Kaori Doling v. Toridoll Dining California, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kaori Doling
Defendant: Toridoll Dining California, LLC, Jun Goto and Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2020cv00163
Filed: January 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 14 First STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to negotiated settlement filed by Plaintiff Kaori Doling. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hankey, Jordan)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge John D. Early re Stipulation for Protective Order #12 . (see document for details) (hr)
July 29, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants Jun Goto, Toridoll Dining California, LLC.(Bednarova, Andrea)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No. 3 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Case is ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than March 5, 2021. (tg)
March 9, 2020 Filing 10 CIVIL TRIAL ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton. (tg)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTES (In Chambers) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference set for hearing March 13, 2020, is VACATED and the following schedule is set. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/7/2021 at 10:30 AM. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION). (jp)
February 28, 2020 Filing 8 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 10 days, filed by Defendants Jun Goto, Toridoll Dining California, LLC.. (Bednarova, Andrea)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Scheduling Conference is set for 3/13/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. See document for details. (tg)
January 29, 2020 Filing 6 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg)
January 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
January 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (ghap)
January 27, 2020 NON CONFORM FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendants Jun Goto, Toridoll Dining California, LLC. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(ghap)
January 27, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 20, inclusive, Jun Goto, Toridoll Dining California, LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Kaori Doling. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/04/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Toridoll Dining California, LLC, identifying Tokyo Table Holdings, LLC; Crackin' Kitchen USA, LLC; Ton-ichi USA, LLC; Toridoll Dining Corporation; Toridoll Holding Ltd. (Hong Kong); Toridoll Holdings Corporation (Japan). (Bednarova, Andrea)
January 27, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Jun Goto, Toridoll Dining California, LLC. (Bednarova, Andrea)
January 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01109516-CU-WT-CJC Receipt No: 0973-25197262 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Jun Goto, Toridoll Dining California, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A and B, #2 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Andrea Bednarova added to party Jun Goto(pty:dft), Attorney Andrea Bednarova added to party Toridoll Dining California, LLC(pty:dft))(Bednarova, Andrea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaori Doling v. Toridoll Dining California, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaori Doling
Represented By: Christian Bosuel
Represented By: Jordan Dana Hankey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toridoll Dining California, LLC
Represented By: Andrea Bednarova
Represented By: Robin Elizabeth Devaux
Represented By: Kerry McCoy Friedrichs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jun Goto
Represented By: Andrea Bednarova
Represented By: Robin Elizabeth Devaux
Represented By: Kerry McCoy Friedrichs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?