Marty Linebarger v. Graphic Packaging International, LLC
Plaintiff: Marty Linebarger
Defendant: Graphic Packaging International, LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2020cv00309
Filed: February 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY (Sur-Reply) in Support of Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT #13 filed by Defendant Graphic Packaging International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amelia Hoke)(Jevsevar, Christopher)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REGARDING JOINT REQUEST TO SUBMIT SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE: PLAINTIFF MARTYLINEBARGER'S MOTION TO REMAND ACTION TO STATE COURT (ECF #13) by Judge James V. Selna: 1. Continue the hearing on Plaintiffs Motion to Remand, currently set for April 13, 2020, to April 20, 2020 is GRANTED. 2. Defendant is GRANTED leave to file a two-page sur-reply by April 10, 2020, limited to the issue of the effects of post-removal amendments to pleadings on the Court's removal analysis. 3. Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file a two-page reply to Defendant's sur-reply, by April 14, 2020. #22 (es)
April 7, 2020 Filing 22 Joint REQUEST to Supplement Briefing re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT #13 filed by Defendant Graphic Packaging International, LLC. Request set for hearing on 4/20/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Jevsevar, Christopher)
March 30, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT #13 filed by Plaintiff Marty Linebarger. (Schimmel, Miriam)
March 24, 2020 Filing 20 SEALED DOCUMENT - Specified Pages re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #19 filed by Defendant Graphic Packaging International, LLC.(Jevsevar, Christopher)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE EVIDENCE UNDER SEAL #15 by Judge James V. Selna. (es)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Protective Order #17 by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon was docketed on the wrong case. Please disregard in its entirety. (es)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 3/24/2020, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 18] ORDER ON STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon (es) Modified on 3/24/2020 (es).
March 23, 2020 Filing 16 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibit A to Hoke Declaration [ECF 14-1] in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand under seal #15 filed by Defendant Graphic Packaging International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document)(Jevsevar, Christopher)
March 23, 2020 Filing 15 APPLICATION to file document Exhibit A to Hoke Declaration [ECF 14-1] in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand under seal filed by Defendant Graphic Packaging International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document)(Jevsevar, Christopher)
March 23, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT #13 filed by Defendant Graphic Packaging International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amelia Hoke, #2 Declaration of Christopher M. Jevsevar, #3 Request for Judicial Notice)(Jevsevar, Christopher)
March 13, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT filed by PLAINTIFF Marty Linebarger. Motion set for hearing on 4/13/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Schimmel, Miriam)
February 26, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Miriam L Schimmel on behalf of Plaintiff Marty Linebarger (Attorney Miriam L Schimmel added to party Marty Linebarger(pty:pla))(Schimmel, Miriam)
February 25, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Marty Linebarger, (Katofsky, Alex)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 4/27/2020 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 4/20/2020. (rrp)
February 21, 2020 Filing 9 Initial DISCLOSURE Statement filed by Defendant Graphic Packaging International, LLC (Jevsevar, Christopher)
February 21, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Graphic Packaging International, LLC.(Jevsevar, Christopher)
February 19, 2020 Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
February 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice (Other) #3 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): An incorrect event was selected for Document No. 3. The correct event is Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties. You are not required to take any action in response to this notice unless the Court so directs. (lh)
February 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
February 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (lh)
February 14, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, Graphic Packaging International, LLC,filed by Plaintiff Marty Linebarger. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 1/6/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
February 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Graphic Packaging International, LLC. (Jevsevar, Christopher)
February 14, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Graphic Packaging International, LLC. (Jevsevar, Christopher)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2020-01122257-CU-OE-CJC Receipt No: 0973-25334382 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Graphic Packaging International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of E. Jewelle Johnson, #2 Declaration of Amelia Hoke, #3 Declaration of Christopher M. Jevsevar) (Attorney Christopher M Jevsevar added to party Graphic Packaging International, LLC(pty:dft))(Jevsevar, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marty Linebarger v. Graphic Packaging International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marty Linebarger
Represented By: Miriam L Schimmel
Represented By: Kenneth S Gaines
Represented By: Daniel F Gaines
Represented By: Evan Simon Gaines
Represented By: Alex P Katofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graphic Packaging International, LLC
Represented By: Christopher M Jevsevar
Represented By: Danielle Hultenius Moore
Represented By: Daniel Justin Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?