Anne Komatsu v. Alex Azar
Plaintiff: Anne Komatsu
Defendant: Alex Azar
Case Number: 8:2020cv00280
Filed: February 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Alex Azar answer now due 5/14/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Alex Azar.(Attorney David E Pinchas added to party Alex Azar(pty:dft))(Pinchas, David)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for June 8, 2020 at 10:00 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by June 1, 2020. (mku)
March 9, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Anne Komatsu, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #8 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #7 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 served on February 14, 2020. (Tabibkhoei, Farah)
February 13, 2020 Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
February 12, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Alex Azar. (lh)
February 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
February 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (lh)
February 11, 2020 Filing 4 Notice and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Anne Komatsu, identifying Plaintiff Anne Komatsu; Defendant Alex Azar; Nonparty Novocure, Inc.. (Tabibkhoei, Farah)
February 11, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by PLAINTIFF Anne Komatsu. (Tabibkhoei, Farah)
February 11, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Anne Komatsu. (Tabibkhoei, Farah)
February 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25306834 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Anne Komatsu. (Attorney Farah Tabibkhoei added to party Anne Komatsu(pty:pla))(Tabibkhoei, Farah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anne Komatsu v. Alex Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Azar
Represented By: David E Pinchas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Komatsu
Represented By: Farah Tabibkhoei
Represented By: James Charles Pistorino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?