Mint Management Technologies LLC v. Kathy A Baran et al
Plaintiff: Mint Management Technologies LLC
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kathy A Baran, Chad Wolf and Kenneth Cuccinelli
Case Number: 8:2020cv00605
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: GRANTING #43 Non-Resident Attorney Taylor Washburn APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Mint Management Technologies LLC, designating Connie Y Tcheng as local counsel. (jp)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by July 2, 2020. (droj)
April 30, 2020 Filing 44 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by Defendants Kathy A Baran, Kenneth Cuccinelli, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, Chad Wolf.(Staub, Keith)
April 28, 2020 Filing 43 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Taylor Washburn to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Mint Management Technologies LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 4/7/2020, Receipt No. 26003094) filed by Plaintiff Mint Management Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Tcheng, Connie)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: denying #39 Non-Resident Attorney Taylor Washburn APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Mint Management Technologies LLC., for failure to attach a Certificate of Good Standing issued within 30 days prior to filing of Application. Counsel has 30 days to refile their application. (jp)
April 10, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Taylor Washburn to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Mint Management Technologies LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 4/7/2020, Receipt No. 26003094) #39 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): No MA GSC. (lom)
April 9, 2020 Filing 40 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Connie Y Tcheng counsel for Plaintiff Mint Management Technologies LLC. Steven T. Plastrik is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Mint Management Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Tcheng, Connie)
April 9, 2020 Filing 39 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Taylor Washburn to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Mint Management Technologies LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 4/7/2020, Receipt No. 26003094) filed by Plaintiff Mint Management Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Tcheng, Connie)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting #33 Non-Resident Attorney Dustin O'Quinn APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Mint Management Technologies LLC, designating Connie Y Tcheng as local counsel. (jp)
April 9, 2020 Filing 37 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sarah K Morehead counsel for Defendants Kathy A Baran, Kenneth Cuccinelli, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, Chad Wolf. Sarah K. Morehead is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Attorney for Defendants Kathy A. Baran, et al.. (Morehead, Sarah)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: denying #32 Non-Resident Attorney Taylor Washburn APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Mint Management Technologies LLC, for failure to attach a Certificate of Good Standing issued within 30 days prior to filing of Application. Counsel has 30 days to refile their application. (jp)
April 8, 2020 Filing 35 Notice of Electronic Filing re Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer) #21 e-mailed to plastriks@lanepowell.com bounced due to Steven Plastrik no longer works at Lane Powell PC.. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 8, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Taylor Washburn to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Mint Management Technologies LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26003094) #32 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): Certificates of Good Standing have been required since 9/08. See LR 83-2.1.3.3. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). (Thrasher, Lupe)
April 7, 2020 Filing 33 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Dustin O'Quinn to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Mint Management Technologies LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26003530) filed by Plaintiff Mint Management Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Tcheng, Connie)
April 7, 2020 Filing 32 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Taylor Washburn to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Mint Management Technologies LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26003094) filed by Plaintiff Mint Management Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Tcheng, Connie)
April 7, 2020 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Connie Y Tcheng counsel for Plaintiff Mint Management Technologies LLC. Adding Connie Y. Tcheng as counsel of record for Mint Management Technologies LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Mint Management Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Connie Y Tcheng added to party Mint Management Technologies LLC(pty:pla))(Tcheng, Connie)
April 3, 2020 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Keith M Staub counsel for Defendants Kathy A Baran, Kenneth Cuccinelli, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, Chad Wolf. Adding Keith M.Staub as counsel of record for Kathy A Baran, Director of the California Service Center, U.S.C.I.S., Kenneth Cuccinelli Acting Director of U.S.C.I.S., U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chad Wolf, Acting Secretary of U.S.D.H.S., U.S. CUSTOMS AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES., and U.S.Dept of Homeland Security for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Kathy A Baran, Director of the California Service Center, U.S.C.I.S., Kenneth Cuccinelli Acting Director of U.S.C.I.S., U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Chad Wolf, Acting Secretary of U.S.D.H.S., U.S. CUSTOMS AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES., and U.S.Dept of Homeland Security. (Attorney Keith M Staub added to party Kathy A Baran(pty:dft), Attorney Keith M Staub added to party Kenneth Cuccinelli(pty:dft), Attorney Keith M Staub added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Keith M Staub added to party United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Keith M Staub added to party Chad Wolf(pty:dft))(Staub, Keith)
March 31, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Taylor Washburn on behal of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (et)
March 31, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Steven T Plastrik on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (et)
March 31, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Dustin J O'Quinn behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (et)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT (DKT. #1 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before April 30, 2020. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (cw)
March 27, 2020 Filing 21 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Washington Western
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to District of Central District of California, Southern Division by electronic case transfer. Case is stipulated, the 15 day waiting period does not apply.Case will be transferred on 3/25/2020. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (TH) [Transferred from Washington Western on 3/27/2020.]
March 16, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER by parties (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Washburn, Taylor) [Transferred from Washington Western on 3/27/2020.]
February 25, 2020 ***Deadlines terminated. The Court notifies the parties that the deadlines contained in the #16 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT are suspended pending the Court's ruling on the #17 MOTION to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Transfer, filed by Defendants Kathy A Baran, Kenneth Cuccinelli, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, and Chad Wolf. (VE) [Transferred from Washington Western on 3/27/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Sarah K. Morehead filed by Defendants Kathy A Baran, Kenneth Cuccinelli, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, Chad Wolf re #17 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the Alternative, to Transfer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Morehead, Sarah) [Transferred from Washington Western on 3/27/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the Alternative, to Transfer, filed by Defendants Kathy A Baran, Kenneth Cuccinelli, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/20/2020, (Morehead, Sarah) [Transferred from Washington Western on 3/27/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 3/3/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/10/2020, Joint Status Report due by 3/17/2020, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) [Transferred from Washington Western on 3/27/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sarah K Morehead on behalf of Defendants Kathy A Baran, Kenneth Cuccinelli, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, Chad Wolf. (Morehead, Sarah) [Transferred from Washington Western on 3/27/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Mint Management Technologies (Pty) Ltd., Other Affiliate Stairway2010 LLC for Mint Management Technologies LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Mint Management Technologies LLC (Washburn, Taylor) [Transferred from Washington Western on 3/27/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 13 REDACTION to #1 Complaint, Attachment: # 1 Exhibits A-E by Plaintiff Mint Management Technologies LLC (Washburn, Taylor) [Transferred from Washington Western on 3/27/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Steven T Plastrik for Plaintiff Mint Management Technologies LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from Washington Western on 3/27/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Dustin J O'Quinn for Plaintiff Mint Management Technologies LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from Washington Western on 3/27/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Steven T. Plastrik FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Mint Management Technologies LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6049011 (Washburn, Taylor) [Transferred from Washington Western on 3/27/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Dustin O'Quinn FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Mint Management Technologies LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6048961 (Washburn, Taylor) [Transferred from Washington Western on 3/27/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) [Transferred from Washington Western on 3/27/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 7 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Kathy A Baran, Kenneth Cuccinelli,, Chad Wolf, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, and United States Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(GT) [Transferred from Washington Western on 3/27/2020.]
December 12, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Mint Management Technologies LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 12/19/2019. (GT) [Transferred from Washington Western on 3/27/2020.]
December 12, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Documents contain personal identifiers that must be redacted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and Local Civil Rule 5.2. You are required to re-file a redacted version of your document using the event Redacted Document located in the Other Documents category. This event will allow you to link back to your original filing and will not affect your original filing date. Pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2, the document(s) have been administratively sealed by the Court. (GT) [Transferred from Washington Western on 3/27/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (GT) [Transferred from Washington Western on 3/27/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Mint Management Technologies LLC (Washburn, Taylor) [Transferred from Washington Western on 3/27/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Mint Management Technologies LLC (Washburn, Taylor) [Transferred from Washington Western on 3/27/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Mint Management Technologies LLC (Washburn, Taylor) [Transferred from Washington Western on 3/27/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Mint Management Technologies LLC (Washburn, Taylor) [Transferred from Washington Western on 3/27/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Mint Management Technologies LLC (Washburn, Taylor) [Transferred from Washington Western on 3/27/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Kathy A Baran, Kenneth Cuccinelli, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, Chad Wolf (Receipt # 0981-6046907), filed by Mint Management Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 *SEALED* Exhibits A-E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Washburn, Taylor) Modified on 12/12/2019 (GT). [Transferred from Washington Western on 3/27/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mint Management Technologies LLC v. Kathy A Baran et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Sarah K Morehead
Represented By: Keith M Staub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Sarah K Morehead
Represented By: Keith M Staub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy A Baran
Represented By: Sarah K Morehead
Represented By: Keith M Staub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Sarah K Morehead
Represented By: Keith M Staub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Represented By: Sarah K Morehead
Represented By: Keith M Staub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mint Management Technologies LLC
Represented By: Dustin J O'Quinn
Represented By: Steven T Plastrik
Represented By: Taylor Washburn
Represented By: Connie Y Tcheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?