Kris Gutcheon et al v. McLaren Automotive, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kris Gutcheon and Haley Gutcheon
Defendant: MCLAREN AUTOMOTIVE, INC. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Special Master: Hon James L. Smith
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Ronald Akasaka
Case Number: 8:2020cv01204
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL CASE. re: Notice of Settlement #42 . (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb)
March 3, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiffs Haley Gutcheon, Kris Gutcheon. (Daghighian, Sepehr)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Complaint is hereby referred to the previously appointed Special Master, Hon. James L. Smith (ret), for determination of whether good cause exists for granting said Motion #27 . REFERRED to Special Master. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
March 2, 2021 Filing 40 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter. The Court orders the parties to immediately contact the Special Master regarding the Motion to Amend Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Haley Gutcheon, Kris Gutcheon. #27 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 15, 2021 Filing 39 JOINT Exhibit List filed by Plaintiffs Haley Gutcheon, Kris Gutcheon.. (Schmitt, Erik)
February 15, 2021 Filing 38 Witness List filed by Plaintiffs Haley Gutcheon, Kris Gutcheon.. (Schmitt, Erik)
February 15, 2021 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiffs Haley Gutcheon, Kris Gutcheon. (Schmitt, Erik)
February 15, 2021 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant McLaren Automotive, Inc.. (Gibson, Lisa)
January 29, 2021 Filing 35 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jonathan Carlo Cagliata counsel for Plaintiffs Haley Gutcheon, Kris Gutcheon. Jonathan C. Cagliata is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Kris Gutcheon and Haley Gutcheon. (Cagliata, Jonathan)
January 11, 2021 Filing 34 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing (Held and Continued) before Judge David O. Carter: The Court continues the Motion to Amend Complaint #27 . Motion hearing continued to 2/10/2021 at 08:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. Status Conference set for 2/10/2021 at 08:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. Court Reporter: Not Present. (twdb)
January 6, 2021 Filing 33 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carte. The Court re-sets a hearing on the Motion to Amend Complaint #27 . The motion hearing is set for January 11, 2021, at 9:30 a.m.. This hearing will be held via Zoom conference. Counsel shall email DOC_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov for Zoom information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 3, 2020 Filing 32 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter. The Court finds the Motion to Amend Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Haley Gutcheon, Kris Gutcheon #27 appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for NOVEMBER 9, 2020 is removed from the calendar and the motion is taken under submission. No appearances are necessary on this date and time. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 26, 2020 Filing 31 REPLY Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Complaint #27 filed by Plaintiffs Haley Gutcheon, Kris Gutcheon. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Daghighian, Sepehr)
October 15, 2020 Filing 30 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter. The Court VACATES the Order granting the Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint #27 . The Court sets the Motion for For Leave to Amend Complaint #26 for an in-person hearing on NOVEMBER 9, 2020, at 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 14, 2020 Filing 29 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Complaint #22 filed by Defendant McLaren Automotive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lisa Gibson ISO Opposition, #2 Exhibit A and B to Decl. of Lisa Gibson ISO Opposition)(Gibson, Lisa)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 [VACATED BY COURT] ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #27 Plaintiffs' MOTION For Leave to Amend Complaint. The Court Orders: Plaintiffs to file a First Amended Complaint by or before 10/20/20. (twdb) Modified on 10/15/2020 (kd).
October 8, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Haley Gutcheon, Kris Gutcheon. Motion set for hearing on 11/9/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A to Memorandum, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit A to Declaration, #5 Proposed Order) (Daghighian, Sepehr) Modified on 10/15/2020 (kd).
October 8, 2020 Filing 26 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Leave, #22 filed by Plaintiffs Haley Gutcheon, Kris Gutcheon. (Daghighian, Sepehr)
October 8, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Ronald Akasaka has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
October 7, 2020 Filing 24 STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Ron Akasaka may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Plaintiffs Haley Gutcheon, Kris Gutcheon(Schmitt, Erik)
October 2, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Complaint #22 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): No [Prop] Order is attached. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
October 1, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Haley Gutcheon, Kris Gutcheon. Motion set for hearing on 11/2/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A) (Daghighian, Sepehr)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER RE: PRETRIAL AND TRIAL PROCEDURES by Judge David O. Carter: Fact Discovery cut-off 11/9/2020; Motion Cutoff: 2/8/2021 8:30 AM; Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/8/2021 08:30 AM; Jury Trial set for 3/23/2021 08:30 AM. (lc)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge David O. Carter. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. (lc)
September 8, 2020 Filing 19 MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held and completed before Judge David O. Carter. Court and Special Master confer with the parties outside the presence of the court reporter. The Court's Scheduling Order will issue. Court Reporter: Not Present. (lc)
September 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter. The Court advances the Scheduling Conference to 7:30 a.m. on SEPTEMBER 8, 2020. All persons, parties, clients, and individuals with settlement authority are ordered to be present for this hearing. The Court will meet with the parties at the courthouse doors. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER. The Court hereby APPOINTS the Honorable James L. Smith (Ret.) to serve as Special Master in this case. (twdb)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: SCHEDULING ORDER. The Court hereby orders the following: SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. ( Hearing set for 9/8/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter.) (twdb)
August 31, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference and Order to Parties to Reconvene held before Judge David O. Carter. In order to further assess the subject vehicle, including allegedly defective headlights, the parties are hereby ORDERED to meet with their respective experts and RECONVENE in front of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and United States Courthouse on August 31, 2020 at 9:00 p.m. Scheduling Conference set for 8/31/2020 at 09:00 PM before Judge David O. Carter. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION Court Reporter: Not Present. (twdb)
August 26, 2020 Filing 14 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter. Counsel are ordered to immediately bring the MCLAREN vehicle to a reserved bay for inspection. Counsel are ordered to agree upon a Special Master. The Special Master shall be present for the vehicle inspection. After the vehicle has been inspected, the parties are ordered to appear at the Santa Ana federal courthouse on August 31, 2020 at 7:30 a.m. All persons, parties, clients, and individuals with settlement authority, are ordered to be present for this hearing. The Court will meet with the parties, in the courthouse lobby, for settlement and/or trial setting. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 17, 2020 Filing 13 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-4 court days, filed by Plaintiffs Haley Gutcheon, Kris Gutcheon.. (Schmitt, Erik)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 8/31/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (See attached Order for complete details.) (kd)
July 15, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant McLaren Automotive, Inc. McLaren Automotive, Inc..(Gibson, Lisa)
July 10, 2020 Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd)
July 10, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Erik K Schmitt counsel for Plaintiffs Haley Gutcheon, Kris Gutcheon. Adding Erik K. Schmitt as counsel of record for Kris Gutcheon and Haley Gutcheon for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Kris Gutcheon and Haley Gutcheon. (Attorney Erik K Schmitt added to party Haley Gutcheon(pty:pla), Attorney Erik K Schmitt added to party Kris Gutcheon(pty:pla))(Schmitt, Erik)
July 10, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sepehr Daghighian counsel for Plaintiffs Haley Gutcheon, Kris Gutcheon. Adding Sepehr Daghighian as counsel of record for Kris Gutcheon and Haley Gutcheon for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Kris Gutcheon and Haley Gutcheon. (Daghighian, Sepehr)
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Haley Gutcheon, Kris Gutcheon, (Rosenstein, Michael)
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael H Rosenstein counsel for Plaintiffs Haley Gutcheon, Kris Gutcheon. Adding Michael H. Rosenstein as counsel of record for Kris Gutcheon and Haley Gutcheon for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Kris Gutcheon and Haley Gutcheon. (Rosenstein, Michael)
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
July 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (ghap)
July 8, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, McLaren Automotive, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Haley Gutcheon, Kris Gutcheon. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/26/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant McLaren Automotive, Inc. MCLAREN AUTOMOTIVE, INC., identifying Publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of McLaren Automotive, Inc.'s stock. (Gibson, Lisa)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant MCLAREN AUTOMOTIVE, INC.. (Gibson, Lisa)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2020-01141326-CU-BC-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-27118455 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant McLaren Automotive, Inc. MCLAREN AUTOMOTIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Gutcheon v. MAI _Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Purchase Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - CA Secretary of State, #4 Proof of Service) (Attorney Lisa Marie Gibson added to party MCLAREN AUTOMOTIVE, INC.(pty:dft))(Gibson, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kris Gutcheon et al v. McLaren Automotive, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCLAREN AUTOMOTIVE, INC.
Represented By: Lisa Marie Gibson
Represented By: Shawtina Ferguson Lewis
Represented By: Amy Toboco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kris Gutcheon
Represented By: Erik K Schmitt
Represented By: Michael H Rosenstein
Represented By: Sepehr Daghighian
Represented By: Jonathan Carlo Cagliata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haley Gutcheon
Represented By: Erik K Schmitt
Represented By: Michael H Rosenstein
Represented By: Sepehr Daghighian
Represented By: Jonathan Carlo Cagliata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Hon James L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Ronald Akasaka
Represented By: Ronald Garrett Akasaka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?