Dale R. Halvorson v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Dale R. Halvorson
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50 and Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 8:2020cv00915
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 Filing 21 CIVIL TRIAL ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO Judge Josephine L. Staton. (mku)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 5/28/2021. (jp)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTES (In Chambers) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference set for hearing 7/10/2020, isVACATED and the following schedule is set. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/30/2021 at 10:30 AM. (See document for further information). (jp)
June 26, 2020 Filing 18 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Proudfoot, Matthew)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference is set for 7/10/2020 at 10:30 a.m. See attached Order for details. (tg)
May 21, 2020 Filing 16 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge James V. Selna. Case transferred from Judge James V. Selna to the calendar of Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 8:20-cv-00915 JLS (DFMx). (eva)
May 19, 2020 Filing 11 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Southern
May 18, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
May 18, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (car)
May 18, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 3:20-cv-00526-JAH-WVG, from U.S. District Court Southern District of California (San Diego). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 8:20-cv-00915-JVS-DFMx. (car)
May 18, 2020 Filing 10 Case transferred to Central District of California, Southern Division. Files transferred electronically to: *Central District of California, Southern Division*.*411 West 4th Street, Room 1053**Santa Ana, CA 92701-4516*. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 5/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order) (tcf) [Transferred from California Southern on 5/19/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Vacating Hearing re #8 MOTION to Transfer Venue. Defendant's motion is taken under submission without oral argument and the hearing set for May 11, 2020, is VACATED. The Court will issue an order in due course. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 5/4/2020. (tcf) [Transferred from California Southern on 5/19/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Transfer Venue by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Proudfoot, Matthew) (tcf). [Transferred from California Southern on 5/19/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Ford Motor Company re #5 MOTION Change Venue filed by Ford Motor Company . (Proudfoot, Matthew) (tcf). [Transferred from California Southern on 5/19/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #5 MOTION Change Venue: Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendant's motion by 4/17/2020. If Defendant wishes to reply to Plaintiff's response, a pleading must be filed no later than 4/24/2020. Defendant's Motion Hearing is set for 5/11/2020 at 2:30 PM before Judge John A. Houston. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 3/25/2020. (tcf) [Transferred from California Southern on 5/19/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 5 ***Document withdrawn per ECF #7 *** MOTION Change Venue by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Proudfoot, Matthew) QC mailer sent re: attorney's signature does not match CM/ECF account (tcf). Modified to withdraw motion on 3/27/2020 (tcf). [Transferred from California Southern on 5/19/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER (1) Recusing From Case and (2) Requesting Reassignment. Judge Janis L. Sammartino is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge John A. Houston for all further proceedings. The new case number is 20-cv-00526-JAH-WVG. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/23/20.(jmo) (dlg). [Transferred from California Southern on 5/19/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties by Ford Motor Company (Proudfoot, Matthew) (jpp). [Transferred from California Southern on 5/19/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Millard Proudfoot on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Proudfoot, Matthew) (jpp). [Transferred from California Southern on 5/19/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, County of Orange, case number 30-2020-01133474-CU-BC-CJC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-13652805.), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration, #3 State Court Complaint)The new case number is 3:20-cv-526-JLS-WVG. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case.(jmr) (jms). [Transferred from California Southern on 5/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dale R. Halvorson v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale R. Halvorson
Represented By: Jim O Whitworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Matthew M Proudfoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?