frank)
August 3, 2020 Filing 127 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case DEFENDANT JAWAD NESHEIWATS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS AND FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FOR WANT OF JURISDICTION UNDER ARTICLE III [ECF 117] #118 filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kathleen L. Kraninger)(Reardon, Colin)
July 30, 2020 Filing 126 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. Motion set for hearing on 8/31/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Redline of Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #4 Proposed Order) (Reardon, Colin)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: GRANTING #124 Non-Resident Attorney Kevin E. Friedl APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection, designating Leanne E. Hartmann as local counsel. (es)
July 23, 2020 Filing 124 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin E. Friedl to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Designation as Local Counsel, #2 Proposed Order) (Hartmann, Leanne)
July 23, 2020 Filing 123 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reardon, Colin)
July 15, 2020 Filing 122 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Assure Direct Services, Inc. (es)
July 14, 2020 Filing 121 APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Assure Direct Services, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Application for Clerk to Enter Default) (Reardon, Colin)
July 13, 2020 Filing 120 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Frank Kaplan has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
July 13, 2020 Filing 119 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Jawad Nesheiwat, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case DEFENDANT JAWAD NESHEIWATS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS AND FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FOR WANT OF JURISDICTION UNDER ARTICLE III [ECF 117] #118 served on 7/13/20. (Lepiscopo, Peter)
July 13, 2020 Filing 118 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case DEFENDANT JAWAD NESHEIWATS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS AND FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FOR WANT OF JURISDICTION UNDER ARTICLE III [ECF 117] filed by Defendant Jawad Nesheiwat. Motion set for hearing on 8/24/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT JAWAD NESHEIWATS MOTION TO DISMISS AND FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FOR WANT OF JURISDICTION UNDER ARTICLE III, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Declaration DECLARATION OF PETER D. LEPISCOPO, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT JAWAD NESHEIWATS MOTION TO DISMISS AND FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FOR WANT OF JURISDICTION UNDER ARTICLE III, #6 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS OR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS, #7 Supplement DEFENDANT JAWAD NESHEIWATS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS AND FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS FOR WANT OF JURISDICTION UNDER ARTICLE III) (Lepiscopo, Peter)
July 10, 2020 Filing 117 First AMENDED COMPLAINT All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection(Reardon, Colin)
July 9, 2020 Filing 116 STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Frank Kaplan may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection(Reardon, Colin)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER AS TO ROBERT HOOSE by Judge James V. Selna. The Bureau and Defendant Hoose agree to entry of this Stipulated Final Judgment and Order (Order), without adjudication of any issue of fact or law, to settle and resolve all matters in dispute between these parties. #114 IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: 12. A judgment for monetary relief is entered in favor of the Bureau and against Defendant, in the amount of $7,000,000 for the purpose of providing redress to Affected Consumers; however, full payment of this judgment will be suspended upon satisfaction of the obligations in Paragraphs [13 through 17] of this Section and Paragraphs [26 through 30 and 32] of Section VIII [Additional Monetary Provisions] and subject to Section VI [Effect of Misrepresentation or Omission of Financial Condition] of this Order. *See document for further details.* (es)
July 7, 2020 Filing 114 Joint STIPULATION for Judgment as to Robert Hoose filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reardon, Colin)
June 25, 2020 Filing 113 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Frank Anthony Sebreros.(Attorney Jeffrey S Benice added to party Frank Anthony Sebreros(pty:dft))(Benice, Jeffrey)
June 17, 2020 Filing 112 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Jawad Nesheiwat, re Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #111 served on 6/17/20. (Lepiscopo, Peter)
June 17, 2020 Filing 111 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Jawad Nesheiwat.(Lepiscopo, Peter)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, #109 by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS SO ORDERED: That the response of Defendant Hoose to the Bureau's Complaint, currently due on or about June 19, 2020, is now due on July 6, 2020. (es)
June 15, 2020 Filing 109 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Robert Hoose answer now due 7/6/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reardon, Colin)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Regarding Motion to Dismiss by Judge James V. Selna: For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS the motion. The Bureau has 30 days to replead against the Relief Defendants. The Court finds that oral argument would not be helpful in this matter and vacates the June 15, 2020 hearing. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. *See document for details.* (es)
June 10, 2020 Filing 107 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #105 , Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #104 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (es)
June 8, 2020 Filing 106 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant David Sklar.(Attorney David C Holt added to party David Sklar(pty:dft))(Holt, David)
June 8, 2020 Filing 105 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Lend Tech Loans, Inc..(Attorney David C Holt added to party Lend Tech Loans, Inc.(pty:dft))(Holt, David)
June 8, 2020 Filing 104 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Docs Done Right, Inc., Docs Done Right, LP, Eduardo Martinez.(Attorney David C Holt added to party Docs Done Right, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David C Holt added to party Docs Done Right, LP(pty:dft))(Holt, David)
June 8, 2020 Filing 103 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection, upon Defendant Assure Direct Services, Inc. served on 6/4/2020, answer due 6/25/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon California Secretary of State in compliance with statute not specified by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Reardon, Colin)
June 8, 2020 Filing 102 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection, upon Defendant Frank Anthony Sebreros served on 6/4/2020, answer due 6/25/2020. in compliance with statute not specified by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Reardon, Colin)
June 5, 2020 Filing 101 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Assure Direct Services, LP (es)
June 4, 2020 Filing 100 APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Assure Direct Services, LP filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Reardon, Colin)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) [IN CHAMBERS] Order Regarding Motion to Dismiss by Judge James V. Selna: For the foregoing reasons, the Court DENIES the motion. The Court finds that oral argument would not be helpful in this matter and vacates the June 8, 2020 hearing. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. *See order for details.* (es)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Regarding Motion to Serve Defendants by Alternative Means and to Extend Time to Serve Them by Judge James V. Selna: For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS the motion. The Court finds that oral argument would not be helpful in this matter and vacates the June 8, 2020 hearing. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. (see order for details.) (es)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth re Stipulation for Protective Order #95 . (see document for details) (hr)
June 1, 2020 Filing 96 REPLY in support of a motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and supporting memorandum of points and authorities and declaration filed by relief defendant XO Media, LLC and #69 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for motion to dismiss - proposed order filed by relief defendant XO Media, LLC and #70 Kenneth Lawson filed by Defendant Kenneth Lawson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Rothbard, William)
May 29, 2020 Filing 95 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reardon, Colin)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #93 , by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS SO ORDERED: That the response of Defendant Hoose to the Bureau's Complaint, currently due on or about May 22, 2020, is now due on June 19, 2020. (es)
May 20, 2020 Filing 93 Third STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Robert Hoose answer now due 6/19/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reardon, Colin)
May 15, 2020 Filing 92 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and supporting memorandum of points and authorities and declaration filed by relief defendant XO Media, LLC and #69 filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Colin Reardon, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S)(Reardon, Colin)
May 15, 2020 Filing 91 [IN CHAMBERS] SCHEDULING NOTICE: On the Court's own motion, the MOTION to Dismiss Case #56 previously set for 5/18/2020 at 1:30 pm is continued to 6/8/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER AS TO CHOU TEAM REALTY, LLC; THOMAS CHOU; SEAN COWELL; CRE8LABS, INC.; AND TDK ENTERPRISES, LLC #89 by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: 12. A judgment for monetary relief is entered in favor of the Bureau and against Corporate Defendant, in the amount of $18,000,000 for the purposeof providing redress to Affected Consumers; however, full payment of this judgment will be suspended upon satisfaction of the obligations in Paragraphs 13 and 15 through 18 of this Section and Paragraphs 33 through 37 and 39 of Section VIII and subject to Section VI of this Order. (See order for details.) (es)
May 14, 2020 Filing 89 Joint STIPULATION for Judgment as to Chou Team Realty, LLC; Thomas Chou; Sean Cowell; TDK Enterprises, LLC; and Cre8labs, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reardon, Colin)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #87 , by Judge James V. Selna. #87 IT IS SO ORDERED: That the responses of Defendants Eduardo Martinez, Docs Done Right, Inc., Docs Done Right, LP, David Sklar and Lend Tech Loans, Inc. to Plaintiff's Complaint are now due on June 8, 2020. (es) Modified on 6/10/2020 (es).
May 8, 2020 Filing 87 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to 6/8/2020 filed by defendant Eduardo Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Signed Application) (Attorney David C Holt added to party Eduardo Martinez(pty:dft)) (Holt, David)
May 8, 2020 Filing 86 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Serve Defendants Assure Direct Services, Inc. and Frank Anthony Sebreros filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. Motion set for hearing on 6/8/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Serve Defendants Assure Direct Services, Inc. and Frank Anthony Sebreros by Alternative Means and to Extend Time to Serve Them, #2 Declaration of Colin Reardon, #3 Declaration of Dani Schneider, #4 Declaration of Thomas Chou, #5 Proposed Order) (Reardon, Colin)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Granting Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less), #84 , by Judge James V. Selna. That the responses of Defendant Chou Team Realty, LLC f/k/a Chou Team Realty, Inc., d/b/a Monster Loans, d/b/a Monster Loans; Defendants and Relief Defendants Thomas "Tom" Chou and Sean Cowell; and Relief Defendants Cre8Labs, Inc. and TDK Enterprises, LLC to the Bureaus Complaint are now due on May 22, 2020. (es)
May 8, 2020 Filing 84 Third STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Thomas Chou answer now due 5/22/2020; Chou Team Realty LLC answer now due 5/22/2020; Sean Cowell answer now due 5/22/2020; Cre8labs, Inc. answer now due 5/22/2020; TDK Enterprises, LLC answer now due 5/22/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint)(Reardon, Colin)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MINUTES [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER RE SCHEDULING DATES by Judge James V. Selna: The Court has read and considered the parties Rule 26(f) Report and sets the following dates: Jury Trial July 13, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. Final PreTrial Conference June 28, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. Discovery Cut-off March 29, 2021. Expert Discovery Cut-off February 15, 2021. Law and Motion Cut-off May 24, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. Last Day to Amend Pleadings or Add Parties July 31, 2020. The Court orders that any settlement discussions shall be completed not later than November 30, 2020. The Scheduling Conference set for May 11, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. is VACATED. A Status Conference is set for October 19, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. Counsel shall file a joint report by October 12, 2020. (See order for further details and deadlines.) (es)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL SETTING DATES; PREPARATION FOR TRIAL; AND GOVERNING ATTORNEY AND PARTY CONDUCT AT TRIAL before Judge James V. Selna. (See Document for Details and Deadlines) (lb)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANTS FRANK ANTHONY SEBREROS AND ASSURE DIRECT SERVICES, INC. #67 by Judge James V. Selna: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff's time to serve Defendants Frank Anthony Sebreros and Assure Direct Services, Inc. is hereby extended to May 8, 2020. (es)
May 4, 2020 Filing 80 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Jawad Nesheiwat, re Reply (Motion related) #79 Re DEFENDANT JAWAD NESHEIWATS REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS served on 5/4/2020. (Lepiscopo, Peter)
May 4, 2020 Filing 79 REPLY Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #56 filed by Defendant Jawad Nesheiwat. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lepiscopo, Peter)
May 4, 2020 Filing 78 JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Reardon, Colin)
April 27, 2020 Filing 77 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #56 filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Reardon, Colin)
April 24, 2020 Filing 76 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Certified Doc Prep, Inc. (es)
April 22, 2020 Filing 75 APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Certified Doc Prep, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Colin Reardon in Support of Application for Clerk to Enter Default) (Reardon, Colin)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #73 , by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS SO ORDERED: That the response of Defendant Hoose to the Bureau's Complaint, currently due on or about April 22, 2020, is now due on May 22, 2020. (es)
April 16, 2020 Filing 73 Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Robert Hoose answer now due 5/22/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order To Extend Time to Respond to Complaint)(Reardon, Colin)
April 16, 2020 Filing 72 DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection, re Summons Request #59 , APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants Bilal Abdelfattah, Certified Doc Prep Services, LP, Direct Document Solutions, Inc., Direct Document Solutions, LP, Docu Prep Center, Inc., Document Preparation Services, LP, Secure Preparatio #68 , Order Extending Answer Due Deadline, #65 , Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #61 , Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less), #62 , Waiver of Service Executed, #63 , Summons Issued #60 , Order Extending Answer Due Deadline #64 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Serve Defendants Frank Anthony Sebreros and Assure Direct Services, Inc. #67 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #66 served on 04/16/20. (Reardon, Colin)
April 10, 2020 Filing 71 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to 1. Docu Prep Center, Inc., d/b/a DocuPrep Center, d/b/a Certified Document Center; 2. Document Preparation Services, LP, d/b/a DocuPrep Center, d/b/a Certified Document Center; 3. Certified Doc Prep Services, LP; 4. Direct Document Solutions, Inc.; 5. Direct Document Solutions, LP; 6. Secure Preparation Services, Inc.; 7. Secure Preparation Services, LP; and 8. Bilal Abdelfattah, a/k/a Belal Abdelfattah, a/k/a Bill Abdel. (es)
April 9, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for motion to dismiss - proposed order filed by relief defendant XO Media, LLC and filed by relief defendant Kenneth Lawson. Motion set for hearing on 6/15/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Rothbard, William)
April 9, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and supporting memorandum of points and authorities and declaration filed by relief defendant XO Media, LLC and filed by relief defendant Kenneth Lawson. Motion set for hearing on 6/15/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Attorney William I Rothbard added to party Kenneth Lawson(pty:dft)) (Rothbard, William)
April 9, 2020 Filing 68 APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants Bilal Abdelfattah, Certified Doc Prep Services, LP, Direct Document Solutions, Inc., Direct Document Solutions, LP, Docu Prep Center, Inc., Document Preparation Services, LP, Secure Preparation Services, Inc., Secure Preparation Services, LP filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Colin Reardon in Support of Application for Clerk to Enter Default Against Defendants Who Have Failed to Appear) (Reardon, Colin)
April 8, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Serve Defendants Frank Anthony Sebreros and Assure Direct Services, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. Motion set for hearing on 5/11/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Extend Time to Serve Frank Anthony Sebreros and Assure Direct Services, Inc., #2 Declaration of Colin Reardon and Exhibits, #3 Declaration of Dani Schneider, #4 Declaration of Frank Harrigan, #5 Declaration of Mario Alvarado, #6 Proposed Order) (Reardon, Colin)
April 7, 2020 Filing 66 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection, upon Defendant Certified Doc Prep, Inc. served on 3/25/2020, answer due 4/15/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Haithum Abdelfattah, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Reardon, Colin)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #62 , by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS SO ORDERED: That the responses of Defendants Martinez, Sklar, Docs Done Right, Inc., Docs Done Right, LP, and Lend Tech Loans, Inc., to the Bureaus Complaint are now due on May 8, 2020. (es)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #61 , by Judge James V. Selna. Defendant(s) Thomas Chou; Chou Team Realty LLC; Sean Cowell; Cre8labs, Inc.; TDK Enterprises, LLC answer due 5/8/2020. (es)
April 7, 2020 Filing 63 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. upon Assure Direct Services, LP waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/23/2020, answer due 5/22/2020. Waiver of Service signed by David Holt. (Reardon, Colin)
April 6, 2020 Filing 62 Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Docs Done Right, Inc. answer now due 5/8/2020; Docs Done Right, LP answer now due 5/8/2020; Lend Tech Loans, Inc. answer now due 5/8/2020; Eduardo Martinez answer now due 5/8/2020; David Sklar answer now due 5/8/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reardon, Colin)
April 6, 2020 Filing 61 Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reardon, Colin)
March 24, 2020 Filing 60 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Certified Doc Prep, Inc.. (es)
March 23, 2020 Filing 59 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Reardon, Colin)
March 11, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #56 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Motion to Dismiss)(Lepiscopo, Peter)
March 11, 2020 Filing 57 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Jawad Nesheiwat, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #56 served on 3-11-20. (Lepiscopo, Peter)
March 10, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Jawad Nesheiwat. Motion set for hearing on 5/18/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum DEFENDANT JAWAD NESHEIWATS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Declaration DECLARATION OF PETER D. LEPISCOPO, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT JAWAD NESHEIWATS MOTION TO DISMISS, #10 Supplement DEFENDANT JAWAD NESHEIWATS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS) (Lepiscopo, Peter)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, #53 by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS SO ORDERED: That the response of Defendant Hoose to the Bureau's Complaint, currently due on or about March 23, 2020, is now due on April 22, 2020. (es)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TORESPOND TO COMPLAINT #53 , by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS SO ORDERED: That the responses of Defendants Martinez, Docs Done Right, Inc. Docs Done Right, LP, and Lend Tech Loans, Inc., to the Bureau's Complaint are now due on April 9, 2020. (es)
March 10, 2020 Filing 53 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Robert Hoose answer now due 4/22/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reardon, Colin)
March 10, 2020 Filing 52 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Docs Done Right, Inc. answer now due 4/9/2020; Docs Done Right, LP answer now due 4/9/2020; Lend Tech Loans, Inc. answer now due 4/9/2020; Eduardo Martinez answer now due 4/9/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reardon, Colin)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #50 , by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS SO ORDERED:That the responses to the Bureau's Complaint, currently due on or about March 10, 2020, are now due on April 9, 2020. (es)
March 5, 2020 Filing 50 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Thomas Chou answer now due 4/9/2020; Chou Team Realty LLC answer now due 4/9/2020; Sean Cowell answer now due 4/9/2020; Cre8labs, Inc. answer now due 4/9/2020; Kenneth Lawson answer now due 4/9/2020; TDK Enterprises, LLC answer now due 4/9/2020; XO Media, LLC answer now due 4/9/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reardon, Colin)
March 3, 2020 Filing 49 [IN CHAMBERS] Defendant's REQUEST for Extension of Time to File for 45 Day Extension #46 is GRANTED to 4/15/2020. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 29, 2020 Filing 48 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Peter D Lepiscopo counsel for Defendant Jawad Nesheiwat. Adding Peter D. Lepiscopo as counsel of record for Jawad Nesheiwat for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Jawad Nesheiwat. (Attorney Peter D Lepiscopo added to party Jawad Nesheiwat(pty:dft))(Lepiscopo, Peter)
February 28, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to REQUEST for Extension of Time to File for 45 Day Extension #46 filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Reardon, Colin)
February 26, 2020 Filing 46 REQUEST for 45 Day Extention filed by defendant David Sklar. (es)
February 19, 2020 Filing 45 DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection, re Waiver of Service Executed #44 served on 2/19/2020. (Reardon, Colin)
February 19, 2020 Filing 44 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. upon Lend Tech Loans, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/28/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. Waiver of Service signed by David Holt. (Reardon, Colin)
February 14, 2020 Filing 43 DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection, re Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #41 served on 02/14/2020. (Assae-Bille, Elisabeth)
February 14, 2020 Filing 42 DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection, re APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Elisabeth Vanessa Assae-Bille to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) #3 , Waiver of Service Executed, #30 , Waiver of Service Executed, #31 , Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form, #9 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #41 , Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice #8 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Waiver of Service Executed #20 , Waiver of Service Executed #19 , Waiver of Service Executed #18 , Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Elisabeth Vanessa Assae-Bille to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) #10 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Waiver of Service Executed, #21 , Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #11 , Summons Issued,,,, #13 , Waiver of Service Executed, #32 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #33 , Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #14 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #38 , Waiver of Service Executed, #29 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #34 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #37 , Waiver of Service Executed, #17 , Waiver of Service Executed, #22 , Summons Request,,,, #12 , Waiver of Service Executed #23 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Colin Reardon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) #4 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #25 , Waiver of Service Executed, #24 , Waiver of Service Executed, #28 , Waiver of Service Executed #16 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #26 , Waiver of Service Executed #15 served on 02/14/2020. (Assae-Bille, Elisabeth)
February 14, 2020 Filing 41 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection, upon Defendant Secure Preparation Services, LP served on 2/6/2020, answer due 2/27/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon David Sklar, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Assae-Bille, Elisabeth)
February 12, 2020 Filing 40 DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection, re Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #37 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #38 served on 02/12/2020. (Assae-Bille, Elisabeth)
February 12, 2020 Filing 39 DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection, re APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Elisabeth Vanessa Assae-Bille to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) #3 , Waiver of Service Executed, #30 , Waiver of Service Executed, #31 , Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form, #9 , Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice #8 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Waiver of Service Executed #20 , Waiver of Service Executed #19 , Waiver of Service Executed #18 , Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Elisabeth Vanessa Assae-Bille to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) #10 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Waiver of Service Executed, #21 , Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #11 , Summons Issued,,,, #13 , Waiver of Service Executed, #32 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #33 , Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #14 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #38 , Waiver of Service Executed, #29 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #34 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #37 , Waiver of Service Executed, #17 , Waiver of Service Executed, #22 , Summons Request,,,, #12 , Waiver of Service Executed #23 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Colin Reardon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) #4 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #25 , Waiver of Service Executed, #24 , Waiver of Service Executed, #28 , Waiver of Service Executed #16 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #26 , Waiver of Service Executed #15 served on 02/12/2020. (Assae-Bille, Elisabeth)
February 12, 2020 Filing 38 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection, upon Defendant Direct Document Solutions, LP served on 2/6/2020, answer due 2/27/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon David Sklar, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Assae-Bille, Elisabeth)
February 12, 2020 Filing 37 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection, upon Defendant David Sklar served on 2/6/2020, answer due 2/27/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon David Sklar in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Assae-Bille, Elisabeth)
February 6, 2020 Filing 36 DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection, re APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Elisabeth Vanessa Assae-Bille to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) #3 , Waiver of Service Executed, #30 , Waiver of Service Executed, #31 , Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form, #9 , Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice #8 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Waiver of Service Executed #20 , Waiver of Service Executed #19 , Waiver of Service Executed #18 , Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Elisabeth Vanessa Assae-Bille to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) #10 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Waiver of Service Executed, #21 , Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #11 , Summons Issued,,,, #13 , Waiver of Service Executed, #32 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents),,,,,,,,, #35 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #33 , Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #14 , Waiver of Service Executed, #29 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #34 , Waiver of Service Executed, #17 , Waiver of Service Executed, #22 , Summons Request,,,, #12 , Waiver of Service Executed #23 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Colin Reardon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) #4 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #25 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents),,,,,,, #27 , Waiver of Service Executed, #24 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #7 , Waiver of Service Executed, #28 , Waiver of Service Executed #16 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #26 , Waiver of Service Executed #15 served on 02/05/2020. (Assae-Bille, Elisabeth)
February 5, 2020 Filing 35 DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection, re APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Elisabeth Vanessa Assae-Bille to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) #3 , Waiver of Service Executed, #30 , Waiver of Service Executed, #31 , Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form, #9 , Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice #8 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Waiver of Service Executed #20 , Waiver of Service Executed #19 , Waiver of Service Executed #18 , Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Elisabeth Vanessa Assae-Bille to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) #10 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Waiver of Service Executed, #21 , Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #11 , Summons Issued,,,, #13 , Waiver of Service Executed, #32 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #33 , Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #14 , Waiver of Service Executed, #29 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #34 , Waiver of Service Executed, #17 , Waiver of Service Executed, #22 , Summons Request,,,, #12 , Waiver of Service Executed #23 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Colin Reardon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) #4 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #25 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents),,,,,,, #27 , Waiver of Service Executed, #24 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #7 , Waiver of Service Executed, #28 , Waiver of Service Executed #16 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #26 , Waiver of Service Executed #15 served on 02/05/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service to Previously Served Defendants and Relief Defendants)(Assae-Bille, Elisabeth)
February 5, 2020 Filing 34 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection, upon Defendant Certified Doc Prep Services, LP served on 2/3/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Haithum Abdelfattah, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Assae-Bille, Elisabeth)
February 5, 2020 Filing 33 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection, upon Defendant Certified Doc Prep, Inc. served on 2/3/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Haithum Abdelfattah, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Assae-Bille, Elisabeth)
February 5, 2020 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. upon Eduardo Martinez waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/10/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. Waiver of Service signed by David Holt. (Assae-Bille, Elisabeth)
February 5, 2020 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. upon Docs Done Right, LP waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/10/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. Waiver of Service signed by David Holt. (Assae-Bille, Elisabeth)
February 5, 2020 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. upon Docs Done Right, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/10/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. Waiver of Service signed by David Holt. (Assae-Bille, Elisabeth)
February 5, 2020 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. upon Document Preparation Services, LP waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/22/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Joshua M. Robbins. (Assae-Bille, Elisabeth)
February 5, 2020 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. upon Docu Prep Center, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/22/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Joshua M. Robbins. (Assae-Bille, Elisabeth)
January 30, 2020 Filing 27 DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection, re APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Elisabeth Vanessa Assae-Bille to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) #3 , Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form, #9 , Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice #8 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Waiver of Service Executed #20 , Waiver of Service Executed #19 , Waiver of Service Executed #18 , Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Elisabeth Vanessa Assae-Bille to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) #10 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Waiver of Service Executed, #21 , Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #11 , Summons Issued,,,, #13 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #14 , Waiver of Service Executed, #17 , Waiver of Service Executed, #22 , Summons Request,,,, #12 , Waiver of Service Executed #23 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Colin Reardon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) #4 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #25 , Waiver of Service Executed, #24 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #7 , Waiver of Service Executed #16 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #26 , Waiver of Service Executed #15 served on 01/30/2020. (Reardon, Colin)
January 30, 2020 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection, upon Defendant Secure Preparation Services, Inc. served on 1/27/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Aaron Sebreros, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Reardon, Colin)
January 30, 2020 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection, upon Defendant Direct Document Solutions, Inc. served on 1/17/2020, answer due 2/7/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jimmy A. Calderon, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Reardon, Colin)
January 30, 2020 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. upon XO Media, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/10/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. Waiver of Service signed by William I. Rothbard. (Reardon, Colin)
January 30, 2020 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. upon TDK Enterprises, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/10/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Thomas Chou. (Reardon, Colin)
January 30, 2020 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. upon Jawad Nesheiwat waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/10/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Peter D. Lepiscopo. (Reardon, Colin)
January 30, 2020 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. upon Kenneth Lawson waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/10/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. Waiver of Service signed by William I. Rothbard. (Reardon, Colin)
January 30, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. upon Robert Hoose waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/22/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Joshua M. Robbins. (Reardon, Colin)
January 30, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. upon Cre8labs, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/10/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Sean Cowell. (Reardon, Colin)
January 30, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. upon Sean Cowell waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/10/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Sean Cowell. (Reardon, Colin)
January 30, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. upon Chou Team Realty LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/10/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Mikael Van Loon. (Reardon, Colin)
January 30, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. upon Thomas Chou waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/10/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Thomas Chou. (Reardon, Colin)
January 30, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. upon Bilal Abdelfattah waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/22/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Nader Nuru. (Reardon, Colin)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 5/11/2020 at 10:30 a.m. before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 5/4/2020. (rrp)
January 15, 2020 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Bilal Abdelfattah, Assure Direct Services, Inc., Assure Direct Services, LP, Certified Doc Prep Services, LP, Certified Doc Prep, Inc., Direct Document Solutions, Inc., Direct Document Solutions, LP, Docu Prep Center, Inc., Document Preparation Services, LP, Robert Hoose, Lend Tech Loans, Inc., Frank Anthony Sebreros, Secure Preparation Services, Inc., Secure Preparation Services, LP, David Sklar. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued Assure Direct, #2 Summons issued Assure Direct LP, #3 Summons issued Certified Prep Inc, #4 Summons issued Certified Prep LP, #5 Summons Direct Solutions Inc, #6 Summons issued Direct Solutions LP, #7 Summons issued Doc Prep Inc, #8 Summons issued Doc Prep LP, #9 Summons issued Hoose, #10 Summons issued Lend Tech Loans Inc, #11 Summons issued F. Sebreros, #12 Summons issued Sklar, #13 Summons issued Secure Prep Inc, #14 Summons issued Secure Prep LP)(es)
January 14, 2020 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summons Request - Assure Direct Services, Inc., #2 Supplement Summons Request - Assure Direct Services, LP, #3 Supplement Summons Request - Certified Doc Prep Services, Inc., #4 Supplement Summons Request - Certified Doc Prep Services, LP, #5 Supplement Summons Request - Direct Document Solutions, Inc., #6 Supplement Summons Request - Direct Document Solutions, LP, #7 Supplement Summons Request - Docu Prep Center, Inc., #8 Supplement Summons Request - Document Preparation Services, LP, #9 Supplement Summons Request - Robert Hoose, #10 Supplement Summons Request - Lend Tech Loans, Inc., #11 Supplement Summons Request - Frank Anthony Sebreros, #12 Supplement Summons Request - David Sklar, #13 Supplement Summons Request - Secure Preparation Services, Inc., #14 Supplement Summons Request - Secure Preparation Services, LP)(Hartmann, Leanne)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING #10 Non-Resident Attorney Elisabeth V. Assae-Bille APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection, designating Leanne E. Hartmann as local counsel. (es)
January 13, 2020 Filing 10 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Elisabeth Vanessa Assae-Bille to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Designation as Local Counsel, #2 Proposed Order) (Hartmann, Leanne)
January 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Elisabeth Vanessa Assae-Bille to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) #3 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. (lom)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, GRANTING #4 Non-Resident Attorney Colin T. Reardon APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection, designating Leanne E. Hartmann as local counsel. (es)
January 13, 2020 Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
January 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
January 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (ghap)
January 9, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Colin Reardon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Designation as Local Counsel, #2 Proposed Order) (Hartmann, Leanne)
January 9, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Elisabeth Vanessa Assae-Bille to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Designation as Local Counsel, #2 Proposed Order) (Hartmann, Leanne)
January 9, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Hartmann, Leanne)
January 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attorney Leanne E Hartmann added to party Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection(pty:pla))(Hartmann, Leanne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection v. Chou Team Realty LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bilal Abdelfattah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XO Media, LLC
Represented By: William I Rothbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certified Doc Prep, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secure Preparation Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Lawson
Represented By: William I Rothbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Direct Document Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Abdel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TDK Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belal Abdelfattah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chou Team Realty LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sklar
Represented By: David C Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assure Direct Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Direct Document Solutions, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cre8labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Document Preparation Services, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Chou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hoose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Docu Prep Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Docs Done Right, LP
Represented By: David C Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assure Direct Services, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Cowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eduardo Martinez
Represented By: David C Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certified Doc Prep Services, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Docs Done Right, Inc.
Represented By: David C Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secure Preparation Services, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lend Tech Loans, Inc.
Represented By: David C Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jawad Nesheiwat
Represented By: Peter D Lepiscopo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Anthony Sebreros
Represented By: Jeffrey S Benice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chou Team Realty LLC formerly known as Chou Team Realty, Inc. doing business as Monster Loans doing business as MonsterLoans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Docu Prep Center, Inc. doing business as DocuPrep Center doing business as Certified Document Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chou Team Realty, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Document Preparation Services, LP doing business as DocuPrep Center doing business as Certified Document Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection
Represented By: Leanne E Hartmann
Represented By: Elisabeth V Assae-Bille
Represented By: Colin Reardon
Represented By: Leanne E. Hartmann
Represented By: Kevin E Friedl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Frank Kaplan
Represented By: Frank Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?