Rilla Huml et al v. Servis One, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rilla Huml
Defendant: Wells Fargo South Central, N.A., Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Zieve, Brodnax & Steele, LLP, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., fka Wachovia Mortgage, FSB, fka World Savings Bank, FSB, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Zieve, Brodnax and Steele, LLP, Does 1 through 10, Servis One, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank South Central, N.A., World Savings Bank, FSB and Servis One, Inc. a Delaware corporation, authorized to do business in California doing business as BSI Financial Services
Petitioner: SERVIS ONE, INC. dba BSI FINANCIAL SERVICES
Case Number: 8:2020cv00489
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Filing 27 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter. The Court finds the Motion to Dismiss Case (Second Amended Complaint) filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. #13 appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. Accordingly, the motion hearing and the Scheduling Conference set for April 27, 2020 are removed from the calendar. No appearances are necessary on this date and time. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 13, 2020 Filing 26 Rule 26(f)Joint Report filed by Plaintiff Rilla Huml (Huml, Rilla)
April 13, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Second Amended Complaint) #13 filed by Defendants Wells Fargo Bank South Central, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Reeves, Dean)
April 8, 2020 Filing 24 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter. The Request for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'S Motion to Dismiss filed by plaintiff Rilla Huml #22 is denied as moot. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 6, 2020 Filing 23 OPPOSITION IN OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Second Amended Complaint) #13 filed by Plaintiff Rilla Huml. (Huml, Rilla)
April 1, 2020 Filing 21 Opposition in Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Second Amended Complaint) #13 to Plaintiff Request for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Wells Fargo Bank's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Reeves, Dean)
March 30, 2020 Filing 22 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'S Motion to Dismiss filed by plaintiff Rilla Huml. (twdb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/6/2020: #1 Proposed Order) (twdb).
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #19 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (twdb)
March 30, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
March 30, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jessica A McElroy on behalf of Defendant Servis One, Inc. (Attorney Jessica A McElroy added to party Servis One, Inc.(pty:dft))(McElroy, Jessica)
March 27, 2020 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by plaintiff Rilla Huml. (twdb)
March 27, 2020 Filing 16 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter. The Scheduling Conference set for May 4, 2020 is vacated by the Court. The Scheduling Conference is now set for April 27, 2020, at 8:30 a.m THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 4/27/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (kd)
March 23, 2020 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Second Amended Complaint) #13 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Reeves, Dean)
March 23, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Second Amended Complaint) filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 4/27/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order in Support of Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint) (Attorney Dean A Reeves added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft)) (Reeves, Dean)
March 23, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nicole Bartz Metral counsel for Defendant Servis One, Inc.. Adding Nicole Bartz Metral as counsel of record for Servis One, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Servis One, Inc.. (Attorney Nicole Bartz Metral added to party Servis One, Inc.(pty:dft))(Metral, Nicole)
March 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against defendants Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. SBM Wachovia Mortgage, FSB, FKA World Savings Bank, FSB; Wells Fargo Bank South Central #10 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: No proof of service/waiver of service on file. Requesting party shall file a new Request/Application with noted deficiencies corrected in order to have default reconsidered. The Second Amended Complaint is not a conformed copy. The Request for entry of default is requesting Monetary Judgment. The defendants must first be placed in default by clerk. (twdb)
March 19, 2020 Filing 10 Affidavit for Entry of Default against defendants Wells Fargo Bank South Central, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. SBM Wachovia Mortgage, FSB, FKA World Savings Bank, FSB; Wells Fargo Bank South Central filed by plaintiff Rilla Huml. (twdb)
March 17, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, (Second Amended Complaint) filed by Defendant Servis One, Inc..(Schulz, Erika)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 5/4/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (See attached Order for complete details.) (kd)
March 12, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Servis One, Inc., identifying dba BSI Financial. (Schulz, Erika)
March 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (kd)
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (lh)
March 10, 2020 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, Servis One, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank South Central, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Zieve, Brodnax and Steele, LLP amending Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Rilla Huml. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh)
March 10, 2020 NON-CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to First Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Servis One, Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh)
March 10, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, Servis One, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank South Central, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Zieve, Brodnax and Steele, LLP amending Complaint,, filed by Plaintiff Rilla Huml. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 9/05/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh)
March 10, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, Servis One, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank South Central, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Zieve, Brodnax and Steele, LLP. Filed by Plaintiff Rilla Huml. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 4/08/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant SERVIS ONE, INC. dba BSI FINANCIAL SERVICES. (Schulz, Erika)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01062402-CU-OR-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-25684084 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant SERVIS ONE, INC. dba BSI FINANCIAL SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Erika Regina Schulz added to party SERVIS ONE, INC. dba BSI FINANCIAL SERVICES(pty:mov))(Schulz, Erika)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rilla Huml et al v. Servis One, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo South Central, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zieve, Brodnax & Steele, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., fka Wachovia Mortgage, FSB, fka World Savings Bank, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Dean A Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zieve, Brodnax and Steele, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Servis One, Inc.
Represented By: Cheryl S Chang
Represented By: Nicole Bartz Metral
Represented By: Erika Regina Schulz
Represented By: Jessica A McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank South Central, N.A.
Represented By: Dean A Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Savings Bank, FSB
Represented By: Dean A Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Servis One, Inc. a Delaware corporation, authorized to do business in California doing business as BSI Financial Services
Represented By: Cheryl S Chang
Represented By: Nicole Bartz Metral
Represented By: Erika Regina Schulz
Represented By: Jessica A McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rilla Huml
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SERVIS ONE, INC. dba BSI FINANCIAL SERVICES
Represented By: Erika Regina Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?