True Harmony et al v. The Department of Justice of the State of California et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey G. Thomas, Ray Haiem and True Harmony
Defendant: Hugh John Gibson, Norman Solomon, Rosario Perry, Xavier Becerra, BIHMF LLC, Hope Park Lofts 2001-02910056 LLC, Does 1 through 50 inclusive, The Department of Justice of the State of California, 1130 Hope Street Investment Associates, LLC and 1130 Hope Street Investment Associates, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as 1130 South Hope Street Investment Associates, LLC
Petitioner: State of California Dept. of Justice, Attorney General Xavier Becerra, Hope park Lofts -029-10056 LLC and 1130 Hope Street investment Associates LLC
Case Number: 8:2020cv00170
Filed: January 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2020 Filing 38 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jeffrey G. Thomas, True Harmony, upon Defendant BIHMF LLC served on 3/18/2020, answer due 4/8/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon agent for service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Thomas, Jeffrey)
March 23, 2020 Filing 37 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jeffrey G. Thomas, Ray Haiem, True Harmony, upon Defendant Hope Park Lofts 2001-02910056 LLC served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon agent for service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Thomas, Jeffrey)
March 23, 2020 Filing 36 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jeffrey G. Thomas, Ray Haiem, True Harmony, upon Defendant Norman Solomon served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Thomas, Jeffrey)
March 23, 2020 Filing 35 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jeffrey G. Thomas, Ray Haiem, True Harmony, upon Defendant Hugh John Gibson served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Thomas, Jeffrey)
March 23, 2020 Filing 34 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jeffrey G. Thomas, Ray Haiem, True Harmony, upon Defendant 1130 Hope Street Investment Associates, LLC served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon agent for service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Thomas, Jeffrey)
March 23, 2020 Filing 33 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jeffrey G. Thomas, Ray Haiem, True Harmony, upon Defendant Rosario Perry served on 3/6/2020, answer due 3/27/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Thomas, Jeffrey)
March 20, 2020 Filing 32 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Xavier Becerra answer now due 4/26/2020; The Department of Justice of the State of California answer now due 4/26/2020, re Amended Complaint/Petition #16 filed by Defendant Xavier Becerra; The Department of Justice of the State of California.(Schultz Richards, Megan)
March 18, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Megan Anne Schultz Richards on behalf of Defendants Xavier Becerra, The Department of Justice of the State of California (Attorney Megan Anne Schultz Richards added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney Megan Anne Schultz Richards added to party The Department of Justice of the State of California(pty:dft))(Schultz Richards, Megan)
February 13, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Document #27 docketed in this case in error, Re: Jury Trial - Held and Continued #27 . (twdb)
February 13, 2020 Filing 29 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition #16 as to defendant Norman Solomon. (twdb)
February 13, 2020 Filing 28 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition #16 as to defendant Hugh John Gibson. (twdb)
February 13, 2020 Filing 26 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition #16 as to defendant The Department of Justice of the State of California. (twdb)
February 13, 2020 Filing 25 60 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition #16 as to defendant Xavier Becerra. (twdb)
February 13, 2020 Filing 24 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition #16 as to defendant Rosario Perry. (twdb)
February 13, 2020 Filing 23 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition #16 as to defendant 1130 Hope Street Investment Associates, LLC. (twdb)
February 13, 2020 Filing 22 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition #16 as to defendant Hope Park Lofts 2001-02910056 LLC. (twdb)
February 13, 2020 Filing 21 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition #16 as to defendant BIHMF LLC. (twdb)
February 12, 2020 Filing 27 [DOCKETED IN THIS CASE IN ERROR] MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 2nd Day held before Judge David O. Carter: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Jury Trial set for 2/14/2020 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. Court Reporter: Debbie Gale/ Deborah Parker/ CourtSmart. (twdb) Modified on 2/13/2020 (twdb).
February 12, 2020 Filing 20 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request, #17 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,,, #19 filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey G. Thomas, True Harmony. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement, #4 Supplement, #5 Supplement, #6 Supplement, #7 Supplement)(Thomas, Jeffrey)
February 10, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request, #17 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. XAVIER BECERRA, Attorney General, personally and ex officio, (Does not match the summons request(s) RE: and XAVIER BECERRA, Attorney General of the State of California, personally and ex officio. The caption should match and then add (see attachment). The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (twdb)
February 10, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First Amended Complaint/Petition #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 19-1 Complaint/Petition includes more than 10 Does or fictitiously named parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
February 8, 2020 Filing 17 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #16 filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey G. Thomas, True Harmony. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement, #4 Supplement, #5 Supplement, #6 Supplement, #7 Supplement)(Thomas, Jeffrey)
February 8, 2020 Filing 16 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey G. Thomas, True Harmony(Thomas, Jeffrey)
February 4, 2020 Filing 15 Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant BIHMF LLC. (yl)
February 4, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Hope Park Lofts 2001-02910056 LLC. (yl)
February 4, 2020 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Hugh John Gibson. (yl)
February 4, 2020 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Norman Solomon. (yl)
January 31, 2020 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Rosario Perry. (yl)
January 31, 2020 Filing 10 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Xavier Becerra. Attorney General, personally and ex officio (yl)
January 30, 2020 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #7 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Summons Request #3 filed by plaintiff Jeffrey G. Thomas, True Harmony. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement, #4 Supplement, #5 Supplement, #6 Supplement)(Thomas, Jeffrey)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (kd)
January 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (et)
January 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
January 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (et)
January 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey G. Thomas, True Harmony, (Thomas, Jeffrey)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 Jeffrey G. Thomas, True Harmony. (Thomas, Jeffrey)
January 27, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Jeffrey G. Thomas, Plaintiff True Harmony. (Thomas, Jeffrey)
January 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25201917 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff True Harmony, Jeffrey G. Thomas, Ray Haiem. (Attorney Jeffrey G Thomas added to party Ray Haiem(pty:bkmov), Attorney Jeffrey G Thomas added to party Jeffrey G. Thomas(pty:bkmov), Attorney Jeffrey G Thomas added to party True Harmony(pty:pla))(Thomas, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: True Harmony et al v. The Department of Justice of the State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh John Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosario Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Megan Anne Schultz Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIHMF LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hope Park Lofts 2001-02910056 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Department of Justice of the State of California
Represented By: Megan Anne Schultz Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1130 Hope Street Investment Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1130 Hope Street Investment Associates, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as 1130 South Hope Street Investment Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey G. Thomas
Represented By: Jeffrey G Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Haiem
Represented By: Jeffrey G Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: True Harmony
Represented By: Jeffrey G Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of California Dept. of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Attorney General Xavier Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hope park Lofts -029-10056 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: 1130 Hope Street investment Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?