In The Matter of the Vessel Nautilus for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability et al
Plaintiff: In The Matter of the Vessel Nautilus for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability, Newport Landing, Inc. and Harbor Dockside, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Does 1-20, Newport Landing Sportfishing, Inc., Daveys Locker Sportfishing, Inc. and JOHN DOE, as Master of the vessel NAUTILUS
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Yanping Sun
Case Number: 8:2020cv00397
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF INTENT upon filing of the complaint by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on June 11, 2020. (gga)
April 17, 2020 Filing 14 Corrected NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Claimant Yanping Sun, (Coone, Aksana)
April 17, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Claimant Yanping Sun, (Coone, Aksana)
April 17, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND and Affirmative Defenses to Harbor Dockside Inc, and Newport Landing, Inc. Limitation Complaint, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Does 1-20, Newport Landing Sportfishing, Inc., JOHN DOE, as Master of the vessel NAUTILUS, Daveys Locker Sportfishing, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against Harbor Dockside, Inc., Newport Landing, Inc. filed by Claimant Yanping Sun.(Attorney Aksana Moshaiv Coone added to party Yanping Sun(pty:clm))(Coone, Aksana)
April 2, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Publication filed by Plaintiffs-in-Limitation In The Matter of the Vessel Nautilus for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Proof of Publication)(Huber, Marisa)
March 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO CLAIMANTS OF FILING OF LIMITATION PROCEEDING filed. (iv)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE AND PUBLICATION THEREOF #4 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
February 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
February 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (esa)
February 26, 2020 Filing 6 DECLARATION of PAUL BUTLER re Stipulation for Costs, #5 filed by Plaintiffs Harbor Dockside, Inc., Newport Landing, Inc.. (Huber, Marisa)
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION for Costs against In The Matter of the Vessel Nautilus for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability filed by Plaintiffs-in-Limitation In The Matter of the Vessel Nautilus for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] NOTICE TO CLAIMANTS OF FILING OF LIMITATION PROCEEDING)(Attorney Marisa Gale Huber added to party In The Matter of the Vessel Nautilus for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability(pty:pla))(Huber, Marisa)
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Issuance of Notice and Order, and Publication Thereof filed by Plaintiffs-in-Limitation Harbor Dockside, Inc., Newport Landing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE AND PUBLICATION THEREOF) (Huber, Marisa)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 Notice and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff-in -Limitation Harbor Dockside, Inc., Newport Landing, Inc., (Huber, Marisa)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Harbor Dockside, Inc., Newport Landing, Inc.. (Huber, Marisa)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25522324 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs-in-Limitation Newport Landing, Inc., Harbor Dockside, Inc.. (Attorney Marisa Gale Huber added to party Harbor Dockside, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Marisa Gale Huber added to party Newport Landing, Inc.(pty:pla))(Huber, Marisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In The Matter of the Vessel Nautilus for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: In The Matter of the Vessel Nautilus for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability
Represented By: Marisa Gale Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Newport Landing, Inc.
Represented By: Marisa Gale Huber
Represented By: G Geoffrey Robb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harbor Dockside, Inc.
Represented By: Marisa Gale Huber
Represented By: G Geoffrey Robb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Newport Landing Sportfishing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Daveys Locker Sportfishing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: JOHN DOE, as Master of the vessel NAUTILUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Yanping Sun
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Perez
Represented By: Aksana Moshaiv Coone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?