Wanda Torres v. Secure Communication Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Wanda Torres
Defendant: Secure Communication Systems, Inc., Does 1 through 20, inclusive and Benchmark Electronics, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv00980
Filed: May 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2020 Filing 28 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge James V. Selna: For the foregoing reasons, the Court DENIES the motion. The Court further finds that oral argument would not be helpful on this matter and vacates the July 20, 2020 hearing. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. (see document for details.) (es)
July 13, 2020 Filing 27 REPLY in support of motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #17 filed by Defendants Benchmark Electronics, Inc., Secure Communication Systems, Inc.. (Isaacs, Andrea)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE #24 by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The Initial Scheduling Conference is continued to January 11, 2021 at 11:30 a.m. (es)
July 6, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #14 filed by Plaintiff Wanda Torres. (Weerasuriya, Suren)
July 6, 2020 Filing 24 STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from July 13, 2020 to August 24, 2020 Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #12 filed by Plaintiff Wanda Torres. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weerasuriya, Suren)
July 6, 2020 Filing 23 OPPOSITION In Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #17 filed by Plaintiff Wanda Torres. (Weerasuriya, Suren)
June 29, 2020 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Judy Hartman in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #14 filed by Defendants Benchmark Electronics, Inc., Secure Communication Systems, Inc.. (Isaacs, Andrea)
June 29, 2020 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Brooke S. Purcell in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #14 filed by Defendants Benchmark Electronics, Inc., Secure Communication Systems, Inc.. (Isaacs, Andrea)
June 29, 2020 Filing 20 OPPOSITION in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #14 filed by Defendants Benchmark Electronics, Inc., Secure Communication Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Isaacs, Andrea)
June 29, 2020 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Brooke S. Purcell in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #17 filed by Defendants Benchmark Electronics, Inc., Secure Communication Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 H)(Isaacs, Andrea)
June 29, 2020 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Pam Buss in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #17 filed by Defendants Benchmark Electronics, Inc., Secure Communication Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Isaacs, Andrea)
June 29, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendants Benchmark Electronics, Inc., Secure Communication Systems, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/27/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Isaacs, Andrea)
June 29, 2020 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE In Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Individual Arbitration, Strike Class Claims, and Stay Remaining PAGA Claim filed by Defendants Benchmark Electronics, Inc., Secure Communication Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Isaacs, Andrea)
June 29, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Individual Arbitration, Strike Class Claims, and Stay Remaining PAGA Claim filed by Defendants Benchmark Electronics, Inc., Secure Communication Systems, Inc.. (Isaacs, Andrea)
June 22, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Wanda Torres. Motion set for hearing on 7/20/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Weerasuriya, Suren)
June 19, 2020 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendants Benchmark Electronics, Inc., Secure Communication Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H Conformed Copy of First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit I Conformed Copy of Answer to First Amended Complaint)(Isaacs, Andrea)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 7/13/2020 at 11:30 pm before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 7/6/2020. (lb)
May 29, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Benchmark Electronics, Inc., Secure Communication Systems, Inc., re Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73) - optional html form, #5 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #6 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #7 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #10 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #9 served on 5-28-2020. (Isaacs, Andrea)
May 28, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Benchmark Electronics, Inc., Secure Communication Systems, Inc.. (Isaacs, Andrea)
May 28, 2020 Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
May 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
May 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (lh)
May 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to John D. Early. New Case Number 8:20-cv-00980 JVS (JDEx). (lh)
May 26, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants Benchmark Electronics, Inc., Does, Secure Communication Systems, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Wanda Torres. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 11/20/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
May 26, 2020 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Benchmark Electronics, Inc., Does, Secure Communication Systems, Inc. amending Class Action Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Wanda Torres. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh)
May 26, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Class Action Complaint, filed by Defendants Benchmark Electronics, Inc., Secure Communication Systems, Inc. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 12/26/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh)
May 26, 2020 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to First Amended Complaint, filed by Defendants Secure Communication Systems, Inc., Benchmark Electronics, Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
May 26, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Benchmark Electronics, Inc., Secure Communication Systems, Inc. (Isaacs, Andrea)
May 26, 2020 Filing 3 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Benchmark Electronics, Inc., Secure Communication Systems, Inc., (Isaacs, Andrea)
May 26, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Benchmark Electronics, Inc., Secure Communication Systems, Inc.. (Isaacs, Andrea)
May 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange, case number 30-2019-01113047 Receipt No: ACACDC-26568423 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Secure Communication Systems, Inc., Benchmark Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Class Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Case Assignment, #5 Exhibit E - ADR Packet, #6 Exhibit F - Defendants' Answer to Class Action Complaint, #7 Exhibit G - Joint Initial Case Management Report, #8 Exhibit H - First Amended Complaint, #9 Exhibit I - Defendants' Answer to First Amended Complaint)(Isaacs, Andrea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wanda Torres v. Secure Communication Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secure Communication Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Andrea Lauren Isaacs
Represented By: Paul S Cowie
Represented By: Brooke Sikora Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benchmark Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: Andrea Lauren Isaacs
Represented By: Paul S Cowie
Represented By: Brooke Sikora Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Torres
Represented By: Jessica L Campbell
Represented By: Samuel A Wong
Represented By: Suren N Weerasuriya
Represented By: Kashif Haque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?