Gregory Heiertz v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Co. et al
Plaintiff: GREGORY HEIERTZ
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Co., Nossaman LLP, NOSSAMAN LLP GROUP LIFE INSURANCE EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2020cv00468
Filed: March 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Nossaman LLP, Nossaman LLP Group Life Insurance Employee Benefit Plan, (Faucher, Joseph)
May 4, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Nossaman LLP, Nossaman LLP Group Life Insurance Employee Benefit Plan.(Faucher, Joseph)
May 1, 2020 Filing 16 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Co., identifying (1) Plaintiff Gregory Heiertz; Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company; (3) Defendant Nossaman LLP; and (4) Defendant Nossaman LLP Group Life Insurance Employee Benefit Plan. (Bernacchi, Michael)
May 1, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Co..(Bernacchi, Michael)
April 16, 2020 Filing 14 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Nossaman LLP Group Life Insurance Employee Benefit Plan answer now due 5/4/2020; Nossaman LLP answer now due 5/4/2020, filed by Defendants Nossaman LLP Group Life Insurance Employee Benefit Plan; Nossaman LLP.(Attorney Joseph Charles Faucher added to party Nossaman LLP(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Charles Faucher added to party Nossaman LLP Group Life Insurance Employee Benefit Plan(pty:dft))(Faucher, Joseph)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 6/1/2020 at 11:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 5/26/2020. (lb)
March 23, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Gregory Heiertz, upon Defendant Nossaman LLP Group Life Insurance Employee Benefit Plan acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Joseph C. Faucher, Attorney for Defendant. (Calvert, Scott)
March 23, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Gregory Heiertz, upon Defendant Nossaman LLP acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Joseph C. Faucher, Attorney for Defendant. (Calvert, Scott)
March 17, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Co. answer now due 5/1/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Co..(Attorney Michael B Bernacchi added to party Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Co.(pty:dft))(Bernacchi, Michael)
March 13, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gregory Heiertz, upon Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Co. served on 3/11/2020, answer due 4/1/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jessie Gastelum Agent for CT Corp in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Horrow, Michael)
March 10, 2020 Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (lb)
March 10, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Co., Nossaman LLP, Nossaman LLP Group Life Insurance Employee Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Nossaman LLP, #2 Summons for Defendant Nossaman LLP Group Life Insurance Employee Benefit Plan) (et)
March 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
March 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (et)
March 9, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff GREGORY HEIERTZ. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Horrow, Michael)
March 9, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff GREGORY HEIERTZ, identifying Gregory Heiertz, Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Co., Nossaman LLP, Nossaman LLP Group Life Insurance Employee Benefit Plan. (Horrow, Michael)
March 9, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff GREGORY HEIERTZ. (Horrow, Michael)
March 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25654990 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff GREGORY HEIERTZ. (Attorney Michael B Horrow added to party GREGORY HEIERTZ(pty:pla))(Horrow, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregory Heiertz v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY HEIERTZ
Represented By: Michael B Horrow
Represented By: Scott E Calvert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Co.
Represented By: Karen T Tsui
Represented By: Michael B Bernacchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nossaman LLP
Represented By: Brian Douglas Murray
Represented By: Joseph Charles Faucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOSSAMAN LLP GROUP LIFE INSURANCE EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN
Represented By: Brian Douglas Murray
Represented By: Joseph Charles Faucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?