Alan Joseph Goulet v. Elite Screens, Inc.
Plaintiff: Alan Joseph Goulet
Defendant: Elite Screens, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv00495
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Alan Joseph Goulet. upon Elite Screens, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/2/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Counsel for Defendant. (Andersen, Evan)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 6/15/2020 at 10:00 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 6/8/2020. (lb)
March 18, 2020 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Elite Screens, Inc.. (es)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: GRANTING #12 Non-Resident Attorney Evan A. Andersen APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Alan Joseph Goulet, designating Jonah A. Grossbardt as local counsel. (es)
March 17, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Evan A. Andersen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Alan Joseph Goulet (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. BCACDC-25758315) #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Superseded version of Form G-64 used. Other error(s) with document(s): See court's website for updated form. (lom)
March 17, 2020 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request #6 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #9 filed by Plaintiff Alan Joseph Goulet. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
March 17, 2020 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Evan A. Andersen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Alan Joseph Goulet (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. BCACDC-25758315) filed by Plaintiff Alan Joseph Goulet. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order on Application of non-Resident Attorney to Appear in Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Grossbardt, Jonah)
March 17, 2020 Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
March 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Evan A Andersen for Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
March 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #6 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect document is attached to Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (car)
March 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
March 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (car)
March 12, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Alan Joseph Goulet. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
March 12, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Alan Joseph Goulet. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Alan Joseph Goulet (Grossbardt, Jonah)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Alan Joseph Goulet, (Grossbardt, Jonah)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Alan Joseph Goulet. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25706386 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Alan Joseph Goulet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Registration) (Attorney Jonah Adam Grossbardt added to party Alan Joseph Goulet(pty:pla))(Grossbardt, Jonah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alan Joseph Goulet v. Elite Screens, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Screens, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Joseph Goulet
Represented By: Jonah Adam Grossbardt
Represented By: Evan A Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?