Karen Elliott et al v. Cessna Aircraft Co. et al
Plaintiff: Darla Casby, Autumn Leber, Bobby Leber, Steven Elliott, Caitlyn Roe, Amy Marefat, Karen Elliott, Nicholas DeHaro, Sommer Walls, Amanda Goodrich and Brianne Leber
Defendant: Antonio Pastini, Deborah Pastini, The Antonio P. Pastini Living Trust Dated November 21, 2011, Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Cessna Aircraft Co., Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc., Textron Aviation, Inc. and The Estate of Antonio Pastini
Case Number: 8:2020cv00378
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: James V Selna
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Filing 18 Proof of Delivery filed by Plaintiffs Darla Casby, Nicholas DeHaro, Karen Elliott, Steven Elliott, Amanda Goodrich, Autumn Leber, Bobby Leber, Brianne Leber, Amy Marefat, Caitlyn Roe, Sommer Walls (Winter, Douglas)
April 13, 2020 Filing 17 Proof of Delivery filed by Plaintiffs Darla Casby, Nicholas DeHaro, Karen Elliott, Steven Elliott, Amanda Goodrich, Autumn Leber, Bobby Leber, Brianne Leber, Amy Marefat, Caitlyn Roe, Sommer Walls (Winter, Douglas)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for June 8, 2020 at 10:00 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by June 1, 2020. (mku)
March 13, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Defendant Textron Aviation, Inc..(Saldana, Manuel)
March 6, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior, case number 30-2020-01128734-CU-PP-CJC with filing fee previously paid ($400.00 paid on 02/20/2020, receipt number 25436027), filed by Defendant Textron Aviation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Christopher Hall, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Hall, M)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER TO FILE AMENDED NOTICE by Judge James V. Selna:Textron shall file an amended Notice within ten days setting forth Continental's principal place of business and state of incorporation. Without this information, the Court cannot tell whether diversity jurisdiction has been properly invoked. Failure to respond will result in remand of this case to the Superior Court for the County of Orange. (es)
February 26, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Douglas D Winter counsel for Plaintiff Karen Elliott. Adding Douglas D. Winter as counsel of record for Karen Elliott, Amanda Goodrich, Steven Elliott, Amy Marefat, Darla Casby, Sommer Walls, Bobby Leber, Caitlyn Roe, Nicholas DeHaro, Brianne Leber, by and through her Guardian ad Litem, Bobby Leber, and Autumn Leber, by and through her Guardian ad Litem, Bobby Leber for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Karen Elliott, et al.. (Attorney Douglas D Winter added to party Karen Elliott(pty:pla))(Winter, Douglas)
February 25, 2020 Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
February 24, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
February 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh)
February 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Autumn D. Spaeth. New Case Number 8:20-cv-00378 JVS (ADSx). (lh)
February 20, 2020 COMPLAINT against Defendants Cessna Aircraft Co., Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc., Does 1 through 100, Antonio Pastini, Deborah Pastini, Textron Aviation, Inc., The Antonio P. Pastini Living Trust Dated November 21, 2011, The Estate of Antonio Pastini. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Autumn Leber, Bobby Leber, Amanda Goodrich, Karen Elliott, Sommer Walls, Steven Elliott, Nicholas DeHaro, Caitlyn Roe, Amy Marefat, Brianne Leber, Darla Casby. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 2/20/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
February 20, 2020 Filing 7 DECLARATION of SHERRY L. FLEMING re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Textron Aviation Inc.. (Saldana, Manuel)
February 20, 2020 Filing 6 DECLARATION of M. CHRISTOPHER HALL re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Textron Aviation Inc.. (Saldana, Manuel)
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 DECLARATION of MANUEL SALDANA re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Textron Aviation Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Saldana, Manuel)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Textron Aviation Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Manuel Saldana, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Declaration of M. Christopher Hall, #5 Declaration of Sherry L. Fleming)(Saldana, Manuel)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (Local Rule 7.1-1) filed by Defendant Textron Aviation Inc. re: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Saldana, Manuel)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Textron Aviation Inc.. (Saldana, Manuel)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior, case number 30-2020-01128734-CU-PP-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-25436027 - Fee: $400, filed by DEFENDANT Textron Aviation Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Manuel Saldana added to party Textron Aviation Inc.(pty:dft))(Saldana, Manuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karen Elliott et al v. Cessna Aircraft Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darla Casby
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Douglas D Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Autumn Leber
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Douglas D Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Leber
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Douglas D Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Elliott
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Douglas D Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caitlyn Roe
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Douglas D Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Marefat
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Douglas D Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Elliott
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Douglas D Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas DeHaro
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Douglas D Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sommer Walls
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Douglas D Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Goodrich
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Douglas D Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brianne Leber
Represented By: Matthew S McNicholas
Represented By: Douglas D Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Pastini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Pastini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Antonio P. Pastini Living Trust Dated November 21, 2011
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cessna Aircraft Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Aerospace Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Textron Aviation, Inc.
Represented By: M Christopher Hall
Represented By: Manuel Saldana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Antonio Pastini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?