Priority Business Services, Inc. et al v. South East Personnel Leasing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Geneva Staffing, Inc., Priority Business Services, Inc., Workforce Outsourcing, Inc. and Epiphany Staffing Group, LLC
Defendant: South East Personnel Leasing, Inc., Packard Claims Administration, Inc. and Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2020cv00642
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Filing 16 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from Middle District of Florida, 8:20-cv-01141 filed 5/20/2020. (iv)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Regarding Motion to Transfer by Judge James V. Selna: For the following reasons, the Court GRANTS the motion. (See order for details.) MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (es)
May 4, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY in support of motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida, Tampa Division #9 filed by Defendant South East Personnel Leasing, Inc.. (Deitz, Eric)
April 27, 2020 Filing 13 Opposition in Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida, Tampa Division #9 filed by Plaintiff Priority Business Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Daniel Cox in support of Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue)(Leung, Donna)
April 27, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida, Tampa Division #9 filed by Defendant Packard Claims Administration, Inc.. (Harriman, Jordon)
April 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, identifying Priority Business Services, Inc.; Workforce Outsourcing, Inc.; Geneva Staffing, Inc.; Epiphany Staffing Group, LLC; SouthEast Personnel Leasing, Inc.; Packard Claims Administration, Inc.. (Leung, Donna)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 6/22/2020 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 6/15/2020. (lb)
April 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida, Tampa Division filed by Defendant South East Personnel Leasing, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/18/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Tatiana Dupuy, #3 Proposed Order) (Dupuy, Tatiana)
April 9, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant South East Personnel Leasing, Inc..(Attorney Tatiana Dupuy added to party South East Personnel Leasing, Inc.(pty:dft))(Dupuy, Tatiana)
April 9, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Packard Claims Administration, Inc..(Harriman, Jordon)
April 8, 2020 Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (esa)
April 2, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiffs Priority Business Services, Inc., Epiphany Staffing Group, LLC, Geneva Staffing, Inc., Workforce Outsourcing, Inc., upon Defendant Packard Claims Administration, Inc. served on 3/5/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Cogency Global, Inc., Registered Agent, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (filed in state court 4/2/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 3) (esa)
April 2, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Packard Claims Administration, Inc., South East Personnel Leasing, Inc., Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Priority Business Services, Inc., Epiphany Staffing Group, LLC, Geneva Staffing, Inc., Workforce Outsourcing, Inc. (filed in state court 2/28/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 2) (esa)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Packard Claims Administration, Inc., identifying John A. Porecca, and Deborah A. Porecca. (Harriman, Jordon)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Packard Claims Administration, Inc.. (Harriman, Jordon)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2020-01135232-CU-BC-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-25946554 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Packard Claims Administration, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint) (Attorney Jordon Edward Harriman added to party Packard Claims Administration, Inc.(pty:dft))(Harriman, Jordon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Priority Business Services, Inc. et al v. South East Personnel Leasing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South East Personnel Leasing, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Richard Deitz
Represented By: Tatiana Dupuy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Packard Claims Administration, Inc.
Represented By: Jordon Edward Harriman
Represented By: Rebecca R Weinreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geneva Staffing, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas P Roxborough
Represented By: Vincent S Gannuscio
Represented By: Donna Marie Leung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Priority Business Services, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas P Roxborough
Represented By: Vincent S Gannuscio
Represented By: Donna Marie Leung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Workforce Outsourcing, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas P Roxborough
Represented By: Vincent S Gannuscio
Represented By: Donna Marie Leung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Epiphany Staffing Group, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas P Roxborough
Represented By: Vincent S Gannuscio
Represented By: Donna Marie Leung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?