Zumasys, Inc. et al v. United States Small Business Administration et al
Plaintiff: Zumasys, Inc., Total Computing Solutions, LLC and JBase International, Inc.
Defendant: Administrator Jovita Carranza, Steven T Mnuchin, United States Small Business Administration, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY and Jovita Carranza
Case Number: 8:2020cv00851
Filed: May 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs Zumasys, Inc.. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Ginsburg, Reuben)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Continuing Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint #33 by Judge Josephine L. Staton, Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, the hearing on Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint #24 , currently scheduled for 6/18/2021 at 10:30 AM. The time for Defendants to file their reply in support of the motion is extended accordingly based on the continued hearing date. The parties shall file a status report within five (5) days after Plaintiff Total Computing Solutions, LLC's receives a notice of decision regarding its Paycheck Protection Program loan forgiveness application. (jp)
January 29, 2021 Filing 34 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #24 filed by Defendants Jovita Carranza, Steven T Mnuchin, United States Department of Treasury, United States Small Business Administration. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita)
January 26, 2021 Filing 33 STIPULATION to Continue DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT from FEBRUARY 12, 2021 to JUNE 11, 2021 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #24 filed by Plaintiffs Zumasys, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Continuing Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)(Ginsburg, Reuben)
January 22, 2021 Filing 32 OPPOSITION IN OPPOSITION TO re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #24 filed by Plaintiffs Zumasys, Inc., jBASE International, Inc.. (Ginsburg, Reuben)
November 17, 2020 Filing 31 CIVIL TRIAL ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton. (mku)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than September 17, 2021. (mku)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTES (In Chambers) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference set for hearing 11/20/2020, is VACATED and the following schedule is set. Last Day to File a Motion to Add Parties or Amend Pleadings: 1/19/2021. Fact Discovery Cutoff: 7/16/2021. Last Day to File Motions (Excluding Daubert Motions and all other Motions in Limine): 7/30/2021. Last Day to Conduct Settlement Proceedings: 9/17/2021. Last Day to File Other Motions in Limine (Excluding Daubert Motions): 10/22/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2021 at 10:30 AM. (See document for further information). (jp)
November 13, 2020 Filing 28 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan AMENDED ; estimated length of trial 3 days, filed by Plaintiffs Zumasys, Inc., jBASE International, Inc... (Ginsburg, Reuben)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING Scheduling Conference and ORDERING Counsel to Review Local Procedures by Judge Josephine L. Staton: No later than 11/13/2020, counsel shall file an Amended Joint Rule 26(f) Report with a fully completed Exhibit A. The Court CONTINUES the Scheduling Conference to 11/20/2020 at 10:30 AM. (See document for further information). (jp)
October 23, 2020 Filing 26 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiffs Total Computing Solutions, LLC, Zumasys, Inc., jBASE International, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Joint Rule 26(f) Report)(Hanna, Mona)
September 25, 2020 Filing 25 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #18 filed by Defendants Jovita Carranza, Steven T Mnuchin, United States Department of Treasury, United States Small Business Administration. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita)
September 11, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants Jovita Carranza, Steven T Mnuchin, United States Department of Treasury, United States Small Business Administration. Motion set for hearing on 2/12/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Andrapalliyal, Vinita). Modified on 10/7/2020 (jp).
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' DEADLINE TO REPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT #22 by Judge Josephine L. Staton: It is hereby ordered that: The stipulated request is GRANTED. Defendants' deadline to respond to the First Amended Complaint is EXTENDED to September 11, 2020. (bm)
August 10, 2020 Filing 22 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer/Response to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Jovita Carranza, Steven T Mnuchin, United States Department of Treasury, United States Small Business Administration. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Andrapalliyal, Vinita)
July 31, 2020 Filing 21 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Jovita Carranza, Steven T Mnuchin, United States Department of Treasury, United States Small Business Administration amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Zumasys, Inc., Total Computing Solutions, LLC, jBASE International, Inc.(Hanna, Mona)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference is set for 11/6/2020 at 10:30 a.m. See attached Order for details. (tg)
July 13, 2020 Filing 19 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Josephine L. Staton: On the Court's motion, the hearing re Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #18 , is ordered CONTINUED from 8/7/2020 to 11/6/2020 at 10:30 a.m. REMINDER: Prior to filing any motion, counsel are required to view the Court's Closed Motion Dates found under Judges' Procedures and Schedules on the court's website. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 10, 2020 Filing 18 [DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER DOCKET ENTRY NO. #25 ] - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants United States Department of Treasury, United States Small Business Administration. Motion set for hearing on 8/7/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Andrapalliyal, Vinita) Modified on 10/7/2020 (jp).
June 15, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Vinita Andrapalliyal on behalf of Defendants Jovita Carranza, Steven T Mnuchin, United States Department of Treasury, United States Small Business Administration (Attorney Vinita Andrapalliyal added to party Jovita Carranza(pty:dft), Attorney Vinita Andrapalliyal added to party Steven T Mnuchin(pty:dft), Attorney Vinita Andrapalliyal added to party United States Department of Treasury(pty:dft), Attorney Vinita Andrapalliyal added to party United States Small Business Administration(pty:dft))(Andrapalliyal, Vinita)
May 13, 2020 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Zumasys, Inc., Total Computing Solutions, LLC, jBASE International, Inc., upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Nicole T. Hanna. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to United States Department of Treasury and United States Small Business Administration. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons returned. Proof of Service of Summon on Jovita Carranza (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service of Summons on Steven T. Mnuchin, #2 Proof of Service of Summons on United States Department of Treasury, #3 Proof of Service of Summons on United States Small Business Adminstration)(Hanna, Mona)
May 12, 2020 Filing 15 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg)
May 7, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott to Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 8:20-cv-00851 JLS(DFMx). (rn)
May 6, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c filed by Plaintiffs Total Computing Solutions, LLC, Zumasys, Inc., jBASE International, Inc.. The Plaintiffs does not consent. (Hanna, Mona)
May 6, 2020 Filing 12 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Jovita Carranza. (et)
May 6, 2020 Filing 11 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Steven T Mnuchin. (et)
May 6, 2020 Filing 10 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant United States Department of Treasury. (et)
May 6, 2020 Filing 9 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant United States Small Business Administration. (et)
May 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (Attachments: #1 CV11C Statement of Consent) (et)
May 4, 2020 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs JBase International, Inc., Total Computing Solutions, LLC, Zumasys, Inc.. (Hanna, Mona)
May 4, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs JBase International, Inc., Total Computing Solutions, LLC, Zumasys, Inc., (Hanna, Mona)
May 4, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs JBase International, Inc., Total Computing Solutions, LLC, Zumasys, Inc.. (Hanna, Mona)
May 4, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs JBase International, Inc., Total Computing Solutions, LLC, Zumasys, Inc.. (Hanna, Mona)
May 4, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs JBase International, Inc., Total Computing Solutions, LLC, Zumasys, Inc.. (Hanna, Mona)
May 4, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs JBase International, Inc., Total Computing Solutions, LLC, Zumasys, Inc.. (Hanna, Mona)
May 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26328112 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Zumasys, Inc., Total Computing Solutions, LLC, JBase International, Inc.. (Attorney Mona Z Hanna added to party JBase International, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Mona Z Hanna added to party Total Computing Solutions, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Mona Z Hanna added to party Zumasys, Inc.(pty:pla))(Hanna, Mona)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zumasys, Inc. et al v. United States Small Business Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administrator Jovita Carranza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven T Mnuchin
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Small Business Administration
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jovita Carranza
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zumasys, Inc.
Represented By: Mona Z Hanna
Represented By: Reuben Alexander Ginsburg
Represented By: Jesse J Contreras
Represented By: Todd Harrison Stitt
Represented By: Mona Z. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Total Computing Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Mona Z Hanna
Represented By: Reuben Alexander Ginsburg
Represented By: Jesse J Contreras
Represented By: Todd Harrison Stitt
Represented By: Mona Z. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JBase International, Inc.
Represented By: Mona Z Hanna
Represented By: Reuben Alexander Ginsburg
Represented By: Jesse J Contreras
Represented By: Todd Harrison Stitt
Represented By: Mona Z. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?