Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection v. GST Factoring, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection
Defendant: Jacob Slaughter, Amanda Johanson, Gregory Trimarche, Rick Graff, David Mize, Champion Marketing Solutions, LLC, GST Factoring, Inc., Scott Freda and Daniel Ruggiero
Case Number: 8:2020cv01239
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 29 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Scott Freda. (twdb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 28 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Champion Marketing Solutions, LLC. (twdb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 27 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Amanda Johanson. (twdb)
August 18, 2020 Filing 22 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Coleman, Rebecca)
August 18, 2020 Filing 21 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Coleman, Rebecca)
August 18, 2020 Filing 20 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Coleman, Rebecca)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER AS TO DEFENDANT JACOB SLAUGHTER by Judge David O. Carter, in favor of Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection against Jacob Slaughter. A judgment for monetary relief is entered in favor of the Bureau and against Defendant, in the amount of $240,000 for the purpose of providing redress to Affected Consumers; Defendant must pay a civil money penalty of $1 to the Bureau. Related to: Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment Entry of Stipulated Final Judgment and Order as to Defendant Slaughter #7 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER AS TO DEFENDANT GREGORY TRIMARCHE by Judge David O. Carter, in favor of Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection against Gregory Trimarche. A judgment for monetary relief is entered in favor of the Bureau and against Defendant in the amount of $11.8 million for the purpose of providing redress to Affected Consumers; Defendant must pay a civil money penalty of $1 to the Bureau. Related to: Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment Entry of Stipulated Final Judgment and Order as to Defendant Trimarche #8 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER AS TO DEFENDANT DANIEL RUGGIERO by Judge David O. Carter, in favor of Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection against Daniel Ruggiero. A judgment for monetary relief is entered in favor of the Bureau and against Defendant, in the amount of $125,000 for the purpose of providing redress to Affected Consumers; Defendant must pay a civil money penalty of $1 to the Bureau. Related to: Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment Entry of Stipulated Final Judgment and Order as to Defendant Ruggiero #6 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER AS TO DEFENDANT DAVID MIZE by Judge David O. Carter, in favor of Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection against David Mize #5 . A judgment for monetary relief is entered in favor of the Bureau and against Defendant, in the amount of $573,000 for the purpose of providing redress to Affected Consumers; Defendant must pay a civil money penalty of $1 to the Bureau. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
July 27, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. upon Jacob Slaughter waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/20/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Jacob Slaughter. (Blumberg, Jeffrey)
July 27, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. upon David Mize waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/20/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. Waiver of Service signed by David Mize. (Blumberg, Jeffrey)
July 23, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. upon Gregory Trimarche waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/20/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Gregory Trimarche. (Blumberg, Jeffrey)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #4 Non-Resident Attorney Rebecca J. Coleman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection, Plaintiff, designating Leanne E. Hartmann as local counsel. (twdb)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #3 Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey S. Blumberg APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection, Plaintiff, designating Leanne E. Hartmann as local counsel. (twdb)
July 20, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. upon Daniel Ruggiero waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/20/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Daniel Ruggiero. (Hartmann, Leanne)
July 16, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. upon Rick Graff waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/15/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Rick Graff. (Hartmann, Leanne)
July 16, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. upon GST Factoring, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/15/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Rick Graff, shareholder. (Hartmann, Leanne)
July 14, 2020 Filing 11 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd)
July 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
July 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh)
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment Entry of Stipulated Final Judgment and Order as to Defendant Trimarche filed by plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Stipulated Final Judgment and Order as to Defendant Trimarche) (Hartmann, Leanne)
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment Entry of Stipulated Final Judgment and Order as to Defendant Slaughter filed by plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Stipulated Final Judgment and Order as to Defendant Slaughter) (Hartmann, Leanne)
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment Entry of Stipulated Final Judgment and Order as to Defendant Ruggiero filed by plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Stipulated Final Judgment and Order as to Defendant Ruggiero) (Hartmann, Leanne)
July 13, 2020 Filing 5 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment Entry of Stipulated Final Judgment and Order as to Defendant Mize filed by plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Stipulated Final Judgment and Order as to Defendant Mize) (Hartmann, Leanne)
July 13, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Rebecca J. Coleman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) filed by plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Designation as Local Counsel, #2 Proposed Order) (Hartmann, Leanne)
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey S. Blumberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) filed by plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Designation as Local Counsel, #2 Proposed Order) (Hartmann, Leanne)
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Hartmann, Leanne)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection. (Attorney Leanne E Hartmann added to party Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection(pty:pla))(Hartmann, Leanne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection v. GST Factoring, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Johanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Trimarche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Graff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Mize
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champion Marketing Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GST Factoring, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Freda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Ruggiero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection
Represented By: Rebecca J. Coleman
Represented By: Leanne E. Hartmann
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Blumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?