Natasha Mcpherson v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Natasha Mcpherson
Defendant: Bank of America Long Term Disability Plan and Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2020cv01034
Filed: June 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting The Parties' Stipulation to Further Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days), #16 . Defendants shall have until August 31, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. (twdb)
July 31, 2020 Filing 16 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 31, 2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Bank of America Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Murray, Misty)
June 25, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Bank of America Long Term Disability Plan answer now due 7/31/2020; Metropolitan Life Insurance Company answer now due 7/31/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Bank of America Long Term Disability Plan; Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Attorney Misty A Murray added to party Bank of America Long Term Disability Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Misty A Murray added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Murray, Misty)
June 18, 2020 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendants Bank of America Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (twdb)
June 18, 2020 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,, #6 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Natasha Mcpherson. (Kantor, Glenn)
June 18, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Natasha Mcpherson, upon Defendant Bank of America Long Term Disability Plan served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Registered Agent, by serving Peter Cayetano - Authorized Agent in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kantor, Glenn)
June 18, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Natasha Mcpherson, upon Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Registered Agent, by serving Peter Cayetano - Authorized Agent in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kantor, Glenn)
June 10, 2020 Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd)
June 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #2 . The following error(s) was found: Please put Central District of California. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
June 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (ghap)
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #5 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Glenn R Kantor on behalf of Plaintiff Natasha Mcpherson (Kantor, Glenn)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Natasha Mcpherson, (Kantor, Glenn)
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Natasha Mcpherson. (Kantor, Glenn)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Natasha Mcpherson. (Kantor, Glenn)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26726037 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Natasha Mcpherson. (Attorney Glenn R Kantor added to party Natasha Mcpherson(pty:pla))(Kantor, Glenn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Natasha Mcpherson v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Mcpherson
Represented By: Glenn R Kantor
Represented By: Sarah J Demers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Long Term Disability Plan
Represented By: Misty A Murray
Represented By: Zina Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Misty A Murray
Represented By: Zina Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?