Little Orbit LLC v. Descendent Studios Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Little Orbit LLC
Defendant: Descendent Studios Inc. and Eric Peterson
Case Number: 8:2020cv00089
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 5/11/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (kd)
February 28, 2020 Filing 15 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Counter Claimant Descendent Studios Inc.. (Exhibit A to Descendent Studios Inc.'s Counterclaim) as to Counterclaim #12 . (Shamonki, Nada)
February 28, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Descendent Studios Inc. (Shamonki, Nada)
February 28, 2020 Filing 13 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Descendent Studios Inc., Eric Peterson, identifying Little Orbit LLC; Descendent Studios Inc.; Eric Peterson. (Shamonki, Nada)
February 28, 2020 Filing 12 COUNTERCLAIM against Counterdefendant Little Orbit LLC; Jury Demand, filed by Defendant Descendent Studios Inc..(Shamonki, Nada)
February 28, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Descendent Studios Inc., Eric Peterson.(Attorney Nada I Shamonki added to party Descendent Studios Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nada I Shamonki added to party Eric Peterson(pty:dft))(Shamonki, Nada)
February 24, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Little Orbit LLC.(Richardson, Michael)
January 21, 2020 Filing 9 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Little Orbit LLC, identifying Little Orbit LLC. (Richardson, Michael)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
January 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
January 17, 2020 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Descendent Studios Inc., Eric Peterson. (lh)
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
January 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (lh)
January 16, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Little Orbit LLC. (Richardson, Michael)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Little Orbit LLC. (Richardson, Michael)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25132892 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Little Orbit LLC. (Attorney Michael Danton Richardson added to party Little Orbit LLC(pty:pla))(Richardson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Little Orbit LLC v. Descendent Studios Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Descendent Studios Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Little Orbit LLC
Represented By: Michael Danton Richardson, Richa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?