Erriton Hall v. Suzuki Motor of America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Erriton Hall
Defendant: Suzuki Motor of America, Inc., Suzuki Motor Corporation and Does 1 through 100, Inclusive
Case Number: 8:2020cv00670
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Filing 16 DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #15 filed by Defendant Suzuki Motor of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice)(Sanders, Justin)
May 15, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Erriton Hall. Motion set for hearing on 6/22/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Plaintiff Erriton Hall's Motion to Remand) (Davis, Travis)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 6/29/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (See attached Order for complete details.) (kd)
May 11, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Suzuki Motor of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Rocio Barbeaux)(Sanders, Justin)
May 8, 2020 Filing 12 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: Notice of Removal #1 . The defendant's answer is due 5/15/2020. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 8, 2020 Filing 11 DECLARATION Certificate of Service of Supporting Documentation From United States Court filed by Defendant Suzuki Motor of America, Inc.. (Sanders, Justin)
April 8, 2020 Filing 10 DECLARATION of CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CLERK OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT filed by Defendant Suzuki Motor of America, Inc.. (Sanders, Justin)
April 8, 2020 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Certificate of Service of Notice to Adverse Party filed by Defendant Suzuki Motor of America, Inc.. (Sanders, Justin)
April 7, 2020 Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd)
April 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap)
April 6, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Suzuki Motor Corporation, Suzuki Motor of America, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Erriton Hall. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/7/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Suzuki Motor of America, Inc., identifying Suzuki Motor Corporation, Erriton Hall. (Sanders, Justin)
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Suzuki Motor of America, Inc. identifying SUZUKI MOTOR CORPORATION as Corporate Parent. (Sanders, Justin)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Suzuki Motor of America, Inc.. (Sanders, Justin)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Suzuki Motor of America, Inc.. (Sanders, Justin)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from orange county, case number 30-2020-01130663-CU-PL-CJC Receipt No: CCACDC-25987888 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Suzuki Motor of America, Inc.. (Attorney Justin H Sanders added to party Suzuki Motor of America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Sanders, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erriton Hall v. Suzuki Motor of America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzuki Motor of America, Inc.
Represented By: Justin H Sanders
Represented By: Darth Kadei Vaughn
Represented By: Eric S Mintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzuki Motor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erriton Hall
Represented By: Travis Eugene Davis
Represented By: Edwin Hong
Represented By: Robert T Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?