Anthony Longo v. Vincent Longo et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Longo
Defendant: Future System Pty Ltd, Vincent Longo, Todos Santos Surf, Inc. and Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2020cv00829
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
2 Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED #26 UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court has considered the matters raised with respect to the Motion and has concluded that pursuant to Local Rule 7.15, the matter can be decided without oral argument. The Court advises counsel that the Motion, noticed for hearing on August 14, 2020, has been taken under submission and off its motion calendar. No appearance by counsel is necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 31, 2020 Filing 30 REPLY NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint For Failure To State A Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted (FRCP 12(b)(6)) #26 Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Future System Pty Ltd, Vincent Longo. (Hildebrand, James)
July 24, 2020 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #26 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Anthony Longo. (LeJeune, Cody)
July 7, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint For Failure To State A Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted (FRCP 12(b)(6)) #26 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 10/9/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
July 2, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint For Failure To State A Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted (FRCP 12(b)(6)) filed by Defendants Future System Pty Ltd, Vincent Longo. Motion set for hearing on 8/14/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Ethan A. Reimers, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibits A to D to Request for Judicial Notice) (Hildebrand, James)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DEEMING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT (Dkt. No. 17) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: In light of the First Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 20), Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as MOOT, and the hearing scheduled for July 14, 2020, is hereby VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
June 30, 2020 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Anthony Longo, upon Defendant Future System Pty Ltd served on 6/28/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Vincent Longo - Owner of Future Fin Systems Pty Ltd in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (LeJeune, Cody)
June 30, 2020 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Anthony Longo, upon Defendant Vincent Longo served on 6/28/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Vincent Longo in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (LeJeune, Cody)
June 30, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 8:20-cv-00829 AB(RAOx). (rn)
June 18, 2020 Filing 20 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by plaintiff Anthony Longo (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(LeJeune, Cody)
June 15, 2020 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Vincent Longo in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Insufficient Service and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted (FRCP 12(b)(5) & (6) #17 filed by Defendants Future System Pty Ltd, Vincent Longo. (Hildebrand, James)
June 15, 2020 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Cole Carden Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Insufficient Service and Failure to State a Claim upon which Relief can be Granted (FRCP 12(b)(5) & (6) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Insufficient Service and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted (FRCP 12(b)(5) & (6) #17 filed by Defendants Future System Pty Ltd, Vincent Longo. (Hildebrand, James)
June 15, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Insufficient Service and Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted (FRCP 12(b)(5) & (6) filed by Defendants Future System Pty Ltd, Vincent Longo. Motion set for hearing on 7/14/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Ethan A. Reimers, #2 Declaration Vincent Longo, #3 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #4 Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Exhibits A to D) (Hildebrand, James)
June 15, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Future System Pty Ltd, Vincent Longo, (Hildebrand, James)
June 2, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Future System Pty Ltd answer now due 6/15/2020; Vincent Longo answer now due 6/15/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Future System Pty Ltd; Vincent Longo.(Attorney James C Hildebrand added to party Future System Pty Ltd(pty:dft), Attorney James C Hildebrand added to party Vincent Longo(pty:dft))(Hildebrand, James)
May 22, 2020 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Anthony Longo, upon Defendant Vincent Longo served on 5/18/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Cole - agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (LeJeune, Cody)
May 22, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Anthony Longo, upon Defendant Future System Pty Ltd served on 5/18/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Cole - agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (LeJeune, Cody)
May 7, 2020 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Future System Pty Ltd. (es)
May 7, 2020 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Vincent Longo. (es)
April 30, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Anthony Longo. (LeJeune, Cody)
April 30, 2020 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Anthony Longo. (LeJeune, Cody)
April 30, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Anthony Longo. (LeJeune, Cody)
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Anthony Longo. (LeJeune, Cody)
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Anthony Longo, (LeJeune, Cody)
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (lh)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh)
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Anthony Longo. (LeJeune, Cody)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26271383 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Anthony Longo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Trademark Certifications, #2 Exhibit U.S. Patent No. 9,463,588, #3 Exhibit Australian Trademarks, #4 Exhibit '588 Patent - Claim Chart) (Attorney Cody R LeJeune added to party Anthony Longo(pty:pla))(LeJeune, Cody)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anthony Longo v. Vincent Longo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Longo
Represented By: Cody R LeJeune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Future System Pty Ltd
Represented By: Ethan A Reimers
Represented By: James C Hildebrand
Represented By: Andrew S Hollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Longo
Represented By: Ethan A Reimers
Represented By: James C Hildebrand
Represented By: Andrew S Hollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todos Santos Surf, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?