G. M. v. St. Marys Hospital of Long Beach et al
Plaintiff: G. M.
Defendant: Fred Adams, College Medical Center, St. Marys Hospital of Long Beach, Clinica Sierra Vista, Does 1-500, Bruce B. Taylor and Fraidon Babanejadyanghedjen
Case Number: 8:2020cv01043
Filed: June 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 Filing 25 Acknowledgement receipt of Remand Order by Superior Court received 7/9/20 CV-103 (es)
July 1, 2020 Filing 24 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. (es)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant United States be dismissed from the above-captioned action without prejudice, each party to bear their own costs and fees. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that the action between Plaintiff and Defendants Fred Adams, M.D. (sued herein as FRED ADAMS, M.D., aka FRAIDON BABANEJADYANGHEDJEN), Jazmin Cruz (sued herein as JASMINE CRUZ, M.A., fictitious defendant Doe 151), and Does 1-500, is remanded to the Superior Court of the State of California, County of Los Angeles. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (es)
June 29, 2020 Filing 22 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant United States, STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant United States. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gamble, Gwendolyn)
June 29, 2020 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and Strike of Defendant Cruz filed by Plaintiff G. M.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Life Care Plan)(Friedman, Nathaniel)
June 29, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and Strike of Defendant Fred Adams, M.D., etc. filed by Plaintiff G. M.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Life Care Plan)(Friedman, Nathaniel)
June 29, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff G. M. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to College Medical Center. (Friedman, Nathaniel)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND STRIKE OF DEFENDANT JAZMIN CRUZ, M.A. #17 by Judge James V. Selna. THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS THAT: 1. Plaintiff's oppositions or joint opposition to Jazmin Cruz, M.A.'s motion to dismiss (ECF No. 13-1) and motion to strike (ECF No. 13-2) will be filed on or before Monday, June 29, 2020; 2. Ms. Cruz's replies or joint reply in support of the motions to dismiss and strike will be filed on or before Monday, July 6, 2020; and 3. The motions to dismiss and strike will be heard on July 20, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. in Department 10C. (es)
June 23, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION for Hearing re Notice (Other), #12 , Order,,, #15 filed by Defendant Fred Adams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Taggart, Deborah)
June 23, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION for Hearing re Notice (Other), #13 , Order,,, #14 filed by Defendant Jazmin Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Taggart, Deborah)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ON NOTICE OF REQUEST OF DEFENDANT FRED ADAMS, M.D. AKA FRAIDON BABANEJADYANGHEDJEN FOR COURT TO SET HEARING ON AND CONSTRUE PREVIOUSLY FILED DEMURRER TO AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AS AN FRCP 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS AND AN FRCP 12(f) MOTION TO STRIKE #12 by Judge James V. Selna. The Court hereby ORDERS THAT: 1. Dr. Adams's demurrer filed in the Orange County Superior Court prior to removal will be construed as a Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss; 2. Dr. Adams's motion to strike portions of plaintiff's complaint filed in the Orange County Superior Court prior to removal will be construed as a Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(f) motion to strike; 3. Parties to submit a joint proposal for briefing and hearing within seven days. (es)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ON REQUEST OF DEFENDANT JAZMIN CRUZ, M.A. FOR COURT TO SET HEARING ON AND CONSTRUE PREVIOUSLY FILED DEMURRER TO AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AS AN FRCP 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS AND AN FRCP 12(f) MOTION TO STRIKE #13 by Judge James V. Selna. The Court hereby ORDERS THAT: 1. Ms. Cruz's demurrer filed in the Orange County Superior Court prior to removal will be construed as a Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss; 2. Ms. Cruz's motion to strike portions of plaintiff's complaint filed in the Orange County Superior Court prior to removal will be construed as a Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(f) motion to strike; 3. Parties to submit a joint proposal for briefing and hearing within seven days. (es)
June 17, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Request to Construe Demurrer as FRCP 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike as FRCP 12(f) Motion to Strike and Set Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date filed by Defendant Does. 151, JAZMIN CRUZ, M.A. (Attachments: #1 Demurrer, #2 Motion to Strike)(Taggart, Deborah)
June 17, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Request to Construe Demurrer as FRCP 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike as FRCP 12(f) Motion to Strike and Set Date for Reply and Hearing filed by Defendant Fred Adams. (Attachments: #1 Demurrer, #2 Motion to Strike, #3 Plaintiff's Joint Opposition to Demurrer and Motion to Strike)(Taggart, Deborah)
June 16, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff G. M. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to St. Marys Hospital of Long Beach. (Friedman, Nathaniel)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER CORRECTING CAPTION #8 by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The names Clinica Sierra Vista and Bruce B. Taylor, D.O. shall be deleted from the caption of this case; 2. The United States shall be inserted in the caption in place and instead of Clinica Sierra Vista and Bruce B. Taylor, D.O.; 3. The Caption shall be changed as follows: *See document for details.* (es)
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendant United Sates. Motion set for hearing on 7/13/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Meredith Torres, #2 Proposed Order, #3 POS) (Attorney Gwendolyn Millicent Gamble added to party United Sates(pty:dft)) (Gamble, Gwendolyn)
June 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Substitution filed by Defendants Fred Adams, Clinica Sierra Vista, College Medical Center, St. Marys Hospital of Long Beach, Bruce B. Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 POS)(Gamble, Gwendolyn)
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Fred Adams, Clinica Sierra Vista, College Medical Center, St. Marys Hospital of Long Beach, Bruce B. Taylor, served on June 10, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Gamble, Gwendolyn)
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Douglas F. McCormick. New Case Number 8:20-cv-1043 JVS (DFMx). (ghap)
June 9, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Fred Adams,M.D. Clinica Sierra Vista, College Medical Center, Does 1-500, St. Marys Hospital of Long Beach, Bruce B. Taylor, D.O., filed by plaintiff G. M. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/30/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (ghap)
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Clinica Sierra Vista, Bruce B. Taylor, B.O.. (Gamble, Gwendolyn)
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court Qf California, County of Los Angeles, case number 19STCV46725 No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Defendant Bruce B. Taylor, B.O., Clinica Sierra Vista. (Attachments: #1 Certification Of Scope Of Federal Employment, #2 Superior Court Complaint, #3 Proof of Service) (Attorney Gwendolyn Millicent Gamble added to party Clinica Sierra Vista(pty:dft), Attorney Gwendolyn Millicent Gamble added to party Bruce B. Taylor, B.O.(pty:dft))(Gamble, Gwendolyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G. M. v. St. Marys Hospital of Long Beach et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: College Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Marys Hospital of Long Beach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinica Sierra Vista
Represented By: Gwendolyn Millicent Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-500
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce B. Taylor
Represented By: Gwendolyn Millicent Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fraidon Babanejadyanghedjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. M.
Represented By: Nathaniel J Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?