Intermarketing Media, LLC et al v. Brent David Barlow et al
Plaintiff: INTERMARKETING MEDIA, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company dba RESORT ADVISORY GROUP, LAW OFFICES OF DAVID ALAN KLEIN, P.C, a law firm, DAVID ALAN KLEIN, Intermarketing Media, LLC a Wyoming limited liability company doing business as Resort Advisory Group and Law Offices of David Alan Klein, P.C.
Defendant: Pamela Pressney, Renee Martinez, Virginia Hanna, Glenn Perley, John Pressney, COOPERATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION SOCIETY (unknown entity type/location), PHOENIX INVESTMENTS ALLIANCE, LLC, a limited liability company, ATTFUND (unknown entity type/location), Robert Zimmermann, Lari Castle, Debora Abel, Paul Martinez, Carol Bettinelli, Mary Zimmermann, Eva Castro, Herman Abel, Gilbert Castro, Bernardo Bettinelli, CASE IN CHIEF LLC, a California Limited Liability Company, BARLOW & ASSOCIATES, a law firm, Morris Hannah, Lee Harris Turk, Connie Perley, BRENT DAVID BARLOW, Barlow and Associates, Attfund, Cooperative Dispute Resolution Society, Phoenix Investments Alliance, LLC, Does 1-100 and Case in Chief LLC
Case Number: 8:2020cv00889
Filed: May 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING Plaintiffs' Second Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. #27 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Plaintiffs' Application is therefore DENIED. Further disregard of the Court's orders will result in sanctions to the offending parties and their attorneys. (See document for further information). (jp)
July 6, 2020 Filing 28 Opposition in opposition to re: Second EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order #27 filed by Defendant Brent David Barlow. (Barlow, Brent)
July 2, 2020 Filing 27 Second EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiffs Intermarketing Media, LLC, David Alan Klein, Law Offices of David Alan Klein, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Diba Alemi, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Declaration of Debra Joy Kizer, #8 Exhibit 1, #9 Exhibit 2, #10 Proposed Order) (Altman, Bryan)
June 22, 2020 Filing 26 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Brent David Barlow answer now due 7/28/2020, filed by Defendant Brent David Barlow.(Attorney Brent D Barlow added to party Brent David Barlow(pty:dft))(Barlow, Brent)
June 16, 2020 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Law Offices of David Alan Klein, P.C., Intermarketing Media, LLC, David Alan Klein, upon Defendant Barlow and Associates served on 6/8/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Brent David Barlow, Authorize Representative in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Altman, Bryan)
June 16, 2020 Filing 24 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Law Offices of David Alan Klein, P.C., Intermarketing Media, LLC, David Alan Klein, upon Defendant Brent David Barlow served on 6/8/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Brent David Barlow in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Altman, Bryan)
June 3, 2020 Filing 23 STATEMENT RICO filed by Plaintiffs Intermarketing Media, LLC, David Alan Klein, Law Offices of David Alan Klein, P.C. (Altman, Bryan)
June 1, 2020 Filing 22 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #9 as to Defendant Barlow and Associates. (jp)
June 1, 2020 Filing 21 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #9 as to Defendant Brent David Barlow. (jp)
May 29, 2020 Filing 20 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #9 filed by Plaintiffs Intermarketing Media, LLC, David Alan Klein, Law Offices of David Alan Klein, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Summons)(Altman, Bryan)
May 29, 2020 Filing 19 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #9 filed by Plaintiffs Intermarketing Media, LLC, David Alan Klein, Law Offices of David Alan Klein, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Attachment)(Altman, Bryan)
May 29, 2020 Filing 18 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #9 filed by Plaintiffs Intermarketing Media, LLC, David Alan Klein, Law Offices of David Alan Klein, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Attachment)(Altman, Bryan)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING Plaintiffs' Application to File Document Related to Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Complaint Under Seal (Doc. #16 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION). (jp)
May 22, 2020 Filing 16 APPLICATION to file document related to Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Complaint under seal filed by Plaintiffs Intermarketing Media, LLC, David Alan Klein, Law Offices of David Alan Klein, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8 Marked, #2 Exhibit 8 Unmarked, #3 Declaration Chris Urner, #4 Proposed Order)(Altman, Bryan)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER (1) DENYING Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order with Expedited Discovery and Othe Equitable Relief, and (2) Setting Hearing on Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction #10 by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court ORDERS the parties to show cause why a preliminary injunction should not issue. The Parties are ORDERED to appear for a hearing on 8/21/2020 at 10:30 AM. (See document for further information). (jp)
May 21, 2020 Filing 14 Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Stop defamation; Stop filing fraudulent charges; Stop misappropriating trade secrets #10 filed by Defendant Brent David Barlow. (Attorney Brent D Barlow added to party Brent David Barlow(pty:dft))(Barlow, Brent).
May 19, 2020 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Chris Urner re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Stop defamation; Stop filing fraudulent charges; Stop misappropriating trade secrets #10 (Supplemental) filed by Plaintiffs Intermarketing Media, LLC, David Alan Klein, Law Offices of David Alan Klein, P.C.. (Altman, Bryan)
May 19, 2020 Filing 12 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge James V. Selna. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge James V. Selna to Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:20-cv-00889 JLS (DFMx). (eva)
May 18, 2020 Filing 10 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Stop defamation; Stop filing fraudulent charges; Stop misappropriating trade secrets filed by Plaintiffs Intermarketing Media, LLC, David Alan Klein, Law Offices of David Alan Klein, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jason Krieck, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of J. Kriek, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of J. Kriek, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of J. Kriek, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of J. Kriek, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of J. Kriek, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of J. Kriek, #8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of J. Kriek, #9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of J. Kriek, #10 Declaration Michael Krieck, #11 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of M. Kriek, #12 Declaration David Alan Klein, #13 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of D. Klein, #14 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of D. Klein, #15 Declaration Diba Alemi ISO Ex Parte, #16 Declaration Chris Urner ISO Ex Parte, #17 Proposed Order) (Altman, Bryan)
May 16, 2020 Filing 9 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400.00 paid on 05/12/2020, receipt number 26423927), filed by Plaintiffs Law Offices of David Alan Klein, P.C., Intermarketing Media, LLC, David Alan Klein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Altman, Bryan)
May 14, 2020 Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying Spectrum Holdings Irrevocable Trust, Bo Wilson. (Altman, Bryan)
May 13, 2020 Filing 6 [IN CHAMBERS MINUTES]ORDER STRIKING COMPLAINT (lb)
May 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
May 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (lh)
May 12, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs INTERMARKETING MEDIA, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company dba RESORT ADVISORY GROUP, DAVID ALAN KLEIN, LAW OFFICES OF DAVID ALAN KLEIN, P.C, a law firm. (Altman, Bryan)
May 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26423927 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs LAW OFFICES OF DAVID ALAN KLEIN, P.C, a law firm, INTERMARKETING MEDIA, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company dba RESORT ADVISORY GROUP, DAVID ALAN KLEIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11) (Attorney Bryan C Altman added to party INTERMARKETING MEDIA, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company dba RESORT ADVISORY GROUP(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan C Altman added to party DAVID ALAN KLEIN(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan C Altman added to party LAW OFFICES OF DAVID ALAN KLEIN, P.C, a law firm(pty:pla))(Altman, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intermarketing Media, LLC et al v. Brent David Barlow et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Pressney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Perley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Pressney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOPERATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION SOCIETY (unknown entity type/location)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHOENIX INVESTMENTS ALLIANCE, LLC, a limited liability company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATTFUND (unknown entity type/location)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Zimmermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lari Castle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debora Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Bettinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Zimmermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eva Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herman Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilbert Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernardo Bettinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CASE IN CHIEF LLC, a California Limited Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARLOW & ASSOCIATES, a law firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris Hannah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Harris Turk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Perley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRENT DAVID BARLOW
Represented By: Brent D Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barlow and Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attfund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooperative Dispute Resolution Society
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Investments Alliance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Case in Chief LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERMARKETING MEDIA, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company dba RESORT ADVISORY GROUP
Represented By: Bryan C Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAW OFFICES OF DAVID ALAN KLEIN, P.C, a law firm
Represented By: Bryan C Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID ALAN KLEIN
Represented By: Bryan C Altman
Represented By: William I Rothbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intermarketing Media, LLC a Wyoming limited liability company doing business as Resort Advisory Group
Represented By: William I Rothbard
Represented By: Bryan C Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Law Offices of David Alan Klein, P.C.
Represented By: William I Rothbard
Represented By: Bryan C Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?